MAROUS v. ROCKET MORTGAGE, LLC
Plaintiff: RICHARD MAROUS
Defendant: ROCKET MORTGAGE, LLC
Case Number: 1:2022cv00006
Filed: January 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO FILE REPLY re #24 MOTION for Leave to File re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Replies due by 3/17/2022). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 3/10/2022. (atm)
March 10, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to File re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint and Supporting Memorandum] by ROCKET MORTGAGE, LLC. (MCDONOUGH, JAMES)
March 7, 2022 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL EISENBAND on behalf of RICHARD MAROUS (EISENBAND, MICHAEL)
March 6, 2022 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint and Supporting Memorandum] filed by RICHARD MAROUS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bill Analysis) (HIRALDO, MANUEL)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER: (Discovery due by 4/17/2023. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 5/8/2023. Jury Trial set for 8/14/2023 08:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Gainesville before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. Mediation Report due by 5/29/2023.) Case referred to mediation. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 3/4/2022. (atm)
March 4, 2022 Filing 20 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (HIRALDO, MANUEL)
February 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REJECTING PROPOSED SCHEDULE AND DIRECTING PARTIES TO CONFER re #18 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. The parties shall confer and file an amended Rule 26 report signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 2/25/22.( Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/4/2022.) (bkp)
February 24, 2022 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (TAYMAN, WILLIAM)
February 23, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint and Supporting Memorandum]. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 3/9/2022). (bkp)
February 23, 2022 Filing 17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [Motion to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint and Supporting Memorandum] by ROCKET MORTGAGE, LLC. (MCDONOUGH, JAMES)
February 14, 2022 Reset Deadlines: Status Report due by 3/11/2022 re #4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. (atm)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ADMITTING W. KYLE TAYMAN PRO HAC VICE re: #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 2/10/22. (bkp)
February 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADMITTING BROOKS BROWN PRO HAC VICE re: #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 2/10/22. (bkp)
February 10, 2022 Filing 14 STATUS REPORT by RICHARD MAROUS. (HIRALDO, MANUEL)
February 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO DISMISS AS MOOT re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint and Supporting Memorandum] filed by ROCKET MORTGAGE, LLC signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 2/9/22. (bkp)
February 9, 2022 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by W. Kyle Tayman.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6677504.) by ROCKET MORTGAGE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Certificate of Good Standing), #2 Text of Proposed Order) (TAYMAN, WILLIAM)
February 9, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Brooks R. Brown.( Filing fee $ 208 receipt number AFLNDC-6677020.) by ROCKET MORTGAGE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Certificate of Good Standing), #2 Text of Proposed Order) (BROWN, BROOKS)
February 9, 2022 Filing 10 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against ROCKET MORTGAGE, LLC, filed by RICHARD MAROUS. (HIRALDO, MANUEL)
January 31, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint and Supporting Memorandum]. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 2/14/2022). (bkp)
January 31, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE [Notice of Constitutional Challenge] by ROCKET MORTGAGE, LLC re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint and Supporting Memorandum] (MCDONOUGH, JAMES)
January 31, 2022 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM [Motion to Dismiss Class Action Complaint and Supporting Memorandum] by ROCKET MORTGAGE, LLC. (MCDONOUGH, JAMES)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #5 EXTENSION OF TIME. (Answer due by 1/31/2022). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/12/2022. (atm)
January 11, 2022 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by ROCKET MORTGAGE, LLC identifying Corporate Parent RKT Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Rocket Companies, Inc. for ROCKET MORTGAGE, LLC.. (MCDONOUGH, JAMES)
January 11, 2022 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by ROCKET MORTGAGE, LLC. (MCDONOUGH, JAMES)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/11/2022. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 1/25/2022. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/24/2022. Discovery due by 5/11/2022. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 6/1/2022. Status Report due by 2/11/2022. (atm)
January 11, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by RICHARD MAROUS. ROCKET MORTGAGE, LLC served on 12/22/2021, answer due 1/12/2022. (HIRALDO, MANUEL)
January 11, 2022 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (MCDONOUGH, JAMES)
January 11, 2022 Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, . (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 1/25/2022). (bkp)
January 10, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ROCKET MORTGAGE, LLC from Alachua County Circuit Court, case number 2021CA3533. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLNDC-6618729.), filed by ROCKET MORTGAGE, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (MCDONOUGH, JAMES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MAROUS v. ROCKET MORTGAGE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD MAROUS
Represented By: MANUEL SANTIAGO HIRALDO
Represented By: MICHAEL EISENBAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROCKET MORTGAGE, LLC
Represented By: JAMES KIRBY MCDONOUGH
Represented By: BROOKS R BROWN
Represented By: WILLIAM KYLE TAYMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?