CHAVERS et al v. ALLIS-CHALMERS et al
Case Number: 3:2005cv00338
Filed: September 6, 2005
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
Presiding Judge: JAMES T GILES
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - (See order image). - - Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on August 31, 2009. (cbj)
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER re 155 MOTION for Summary Judgment Under Florida's Statute of Repose, and 157 MOTION for Summary Judgment Due to Plaintiffs' Inability to Prove the Essential Elements of Their Claim of Negligence f iled by E I DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY - The court will take the motions under advisement on September 8, 2009. - (See order image) - Miscellaneous Deadline - by 9/8/2009. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on August 18, 2009. (cbj)
May 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 139 FINAL SCHEDULING AND TRIAL ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL: re: Rule 16 conference held 4/27/2009 - (see order image); The previously entered stay is LIFTED. Trial set for two-week trial docket created especially for this case to commence 11/30/2009 . Discovery due by 7/27/2009. Daubert and Dispositive Motions to be filed by 8/17/2009. Mediation to take place by 9/4/2009. Mediation report due within 14 days thereafter. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on May 4, 2009. (cbj)
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 128 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER (certified copy) - previously filed at 121 Order (pursuant to email transmittal) (cbj)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 121 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER - s/Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on March 18, 2009 (stayed for 15 days; STAY lifted 4/3/2009, see letter at 122 ) - The transferee court in this litigation has, in the action on this conditional r emand order: (1) severed all claims for punitive or exemplary damages; and (2) advised the Panel that coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings with respect to the remaining claims have been completed, and that remand of those claims to the tr ansferor court, as provided in 28 U.S.C. § 1407(a), is appropriate. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that all claims in the action on this conditional remand order except the severed damages claims be remanded to their respective transferor courts. (cbj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHAVERS et al v. ALLIS-CHALMERS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?