FRAZIER v. MCDONOUGH
Plaintiff: KELVIN FRAZIER
Defendant: JAMES R MCDONOUGH
Case Number: 3:2007cv00273
Filed: June 27, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Santa Rosa
Presiding Judge: LACEY A COLLIER
Presiding Judge: MILES DAVIS
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER ADOPTING re 53 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. This case is dismissed without prejudice for plaintiff's failure to prosecute or failure to comply with an order of the court. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 1/9/09. (lcu)
December 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 53 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that this case be dismissed without prejudice for plaintiff's failure to prosecute or failure to comply with an order of the court. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on 12/2/08. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 12/30/2008 (lcu)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER re 49 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation If pltf wishes to proceed with this action, he shall file an amended complaint as previously instructed within twenty days from date of this order. Amended Pleadings due by 11/16/2008. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on October 27, 2008.(cc: Frazier) (cbj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FRAZIER v. MCDONOUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELVIN FRAZIER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAMES R MCDONOUGH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?