MORRISSEY v. STARBUCKS COFFEE COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: thomas morrissey
Defendant: STARBUCKS CORPORATION, JR Investments, LLC, JR Lawrenceville, LLC, STARBUCKS COFFEE COMPANY doing business as STARBUCKS, JR INVESTMENTS LLC and JR LAWRENCEVILLE LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv00289
Filed: December 2, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MARTIN A FITZPATRICK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2024 Filing 16 RULE 26 Disclosures by STARBUCKS COFFEE COMPANY. (LOGAN, MEAGAN)
January 8, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE OF FILING DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF #11 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STARBUCKS COFFEE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Joseph Ramani, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Joseph Rivani) (LOGAN, MEAGAN) Modified on 1/8/2024 to correct title (tss).
January 8, 2024 Filing 14 RULE 26 Disclosures by THOMAS MORRISSEY. (BANKS, MARIE)
January 5, 2024 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by STARBUCKS COFFEE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent STARBUCKS CORPORATION for STARBUCKS COFFEE COMPANY.. (LOGAN, MEAGAN)
January 4, 2024 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by JR INVESTMENTS LLC, JR LAWRENCEVILLE LLC. (JAMES, JEFFREY)
January 4, 2024 Filing 11 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STARBUCKS COFFEE COMPANY. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Articles of Organization, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B Articles of Organization, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C Certificate of Amendment) (LOGAN, MEAGAN) Modified on 1/4/2024 (tss).
January 4, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE OF TRIAL CONFLICT by STARBUCKS COFFEE COMPANY re #6 Scheduling Order (LOGAN, MEAGAN) Modified on 1/4/2024 to clarify title (tss).
January 3, 2024 Filing 9 RULE 26 Disclosures by JR INVESTMENTS LLC, JR LAWRENCEVILLE LLC. (JAMES, JEFFREY)
January 3, 2024 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by JR INVESTMENTS LLC, JR LAWRENCEVILLE LLC. (JAMES, JEFFREY)
January 3, 2024 Filing 7 JOINT STATUS REPORT REGARDING DISCOVERY filed pursuamnt to #2 Scheduling Order (LOGAN, MEAGAN) Modified on 1/3/2024 to clarify title (tss).
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER entered pursuant to #4 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/28/23. Discovery due by 8/1/2024. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 8/22/2024. Mediation Report due by 9/12/2024. Jury Trial set for 11/4/2024 at 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Gainesville before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER. Case referred to mediation. (tss)
December 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE AN AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/28/23. Defendant Starbucks Corporation shall file an amended notice of removal that addresses the jurisdictional defects on or before Thursday, 1/4/2024. (tss)
December 28, 2023 Filing 4 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (LOGAN, MEAGAN)
December 28, 2023 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER notified that action is needed Re: #4 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (tss)
December 6, 2023 Filing 3 RESPONSE by STARBUCKS COFFEE COMPANY re #1 Notice of Removal, Answer and Affirmative Defenses by STARBUCKS COFFEE COMPANY. (LOGAN, MEAGAN)
December 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 12/4/2023. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 12/18/2023. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 1/18/2024. Discovery due by 4/2/2024. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 4/23/2024. Status Report due by 1/4/2024 and every 30 days thereafter. (atm) Modified on 12/4/2023 to correct date (atm).
December 2, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STARBUCKS CORPORATION from Circuit Court Alachua County, case number 2023-cv-001493. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number BFLNDC-8387230.), filed by STARBUCKS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (LOGAN, MEAGAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MORRISSEY v. STARBUCKS COFFEE COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: thomas morrissey
Represented By: BRIAN G SCHACKOW
Represented By: MARIE NICOLE BANKS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STARBUCKS CORPORATION
Represented By: MEAGAN LINDSAY LOGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JR Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JR Lawrenceville, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STARBUCKS COFFEE COMPANY doing business as STARBUCKS
Represented By: MEAGAN LINDSAY LOGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JR INVESTMENTS LLC
Represented By: JEFFREY M JAMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JR LAWRENCEVILLE LLC
Represented By: JEFFREY M JAMES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?