JAMES v. CIRCLE K STORES INC
Plaintiff: SAMUEL JAMES
Defendant: CIRCLE K STORES INC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00215
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 8/25/2020. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 9/8/2020., JOINT Status Report due by 9/25/2020 and every 30 days thereafter., Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 10/8/2020., Discovery due by 12/23/2020. (kdm) (Mailed to all parties.)
August 25, 2020 Set Deadlines: Admissions due by 9/15/2020 as to MARC R. EDELMAN, ESQ. and MELISSA R ALVAREZ, ESQ. (kdm)
August 25, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT As To CIRCLE K STORES INC re #1 Complaint. ( *** Mailed to Attorney: MELISSA R ALVAREZ, ESQ., McDermott Will & Emery, LLP, 333 SE 2nd Avenue, Suite 4500, Miami, FL 33131-2184. Phone: 305-358-3500. ***) (kdm)
August 25, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE as to CIRCLE K STORES INC re #1 Complaint. ( *** Mailed to Attorney: MELISSA R ALVAREZ, ESQ., McDermott Will & Emery, LLP, 333 SE 2nd Avenue, Suite 4500, Miami, FL 33131-2184. Phone: 305-358-3500. ***) (kdm)
August 25, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT as to SAMUEL JAMES re #1 Complaint. (*** Mailed to Attorney: MARC R. EDELMAN, ESQ., MORGAN & MORGAN, P.A., 201 N. Franklin Street, Suite 700, Tampa, FL 33602. Phone: 813-223-5505. ***) (kdm)
August 25, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE As To SAMUEL JAMES re #1 Complaint. (*** Mailed to Attorney: MARC R. EDELMAN, ESQ., MORGAN & MORGAN, P.A., 201 N. Franklin Street, Suite 700, Tampa, FL 33602. Phone: 813-223-5505. ***) (kdm)
August 25, 2020 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:20-cv-01406. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 20, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Strike #1 Complaint Class Allegations and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Circle K Stores Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alvarez, Melissa) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/25/2020.]
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #11 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Transfer Venue. The CLERK of this Court shall TRANSFER this action to the Northern District of Florida, Gainesville Division for all further proceedings and CLOSE this case. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/20/2020. (GMD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/25/2020.]
August 17, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case to the Northern District of Florida by Circle K Stores Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alvarez, Melissa) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/25/2020.]
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #9 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Extend Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including August 20, 2020 to file its answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/22/2020. (GMD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/25/2020.]
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by Circle K Stores Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alvarez, Melissa) Modified event type on 7/21/2020 (CTR). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/25/2020.]
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Samuel James. Related case(s): yes (Edelman, Marc) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/25/2020.]
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Samuel James. (Edelman, Marc) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/25/2020.]
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on June 30, 2020 by Samuel James as to Circle K Stores Inc.. (Edelman, Marc) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/25/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 7/2/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/18/2020. (SKP) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/25/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 7/2/2020. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/18/2020. (SKP) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/25/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Circle K Stores Inc. (MCB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/25/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:20-cv-1406-T-35JSS. (SJB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/25/2020.]
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Circle K Stores Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-16952067) filed by Samuel James. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Edelman, Marc) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 8/25/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JAMES v. CIRCLE K STORES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CIRCLE K STORES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMUEL JAMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?