AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY et al v.ALLAN SPEAR CONSTRUCTION LLC et al
Plaintiff: United States Surety Company, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, American Contractors Indemnity Company and US SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Defendant: Spear Hauge, LLC, Chear, LLC, Spear Holdings, LLC, Allan W. Spear, III, Spear Northwood, LLC, Trisal, LLC, Allan Spear Construction, LLC, A&G Equipment Rentals, LLC, Kusky & Spear, LLC, Vivian C. Spear, SPEAR HOLDINGS LLC, KUSKY & SPEAR LLC, A&G EQUIPMENT RENTALS LLC, SPEAR HAUGE LLC, CHEAR LLC, VIVIAN C SPEAR, TRISAL LLC, ALLAN W SPEAR, III, SPEAR NORTHWOOD LLC and ALLAN SPEAR CONSTRUCTION LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00021
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR notified that action is needed Re: #17 MOTION for Default Judgment as to all Defendants on Count I - Response deadline 4/8/2021. (***None filed to date.***) (kdm)
March 25, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Default Judgment as to all Defendants on Count I by AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY, UNITED STATES SURETY COMPANY, US SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 4/8/2021). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit in Support) (WEEKS, RYAN)
March 15, 2021 Filing 16 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to A&G EQUIPMENT RENTALS LLC, ALLAN SPEAR CONSTRUCTION LLC, CHEAR LLC, KUSKY & SPEAR LLC, ALLAN W SPEAR, III, VIVIAN C SPEAR, SPEAR HAUGE LLC, SPEAR HOLDINGS LLC, SPEAR NORTHWOOD LLC, TRISAL LLC -- per #15 MOTION for Entry of Default against all Defendants. (kdm)
March 15, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Entry of Default against all Defendants by AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY, UNITED STATES SURETY COMPANY, US SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. (WEEKS, RYAN)
March 3, 2021 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY. TRISAL LLC served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (WEEKS, RYAN)
March 3, 2021 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY. SPEAR NORTHWOOD LLC served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (WEEKS, RYAN)
March 3, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY. SPEAR HOLDINGS LLC served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (WEEKS, RYAN)
March 3, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY. SPEAR HAUGE LLC served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (WEEKS, RYAN)
March 3, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY. KUSKY & SPEAR LLC served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (WEEKS, RYAN)
March 3, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY. ALLAN W SPEAR, III served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (WEEKS, RYAN)
March 3, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY. ALLAN SPEAR CONSTRUCTION LLC served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (WEEKS, RYAN)
March 3, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY. A&G EQUIPMENT RENTALS LLC served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (WEEKS, RYAN)
March 3, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY. VIVIAN C SPEAR served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (WEEKS, RYAN)
March 3, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY. CHEAR LLC served on 2/19/2021, answer due 3/12/2021. (WEEKS, RYAN)
February 17, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to A&G EQUIPMENT RENTALS LLC, ALLAN SPEAR CONSTRUCTION LLC, CHEAR LLC, KUSKY & SPEAR LLC, ALLAN W SPEAR, III, VIVIAN C SPEAR, SPEAR HAUGE LLC, SPEAR HOLDINGS LLC, SPEAR NORTHWOOD LLC, TRISAL LLC. (kdm)
February 17, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (kdm)
February 16, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summonses by American Contractors Indemnity Company, U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, United States Surety Company re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons - Vivian C. Spear, #2 Exhibit Summons - Allan W. Spear III, #3 Exhibit Summons - Trisal, LLC, #4 Exhibit Summons - Spear Holdings, LLC, #5 Exhibit Summons - Spear Northwood, LLC, #6 Exhibit Summons - Spear Hauge, LLC, #7 Exhibit Summons - A&G Equipment Rentals, LLC, #8 Exhibit Summons - Kusky & Spear, LLC, #9 Exhibit Summons - Chear, LLC, #10 Exhibit Summons - Allan Spear Construction, LLC) (WEEKS, RYAN)
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-5943232.), filed by U.S. Specialty Insurance Company, United States Surety Company, American Contractors Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - General Indemnity Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (WEEKS, RYAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AMERICAN CONTRACTORS INDEMNITY COMPANY et al v.ALLAN SPEAR CONSTRUCTION LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spear Hauge, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chear, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spear Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan W. Spear, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spear Northwood, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trisal, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan Spear Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&G Equipment Rentals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kusky & Spear, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vivian C. Spear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPEAR HOLDINGS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KUSKY & SPEAR LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A&G EQUIPMENT RENTALS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPEAR HAUGE LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CHEAR LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VIVIAN C SPEAR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRISAL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLAN W SPEAR, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SPEAR NORTHWOOD LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLAN SPEAR CONSTRUCTION LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States Surety Company
Represented By: RYAN JOSEPH WEEKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: RYAN JOSEPH WEEKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Contractors Indemnity Company
Represented By: RYAN JOSEPH WEEKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
Represented By: RYAN JOSEPH WEEKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?