TILLMAN v. ANDREW SAUL
Plaintiff: Tracy Tillman
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Case Number: 1:2021cv00079
Filed: April 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 206
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2021 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to SSA 7 Summons Issued (atm)
June 7, 2021 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to ATTORNEY GENERAL 7 Summons Issued (atm)
May 5, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to ANDREW SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (kdm)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Fee status updated to in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 5/5/2021. The Clerk is directed to issue summonses directed to the Social Security Commissioner, the United States Attorney for the Northern District of Florida, and the Attorney General of the United States, and the forms necessary for service by the U.S. Marshal, stating that Defendant has sixty (60) days to respond. The Clerk must send the prepared summonses, four certified copies of this order, service copies of the Complaint, and the prepared USM 285 forms to the U.S. Marshal (kdm)
May 5, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #5 Affidavit in Support of Motion. (kdm)
May 4, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by TRACY TILLMAN. (BACHARACH, N)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by TRACY TILLMAN. Plaintiff must complete and file a financial affidavit in support of his Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by 5/10/2021. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 4/29/2021. (atm)
April 29, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #3 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis . Referred to GARY R JONES. (bkp)
April 28, 2021 Filing 3 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Tracy Tillman. (BACHARACH, N)
April 28, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BACHARACH, N)
April 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tracy Tillman, filed by Tracy Tillman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (BACHARACH, N)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TILLMAN v. ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Tillman
Represented By: N ALBERT BACHARACH, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?