ESCAMBIA COUNTY FLORIDA v. ALLIED WASTE SERVICES OF NORTH AMERICA LLC
Plaintiff: ESCAMBIA COUNTY FLORIDA
Defendant: ALLIED WASTE SERVICES OF NORTH AMERICA LLC
Case Number: 3:2008cv00088
Filed: February 29, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Escambia
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: LACEY A COLLIER
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - re 126 - This action is Dismissed with prejudice with each party to bear their own fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this file. - - Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on October 28, 2009. (cbj)
December 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER STAYING CASE - 75 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings is GRANTED. This cause is hereby STAYED for NINETY (90) DAYS or until settlement is consummated, whichever comes first. The parties shall file the appropriate notice with the Court at that time. All pending motions are held in abeyance during the pendency of this stay. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 12/18/2008. (Deadline for clerk to check status of stay by 3/30/2009.) (djb)
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER - DENIED, 51 Motion to Dismiss Count II of the Amended Counterclaim. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on November 20, 2008. (cbj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ESCAMBIA COUNTY FLORIDA v. ALLIED WASTE SERVICES OF NORTH AMERICA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALLIED WASTE SERVICES OF NORTH AMERICA LLC
Represented By: PATRICK MICHAEL PATTERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESCAMBIA COUNTY FLORIDA
Represented By: CHARLES VINCENT PEPPLER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?