HODGES v. ALACHUA COUNTY JAIL
Plaintiff: CURTIS JERMAINE HODGES
Defendant: ALACHUA COUNTY JAIL
Case Number: 1:2021cv00050
Filed: March 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #6 Order - Second Amended Pleading and Motion for IFP or Fee ($402.00) due by 5/17/2021. (***None filed to date.***) (kdm)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re #4 FIRST Amended Complaint. (Second Amended Pleadings due by 5/17/2021., Motion for IFP or Fee ($402.00) due by 5/17/2021., If Plaintiff does not wish to proceed with his case must file a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - by 5/17/2021). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 4/19/2021. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff (1) a blank Civil Rights Complaint Form To Be Used By Prisoners In Actions Under 42 U.S.C. 1983; and (2) a blank motion to proceed in forma pauperis, with the Prisoner Consent and Financial Certificate form. (kdm) (Mailed as directed above.)
April 16, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to GARY R JONES. (kdm)
April 16, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CURTIS JERMAINE HODGES. (kdm)
April 8, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #4 FIRST Amended Complaint, (No service copies received). (kdm)
April 8, 2021 Filing 4 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against ALACHUA COUNTY JAIL, filed by CURTIS JERMAINE HODGES. (No service copies received.) (Parties will be updated only after the court has reviewed the amended complaint and specifically directed the Clerk to add the additional parties reflected in the amended complaint.) (kdm)
March 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re #1 Complaint. (FIRST Amended Complaint due by 4/28/2021., Motion for IFP or Fee ($402) due by 4/28/2021., If Plaintiff does not wish to proceed with his case must file a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (without prejudice) - by 4/28/2021). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 3/29/2021. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff (1) a blank Civil Rights Complaint Form To Be Used By Prisoners In Actions Under 42 U.S.C. 1983; and (2) a blank motion to proceed in forma pauperis, with the Prisoner Consent and Financial Certificate form. (kdm) (Mailed as directed above.)
March 26, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint, (No service copies received, no fee paid, no motion for IFP received). (kdm)
March 26, 2021 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se. Mailed to: CURTIS JERMAINE HODGES, ASO 14MNI004935, ALACHUA COUNTY JAIL, 3333 NE 39TH AVE, GAINESVILLE, FL 32609. (kdm)
March 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ALACHUA COUNTY JAIL, filed by CURTIS JERMAINE HODGES. (No service copies received, no fee paid, no motion for IFP received.) (kdm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HODGES v. ALACHUA COUNTY JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CURTIS JERMAINE HODGES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALACHUA COUNTY JAIL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?