PRATER v. SAUL
Plaintiff: CHRISTINA ERIN PRATER
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
In Re: SSAOGC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00086
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed on USA served on 5/21/2021, answer due 7/20/2021. (atm)
June 7, 2021 Filing 7 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Attorney General 5 Summons Issued. (atm)
June 7, 2021 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to SSA 5 Summons Issued. (atm)
May 11, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to ANDREW SAUL, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and fwd to USM (bkp)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to issue summonses directed to the Social Security Commissioner, the United States Attorney for the Northern District of Florida, and the Attorney General of the United States, and the forms necessary for service by the U.S. Marshal, stating that Defendant has sixty (60) days to respond signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES on 5/10/21. (bkp)
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se (bkp)
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by CHRISTINA ERIN PRATER. (bkp)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR REVIEW OF ADVERSE SOCIAL SECURITY DECISION against ANDREW SAUL filed by CHRISTINA ERIN PRATER. (No service copies) (bkp)
May 7, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Referred to GARY R JONES. (bkp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PRATER v. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTINA ERIN PRATER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: SSAOGC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?