KLINGER v. SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al.
Plaintiff: JOHANNA KLINGER
Defendant: SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS and FLORIDA ATTORNEY GENERAL
Case Number: 1:2022cv00147
Filed: July 1, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2022 Filing 5 Notice to Pro Se. Mailed to: Johanna Klinger, Florida Womens's Reception Center, 3700 NW 111 Pl, Ocala, FL 34482. (kdm)
July 1, 2022 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 5:22-cv-00110. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 1, 2022 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #3 ORDER transferring case to the Northern District of Florida. (kdm)
June 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER transferring case to the Northern District of Florida for all further proceedings. The Clerk is directed to forward the file to that District. Signed by Judge John L. Badalamenti on 6/30/2022. (KLM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/1/2022.]
March 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER for all confined, pro se litigants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 3/1/2022. (LAB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/1/2022.]
February 28, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Johanna Klinger. (No fees paid, no service copies provided)(LAB) Modified on 3/1/2022 (LAB). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 7/1/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KLINGER v. SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHANNA KLINGER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA ATTORNEY GENERAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?