ROBERTSON HICKS v. ROBINSON HELICOPTER COMPANY INC et al
Plaintiff: Tammi Robertson Hicks
Defendant: Robinson Helicopter Company, Inc., Lycoming Engines, AVCO Corporation, Textron, Inc., ROBINSON HELICOPTER COMPANY INC and TEXTRON INC
Case Number: 1:2024cv00004
Filed: January 9, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: MARK E WALKER
2 Judge: ALLEN C WINSOR
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Airline Crash
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2024 Filing 26 STATUS REPORT by TAMMI ROBERTSON HICKS. (IVEY, LANCE)
February 19, 2024 Filing 25 RULE 26 Disclosures by TAMMI ROBERTSON HICKS. (HERNANDEZ, MARC)
February 19, 2024 Filing 24 NOTICE of Service of Initial Disclosures by TAMMI ROBERTSON HICKS (HERNANDEZ, MARC)
February 19, 2024 Filing 23 RULE 26 Disclosures by AVCO CORPORATION. (JUSTICE, PETRA)
February 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER Re: #21 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Discovery due by 8/1/2025., Dispositive Motions to be filed by 8/22/2025., Mediation Report due by 9/12/2025., Jury Trial set for 1/5/2026 08:30 AM in U.S. Courthouse Gainesville before CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER.) Case referred to mediation. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 2/14/2024. (kdm)
February 14, 2024 Filing 21 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (JUSTICE, PETRA)
February 9, 2024 RESet Deadline per #5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 3/16/2024. (kdm)
February 8, 2024 Filing 20 STATUS REPORT by TAMMI ROBERTSON HICKS. (IVEY, LANCE)
February 5, 2024 Filing 19 DISCOVERY ADVISORY: Re #17 , #18 NOTICE of Service of Discovery -- Counsels attention is directed to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5(d), which prohibits the filing of discovery materials (including notices of deposition, deposition transcripts, interrogatories and interrogatory responses and notices thereof, production requests and responses and notices thereof, and admissions requests and responses and notices thereof) unless and until needed for consideration of pending motions by the court. This advisory serves as notice that no further discovery materials should be filed and all discovery posting options have been removed from CMECF. (kdm)
February 2, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of service of discovery by TAMMI ROBERTSON HICKS (IVEY, LANCE)
February 2, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Service of Discovery by TAMMI ROBERTSON HICKS (IVEY, LANCE)
January 26, 2024 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROBINSON HELICOPTER COMPANY INC. ROBINSON HELICOPTER COMPANY INC waiver sent on 1/18/2024, answer due 3/18/2024. (***Please see docket entry #15 -1 to view PDF.***) (kdm)
January 25, 2024 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing waiver of service of summons by TAMMI ROBERTSON HICKS (Attachments: #1 Exhibit waiver of service of summons) (IVEY, LANCE)
January 24, 2024 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by AVCO CORPORATION identifying Corporate Parent Textron, Inc. for AVCO CORPORATION.. (JUSTICE, PETRA)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S UNOPPOSED #11 MOTION TO AMEND BY INTERLINEATION. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/22/2024. (kdm)
January 22, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by LANCE C IVEY on behalf of TAMMI ROBERTSON HICKS (IVEY, LANCE)
January 22, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Amend by Interlineation by TAMMI ROBERTSON HICKS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (EVERSOLE, JOHN)
January 17, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by MARC BRANDON HERNANDEZ on behalf of TAMMI ROBERTSON HICKS (HERNANDEZ, MARC)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED #6 MOTION TO DISMISS TWO DEFENDANTS WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/16/2024. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Lycoming Engines and Textron, Inc., are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff's claims remain pending against Defendants Robinson Helicopter Company, Inc., and Avco Corporation. (kdm)
January 16, 2024 Filing 7 Defendant Avco Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint for Wrongful Death by AVCO CORPORATION. (JUSTICE, PETRA)
January 16, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Lycoming Engines & Textron, Inc. Without Prejudice by AVCO CORPORATION, LYCOMING ENGINES, TEXTRON INC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 1/30/2024). (JUSTICE, PETRA)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/16/2024. Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 1/30/2024. Status Report due by 2/16/2024 and every 30 days thereafter. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/29/2024. Discovery due by 5/15/2024. (kdm)
January 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR REASSIGNMENT. Case reassigned to CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER for all further proceedings. JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR no longer assigned to case. Signed by JUDGE ALLEN C WINSOR on 1/16/2024. The court directs to the clerk to reassign this case to the judge assigned the earlier-filed case, Chief Judge Walker. (kdm)
January 12, 2024 Filing 8 ***PLEASE DISREGARD ENTRY ENTERED IN THE WRONG CASE*** --- CIVIL CASE - NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee: $ 405.00, receipt number 1-138. Fee status updated to paid. (kdm) Modified on 1/16/2024 to edit text (kdm).
January 11, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Similar Actions by AVCO CORPORATION, LYCOMING ENGINES (JUSTICE, PETRA)
January 10, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (kdm)
January 9, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by AVCO Corporation, Lycoming Engines from Circuit Court of the Eighth Judicial Circuit, case number 2023-CA-000302. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AFLNDC-8434253.), filed by AVCO Corporation, Lycoming Engines. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1 - R. Hicks State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Bill Detail, #4 Exhibit Ex. 3 - FL Dept of State Textron, #5 Exhibit Ex. 4 - FL Dept of State AVCO Corporation, #6 Exhibit Ex. 5 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (R. Hicks)) (JUSTICE, PETRA)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ROBERTSON HICKS v. ROBINSON HELICOPTER COMPANY INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammi Robertson Hicks
Represented By: JOHN FREDERICK EVERSOLE, III
Represented By: LANCE C IVEY
Represented By: MARC BRANDON HERNANDEZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinson Helicopter Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lycoming Engines
Represented By: PETRA LOUISE JUSTICE
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER AARON PATE
Represented By: JOHN PATRICK O'FLANAGAN, III
Represented By: LOUIS ROBERT BOURGEOIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AVCO Corporation
Represented By: PETRA LOUISE JUSTICE
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER AARON PATE
Represented By: JOHN PATRICK O'FLANAGAN, III
Represented By: LOUIS ROBERT BOURGEOIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Textron, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBINSON HELICOPTER COMPANY INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TEXTRON INC
Represented By: PETRA LOUISE JUSTICE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?