SANDERS v. BAY STATE CABLE TIES LLC
Plaintiff: WILLIAM J SANDERS
Defendant: BAY STATE CABLE TIES LLC
Case Number: 3:2007cv00402
Filed: September 20, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Okaloosa
Presiding Judge: MILES DAVIS
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER DISMISSING CASE re: 228 Joint Stipulation for Dismissal of All Remaining Counts. This action is DISMISSED without prejudice, each party to bear their respective costs. The Clerk is directed to close the case in its entirety for all purposes. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 8/18/2009. (djb)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER. Trial will begin on Monday, August 17, 2009, at 8:30 a.m. In accord with the parties' representation to the court, this will be a bench trial. Bay State Cable Ties, LLC, and its counsel, Roger Clark are excused from attending the trial. The parties are instructed that if settlement is reached before the beginning of trial, the court should be promptly notified. Any special request for court reporter services, such as daily copy, must have been submitted to the court reporter, Gwen Kesinger, by close of business on August 10, 2009. Motions must be filed by 5:00 pm, Thursday, August 13, 2009. 10. The parties must submit proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law to the Clerk of Court by 5:00 pm, Fri day, August 14, 2009, with an editable copy (in word processing format only, not.pdf) delivered by e-mail to chambers at flnd_rodgers@flnd.uscourts.gov. (Miscellaneous Deadline - by 8/14/2009, Motions in limine due by 8/13/2009, Bench Trial set for 8/17/2009 08:30 AM). Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 8/10/09. (lcu)
July 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 214 ORDER rejecting 213 Stipulation filed by WILLIAM J SANDERS and SANDERS MANUFACTURING CO. INC. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 7/6/09. (lcu)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting 185 Motion to Strike to the extent the order dated April 10, 2009 183 , which was entered prematurely, is VACATED. Oestriech's and AME's revived motion to dismiss/remand 181 is DENIED. The motion initia lly appeared to the court to be well-taken in light of the seemingly parallel nature of the claims asserted in the state and federal actions. After considering Bay State's response, however, including its contention that no trial date has yet be en set in the state action while one has been set in this case, the court concludes that neither dismissal nor remand of the instant case is warranted on the grounds cited in the motion. If discovery reveals a founded basis for claiming a risk of inconsistent verdicts, and a trial in the state court action is expected to be held prior to the trial set in this forum, the motion to dismiss may be renewed. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 4/14/09. (lcu)
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ***VACATED***ORDER granting 181 Motion to Dismiss or in The Alternative Remand to State Court Non-patent Related Claims to Pending State Court Proceedings. The position of defendants L. Oestreich and Americas Merchandise Enterprises, Inc., is well-taken, and defendant, Bay State Cable Ties, LLC, has not responded. The state law claims (4th and 5th claims for relief) asserted in Bay State's Third- Party Complaint (doc. 17) are DISMISSED with prejudice.Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 4/10/09. (lcu) Modified on 4/14/2009. ***VACATED*** pursuant to 186 Order (lcu)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SANDERS v. BAY STATE CABLE TIES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM J SANDERS
Represented By: JOHN WILEY HORTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAY STATE CABLE TIES LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?