MCDONALD v. SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Anita McDonald
Defendant: Sanofi Winthrop Pharmaceuticals, Inc, SANOFI US SERVICES INC, SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC individually, and doing business as Winthrop U.S., SANOFI WINTHROP PHARMACEUTICALS INC and SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC INDIVIDUALLY doing business as WINTHROP U S
Case Number: 1:2023cv00284
Filed: November 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ZACHARY C BOLITHO
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED TELEPHONIC HEARING: Telephonic Status Conference reset for 2/2/2024 09:00 AM before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. ALL PARTIES are directed to call the AT&T Conference Line (see below) Conference Call Information You may dial into the conference call up to five minutes before start time. Call in number: 888-684-8852 When prompted for an access code, enter: 3853136# If you are asked to join as the host, just ignore and wait until you are asked for a security code. When asked for a security code, enter: 4565# Say your name, when prompted. You are now in the conference call. Remember to mute your phone when you are not speaking. The Court asks that counsel NOT use cell phones or speaker phones during the call as the quality of the audio connection is compromised by these devices. s/ Victoria Milton McGeeCourtroom Deputy Clerk (vkm)
December 11, 2023 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by SANOFI US SERVICES INC, SANOFI WINTHROP PHARMACEUTICALS INC, SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC. (CLEMENT, ANITRA)
December 5, 2023 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER: Telephonic Status Conference held on 12/5/2023. Plaintiff's counsel not present. Ruling by Court: Defense counsel to confer with plaintiff's counsel then notify Clerk to reset for telephonic hearing in 10 days (Court Reporter Megan Hague (USDC-Tallahassee)). (vkm)
November 29, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Similar Cases by SANOFI WINTHROP PHARMACEUTICALS INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (CLEMENT, ANITRA)
November 29, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by ANITRA RAIFORD CLEMENT and CONNOR JAY SEARS on behalf of SANOFI WINTHROP PHARMACEUTICALS INC (CLEMENT, ANITRA) Modified on 11/29/2023 (tss).
November 29, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC HEARING: Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/5/2023 09:30 AM before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. ALL PARTIES are directed to call the AT&T Conference Line (see below) Conference Call Information You may dial into the conference call up to five minutes before start time. Call in number: 888-684-8852 When prompted for an access code, enter: 3853136# If you are asked to join as the host, just ignore and wait until you are asked for a security code. When asked for a security code, enter: 4565# Say your name, when prompted. You are now in the conference call. Remember to mute your phone when you are not speaking. The Court asks that counsel NOT use cell phones or speaker phones during the call as the quality of the audio connection is compromised by these devices. s/ Victoria Milton McGeeCourtroom Deputy Clerk (vkm)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING CASE FOR TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE re #8 TRANSFER ORDER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 11/28/2023. The Clerk is directed to set this case for a telephonic status conference on or after December 4, 2023, at which time the parties must be prepared to provide this Court with an update on the status of this case. (kdm)
November 28, 2023 Filing 9 Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-00105. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TRANSFER ORDER- Case transferred to Northern District of Florida. Signed by Judge Jane Triche Milazzo on 10/23/2023. (MDL 2740, Doc. 16511)(sa) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/28/2023.]
September 28, 2023 Filing 7 Joint Designation of Record for MDL Transfer by Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. Joint Designation of General and Case-Specified MDL Records to Be Included Upon Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Byard, Adrienne) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/28/2023.]
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Jane Triche Milazzo. Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/28/2023.]
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRETRIAL ORDERS. Signed by Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt.(ADI) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/28/2023.]
January 6, 2017 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi Winthrop Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(tm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/28/2023.]
January 6, 2017 Filing 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint - 1) Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Summons. The pdf should not have the green header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk took corrective action. 2) Filing attorney incorrectly indexed party name - 'Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC'. When entering a party name, only the name of the party should be indexed. Any aliases should be added to the named party with the appropriate alias party role. Clerk took corrective action. (tm) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/28/2023.]
January 6, 2017 Filing 2 Initial Case Assignment to Chief Judge Kurt D. Engelhardt and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (am) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/28/2023.]
January 5, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi Winthrop Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, separately and d/b/a Winthrop U.S. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-5896150) filed by Anita McDonald. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)Attorney Dennis Reich added to party Anita McDonald(pty:pla).(Reich, Dennis) (Attachment 1 - Attachment 4 replaced on 1/5/2017, because filing attorney did not properly format pdf) (tm). Modified text on 1/5/2017 (tm). [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 11/28/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MCDONALD v. SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anita McDonald
Represented By: DENNIS CRAIG REICH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi Winthrop Pharmaceuticals, Inc
Represented By: CONNOR JAY SEARS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI US SERVICES INC
Represented By: CONNOR JAY SEARS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC individually, and doing business as Winthrop U.S.
Represented By: CONNOR JAY SEARS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI WINTHROP PHARMACEUTICALS INC
Represented By: CONNOR JAY SEARS
Represented By: ANITRA RAIFORD CLEMENT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI-AVENTIS US LLC INDIVIDUALLY doing business as WINTHROP U S
Represented By: CONNOR JAY SEARS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?