BARNES v. SAUL
Plaintiff: laura jean barnes
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Case Number: 1:2020cv00277
Filed: December 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2021 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed on SSA 1/14/2021 as to 5 Summons. (atm)
January 20, 2021 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed on Attorney General 1/7/2021 as to 5 Summons. (atm)
January 20, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed on US Attorney for ANDREW M. SAUL served on 12/31/2020, answer due 3/1/2021. (atm)
December 11, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ANDREW M. SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and forwarded to USM (atm)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to issue Plaintiff's proposed summonses ECF Nos. [1-3], [1-4], [1-5] and the forms necessary for service by the U.S. Marshal. The Clerk must send the prepared summonses, four certified copies of this order, service copies of the Complaint, and the prepared USM 285 forms to the U.S. Marshal, who shall serve a copy of the Complaint and summons upon the named Defendant, the United States Attorney for the Northern District of Florida, and the Attorney General of the United States by certified mail. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 12/10/2020. (atm) - forms prepared and forwarded to USM
December 10, 2020 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Re #1 Complaint filed by LAURA JEAN BARNES - Counsel is reminded of Northern District of Florida case opening procedures listed on NDFL website: http://www.flnd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-attorney-users-guide Under section: Civil Case Opening By Attorneys (atm)
December 10, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by LAURA JEAN BARNES. The motion was attached to ECF #1 . (bkp) (Main Document 2 replaced on 12/10/2020) (atm). (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/10/2020: #1 fin aff) (atm).
December 10, 2020 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to GARY R JONES. (bkp)
December 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL, filed by laura jean barnes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Supplement, #4 Supplement, #5 Supplement, #6 Supplement, #7 Affidavit, #8 Supplement, #9 Supplement, #10 Supplement) (BACHARACH, N)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BARNES v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: laura jean barnes
Represented By: N ALBERT BACHARACH, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?