ESTATE OF MICHELLE EVETTE MCCALL et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF MICHELLE EVETTE MCCALL, EDWARD M MCCALL, MARGARITA F MCCALL and JASON WALLEY
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 3:2007cv00508
Filed: November 26, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Okaloosa
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT - Plaintiff's 20 motion for partial summary judgment is Denied. - - FINAL JUDGMENT is entered in favor of the decedent's co-personal representatives and against the Government in the total amoun t of $1,980,462.40, to be distributed to the beneficiaries of the estate - (See order image) - - in favor of JASON WALLEY for the benefit of W.W. ($1,190,234.00), ESTATE OF MICHELLE EVETTE MCCALL ($30,752.40), EDWARD M MCCALL II ($384,476.00), and MARGARITA F MCCALL ($375,000.00) against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. - Costs are to be taxed against the Government. - - Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on September 30, 2009. (cbj)
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER (NOTICE OF CONSTITUTIONAL CHALLENGE TO STATE STATUTE) re 50 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by ESTATE OF MICHELLE EVETTE MCCALL The court certifies to Bill McCollum, Atty Gen/State of FL, that the constitution ality of Section 766.118, Florida Statutes has been called into question in this matter. Clerk to promptly send copy of this order, a copy of the complaint 1 , deft's answer and affirmative defenses 10 , pltf's reply to deft's affirm ative defenses 15 , Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment 20 , court's order setting trial 49 , and pltf's notice of constitutional challenge 50 , by certified mail, to the Attorney General at Office of Attorney General, State of Florida, The Capitol PL-1, Tallahassee, FL 32399-1050. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on May 19, 2009. (cc: McCollum R/R# 7008 1300 0001 8567 8938) (cbj)
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re 20 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by ESTATE OF MICHELLE EVETTE MCCALL - The court will take the motion under advisement on November 17, 2008. (See order image for complete instructions.) Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 11/17/2008. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on October 31, 2008. (cbj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ESTATE OF MICHELLE EVETTE MCCALL et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF MICHELLE EVETTE MCCALL
Represented By: SARA MARGARITA COURTNEY-BAIGORRI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD M MCCALL
Represented By: SARA MARGARITA COURTNEY-BAIGORRI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGARITA F MCCALL
Represented By: SARA MARGARITA COURTNEY-BAIGORRI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JASON WALLEY
Represented By: SARA MARGARITA COURTNEY-BAIGORRI
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?