ESTATE OF MICHELLE EVETTE MCCALL et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: |
ESTATE OF MICHELLE EVETTE MCCALL, EDWARD M MCCALL, MARGARITA F MCCALL and JASON WALLEY |
Defendant: |
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA |
Case Number: |
3:2007cv00508 |
Filed: |
November 26, 2007 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Florida |
Office: |
Pensacola Office |
County: |
Okaloosa |
Presiding Judge: |
|
Presiding Judge: |
M CASEY RODGERS |
Presiding Judge: |
ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY |
Nature of Suit: |
Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1346 Wrongful Death |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 30, 2009 |
Filing
68
ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT - Plaintiff's 20 motion for partial summary judgment is Denied. - - FINAL JUDGMENT is entered in favor of the decedent's co-personal representatives and against the Government in the total amoun t of $1,980,462.40, to be distributed to the beneficiaries of the estate - (See order image) - - in favor of JASON WALLEY for the benefit of W.W. ($1,190,234.00), ESTATE OF MICHELLE EVETTE MCCALL ($30,752.40), EDWARD M MCCALL II ($384,476.00), and MARGARITA F MCCALL ($375,000.00) against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. - Costs are to be taxed against the Government. - - Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on September 30, 2009. (cbj)
|
May 19, 2009 |
Filing
54
ORDER (NOTICE OF CONSTITUTIONAL CHALLENGE TO STATE STATUTE) re 50 Notice (Other), Notice (Other) filed by ESTATE OF MICHELLE EVETTE MCCALL The court certifies to Bill McCollum, Atty Gen/State of FL, that the constitution ality of Section 766.118, Florida Statutes has been called into question in this matter. Clerk to promptly send copy of this order, a copy of the complaint 1 , deft's answer and affirmative defenses 10 , pltf's reply to deft's affirm ative defenses 15 , Plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment 20 , court's order setting trial 49 , and pltf's notice of constitutional challenge 50 , by certified mail, to the Attorney General at Office of Attorney General, State of Florida, The Capitol PL-1, Tallahassee, FL 32399-1050. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on May 19, 2009. (cc: McCollum R/R# 7008 1300 0001 8567 8938) (cbj)
|
October 31, 2008 |
Filing
21
ORDER re 20 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by ESTATE OF MICHELLE EVETTE MCCALL - The court will take the motion under advisement on November 17, 2008. (See order image for complete instructions.) Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 11/17/2008. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on October 31, 2008. (cbj)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?