GATLIN v. UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC Featured Case

Plaintiff Justin Gatlin alleged that Defendants United States Anti-Doping Agency, Inc., U.S.A. Track and Field, Inc., United States Olympic Committee and International Association of Athletics Federations had discriminated against him based upon his disability in violation of the Americans with Disabilities Act and the Rehabilitation Act of 1973. Plaintiff alleged that Defendants had penalized him for testing positive for Adderall, a prescription medicine used to treat his attention deficit disorder symptoms.

Plaintiff: JUSTIN GATLIN
Defendant: UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC, USA TRACK AND FIELD INC, UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE and INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF ATHLETICS FEDERATIONS
Case Number: 3:2008cv00241
Filed: June 9, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Escambia
Presiding Judge: LACEY A COLLIER
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 791
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2010 Filing 205 Letter from Deputy Clerk returning Plaintiff's exhibits to Atty. Joseph A. Zarzaur, Jr. (jmd)
April 26, 2010 Filing 204 Letter from Deputy Clerk returning Defendants' exhibits to Atty. Robert Conrad Palmer, III. (jmd)
July 15, 2009 Filing 203 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (BIELBY, LORENCE)
July 15, 2009 Filing 202 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (BIELBY, LORENCE)
June 26, 2009 Filing 201 FINAL JUDGMENT DISMISSING THE COMPLAINT, AS AMENDED, AND ANY ALLEGED CLAIMS OR CAUSES WHICH THE PLAINTIFF RAISED, OR COULD HAVE RAISED, IN THIS MATTER, WITH PREJUDICE, EACH OF THE PARTIES TO BEAR THEIR RESPECTIVE COSTS AND ATTORNEYS' FEES - Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 6/26/2009. (laj)
June 17, 2009 Filing 200 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (BIELBY, LORENCE)
June 17, 2009 Filing 199 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (BIELBY, LORENCE)
June 8, 2009 Filing 198 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT - Re: #197 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment Dismissing the Complaint, as Amended, and any Alleged Claims or Causes Which the Plaintiff Raised, or Could Have Raised, in this Matter, with Prejudice, Each of the Parties to Bear their Respective Costs and A filed by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC and USA TRACK AND FIELD INC - The filing party is advised, by this entry, that all proposed Orders should be emailed to the appropriate chambers at the email addresses provided on the Clerk's website at www.flnd.uscourts.gov, located under "CM/ECF" and "General Info", "Proposed Order Procedures". Attorney is requested to email the proposed Order to the appropriate Judge. (laj)
June 4, 2009 Filing 197 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment Dismissing the Complaint, as Amended, and any Alleged Claims or Causes Which the Plaintiff Raised, or Could Have Raised, in this Matter, with Prejudice, Each of the Parties to Bear their Respective Costs and Attorneys' Fees by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC, USA TRACK AND FIELD INC. (PALMER, ROBERT)
May 11, 2009 Filing 196 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (BIELBY, LORENCE)
May 11, 2009 Filing 195 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (BIELBY, LORENCE)
April 14, 2009 Filing 194 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (BIELBY, LORENCE)
April 14, 2009 Filing 193 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (BIELBY, LORENCE)
April 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER - GRANTING #190 MOTION to Extend Time for this Court to Exercise Jurisdiction and #191 Supplemental MOTION to Extend Time for this court to exercise jurisdiction. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 4/10/2009. Miscellaneous Deadline set for 5/10/2009. (laj)
April 8, 2009 Filing 191 Supplemental MOTION to Extend Time for this court to exercise jurisdiction by JUSTIN GATLIN. (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
April 8, 2009 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER notified that action is needed - Re: #190 MOTION to Extend Time for this Court to Exercise Jurisdiction and #191 Supplemental MOTION to Extend Time for this court to exercise jurisdiction. (laj)
April 3, 2009 Filing 190 MOTION to Extend Time for this Court to Exercise Jurisdiction by JUSTIN GATLIN. (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
March 16, 2009 Filing 189 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (BIELBY, LORENCE)
March 16, 2009 Filing 188 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (BIELBY, LORENCE)
February 13, 2009 Filing 187 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (BIELBY, LORENCE)
February 13, 2009 Filing 186 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (BIELBY, LORENCE)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER OF DISMISSAL - This case is DISMISSED from the active docket of the Court. In the event settlement is not consummated, the Court reserves the power, upon motion filed by any party within (60) days of the date of this Order, to amend or vacate and set aside this Order of Dismissal and reinstate this case. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 2/9/2009. (laj)
February 9, 2009 Filing 184 MEDIATION REPORT - Settlement. (laj)
February 9, 2009 Filing 183 NOTICE of Settlement and Report of Mediation by JUSTIN GATLIN (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
February 9, 2009 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER notified that action is needed - Re: #166 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment and #169 MOTION for Summary Judgment, No Responses filed. (laj)
February 9, 2009 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER notified that action is needed - Re: #183 Report of Mediation and Notice of Settlement. (laj)
February 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER - GRANTING Pltf's #181 MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to #169 USATF's First Motion for Summary Judgment and #166 USADA's Second Motion for Summary Judgment - Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 2/2/2009.Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 2/5/2009. (laj) Modified on 2/2/2009 to correct "docket text" (laj, Pensacola).
January 30, 2009 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER notified that action is needed - Re: #181 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to USATF's First Motion for Summary Judgment and USADA's Second Motion for Summary Judgment. (laj)
January 29, 2009 Filing 181 MOTION to Extend Time to Respond to USATF's First Motion for Summary Judgment and USADA's Second Motion for Summary Judgment by JUSTIN GATLIN. (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER AND NOTICE - Re: #166 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC and #169 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by USA TRACK AND FIELD INC - These motions will be taken under advisement by the Court on 1/30/2009. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 1/16/2009. Notify Chambers on 1/30/2009. (laj) Modified on 1/16/2009 to correct "docket text" (laj).
January 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER - GRANTING #162 Motion for Extension of Discovery Deadline, Mediation Deadline and Trial Date. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 1/16/2009. (laj)
January 16, 2009 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER notified that action is needed - Re: #166 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment and #169 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (laj)
January 16, 2009 Set Deadline - Mediation to take place by 3/31/2009, pursuant to #179 Order. (laj)
January 15, 2009 Filing 178 NOTICE OF MEDIATION re Scheduling - Mediation set for 2/4/2009, at 1:30 P.M. before Charles L. Cetti, Mediator. (laj)
January 15, 2009 Filing 177 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by JUSTIN GATLIN. (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
January 15, 2009 Filing 176 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by JUSTIN GATLIN. (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
January 15, 2009 Filing 175 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (BIELBY, LORENCE)
January 15, 2009 Filing 174 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (BIELBY, LORENCE)
January 15, 2009 Filing 173 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC. (PALMER, ROBERT)
January 15, 2009 Filing 172 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC. (PALMER, ROBERT)
January 15, 2009 Filing 171 STATEMENT OF FACTS in Support of Re: #169 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by USA TRACK AND FIELD INC. (PALMER, ROBERT)
January 15, 2009 Filing 170 MEMORANDUM in Support re #169 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by USA TRACK AND FIELD INC. (PALMER, ROBERT)
January 15, 2009 Filing 169 MOTION for Summary Judgment by USA TRACK AND FIELD INC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 2/2/2009). (PALMER, ROBERT)
January 15, 2009 Filing 168 First NOTICE OF MEDIATION re Scheduling Order by JUSTIN GATLIN (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
January 15, 2009 Filing 167 MEMORANDUM in Support re #166 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC. (BOCK, WILLIAM)
January 15, 2009 Filing 166 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 2/2/2009). (BOCK, WILLIAM)
January 14, 2009 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER notified that action is needed - Re: #162 MOTION to Extend Time of discovery deadline, mediation deadline and trial date. (laj)
January 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER - GRANTING #147 Motion to Stay. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 1/6/2009. (laj)
December 31, 2008 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER notified that action is needed - Re: #147 MOTION to Stay Discovery (Pltf objects, Dft USOC does not object). Previous "Action Required" mistakenly sent to Magistrate Judge. (laj)
December 30, 2008 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE - Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed - Re: #147 MOTION to Stay Discovery (Pltf objects, Dft USOC does not object). Motion referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (laj)
December 30, 2008 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER notified that action is needed - Re: #150 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #163 Response to Motion and #164 Statement of Facts. (laj)
December 29, 2008 Filing 164 STATEMENT OF FACTS Rule 56.1 Re: #150 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
December 29, 2008 Filing 163 RESPONSE to Motion re #150 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by JUSTIN GATLIN. (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
December 24, 2008 Filing 162 MOTION to Extend Time of discovery deadline, mediation deadline and trial date by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (LONDOT, JOHN)
December 15, 2008 Filing 161 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by JUSTIN GATLIN. (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
December 15, 2008 Filing 160 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by JUSTIN GATLIN. (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
December 15, 2008 Filing 159 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC. (PALMER, ROBERT)
December 15, 2008 Filing 158 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC. (PALMER, ROBERT)
December 10, 2008 Filing 157 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (BIELBY, LORENCE)
December 10, 2008 Filing 156 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (BIELBY, LORENCE)
December 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER - DENYING as moot, #148 Motion to Quash. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 12/9/2008. (laj)
December 9, 2008 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER notified that action is needed - Re: #150 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (laj)
December 9, 2008 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE - Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed - Re: #148 MOTION to Quash UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE'S MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF NCAA and #154 Response to Motion. Motion referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (laj)
December 8, 2008 Filing 154 RESPONSE to Motion re #148 MOTION to Quash UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE'S MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF NCAA filed by JUSTIN GATLIN. (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
December 8, 2008 Filing 153 MEMORANDUM in Support re #150 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A-) (BOCK, WILLIAM)
December 8, 2008 Filing 152 AFFIDAVIT re #150 MOTION for Summary Judgment Affidavit of Dr. Larry Bowers by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A-) (BOCK, WILLIAM)
December 8, 2008 Filing 151 STATEMENT OF FACTS Re: #150 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (BOCK, WILLIAM)
December 8, 2008 Filing 150 MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 12/26/2008). (BOCK, WILLIAM)
December 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER Plaintiff shall respond to Defendant USOCs #148 MOTION to Quash on or before TUESDAY, DECEMBER 9, 2008, by noon. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 12/5/2008. (Response to motion due by 12/9/2008.) (djb)
December 4, 2008 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE - Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed - Re: #148 MOTION to Quash UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE'S MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF NCAA. Motion referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (laj)
December 3, 2008 Filing 148 MOTION to Quash UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE'S MOTION TO QUASH PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF NCAA by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Notice of Deposition) (LONDOT, JOHN)
December 3, 2008 Filing 147 MOTION to Stay Discovery by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC. (BOCK, WILLIAM)
December 3, 2008 Set Deadline - Response to #147 Motion due by 12/21/2008). (laj)
November 26, 2008 Filing 146 NOTICE OF MEDIATION re Scheduling MEDIATOR APPOINTMENT by JUSTIN GATLIN (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER denying #141 Motion to Compel. The motion is denied as moot (see Doc. 144).s/Elizabeth M. TimothyUnited States Magistrate Judge on 11/26/2008. (tsm)
November 26, 2008 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE - Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed - Re: #144 Notice of Resolution of Discovery Dispute. (laj)
November 25, 2008 Filing 144 NOTICE of Resolution of Discovery Dispute by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC re #141 MOTION to Compel USADA TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A-) (BOCK, WILLIAM)
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER CONCERNING DISCOVERY DISPUTES - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 11/20/2008. (laj)
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER - Re: #141 MOTION to Compel - Dft USADA shall respond to Pltf's Motion on or before Tuesday, 11/25/2008. Prior to responding, Dft USADA shall fully review this Court's "Order Concerning Discovery Disputes", which will be issued by separate Order on today's date. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 11/20/2008. (laj)
November 20, 2008 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE - Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed - Re: #141 MOTION to Compel USADA TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT. Motion referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (laj)
November 19, 2008 Filing 141 MOTION to Compel USADA TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY AND MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT by JUSTIN GATLIN. (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
November 13, 2008 Filing 140 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by JUSTIN GATLIN. (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
November 13, 2008 Filing 139 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by JUSTIN GATLIN. (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
November 13, 2008 Filing 138 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC. (PALMER, ROBERT)
November 13, 2008 Filing 137 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC. (PALMER, ROBERT)
November 12, 2008 Filing 136 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (BIELBY, LORENCE)
November 12, 2008 Filing 135 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (BIELBY, LORENCE)
November 12, 2008 CASE REFERRED to Mediation - pursuant to #103 Order. (laj)
November 10, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER denying #130 Motion to Strike Response. As stated in Local Rule 56.1, should a material fact not be controverted by the opposing party, it will be deemed admitted. Granting #111 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. Discovery against this Defendant is hereby STAYED during the pendency of Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court will order that a revised Joint Report concerning discovery matters be filed by the Parties should such become necessary after the Court rules upon the Motion for Summary Judgment. Granting #131 MOTION for Leave to File SUPPLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS FILED IN OPPOSITION TO USOCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by JUSTIN GATLIN. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 11/10/08. (lcu)
November 10, 2008 Filing 133 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM BOCK, III on behalf of UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC (BOCK, WILLIAM)
November 10, 2008 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER notified that action is needed Re: #130 MOTION to Strike #128 Response to Motion, For Summary Judgment and #132 Response to Motion (lcu)
November 9, 2008 Filing 132 RESPONSE to Motion re #130 MOTION to Strike #128 Response to Motion, For Summary Judgment and to Strike Plaintiff's Supplemental Rule 56.1 Statement of Facts or In The Alternative, to Reply to the Plaintiff's Response filed by JUSTIN GATLIN. (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
November 6, 2008 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER notified that action is needed - Re: #131 MOTION for Leave to File SUPPLEMENT TO PLAINTIFFS EXHIBITS FILED IN OPPOSITION TO USOCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. (laj)
October 28, 2008 Filing 131 MOTION for Leave to File SUPPLEMENT TO PLAINTIFFS EXHIBITS FILED IN OPPOSITION TO USOCS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by JUSTIN GATLIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Signature Page) (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
October 22, 2008 Filing 130 MOTION to Strike #128 Response to Motion, For Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 11/10/2008). (FLEMING, JOSEPH)
October 20, 2008 Filing 129 STATEMENT OF FACTS RE: PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL RULE 56.1 Re: #128 Response to Motion,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14) (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
October 20, 2008 Filing 128 RESPONSE to Motion re #112 MOTION for Summary Judgment by USOC filed by JUSTIN GATLIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11) (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
October 20, 2008 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER notified that action is needed - Re: #111 MOTION to Stay Discovery, #112 MOTION for Summary Judgment and #113 Statement of Facts; and #128 Response to Motion and #129 Statement of Facts. (laj)
October 16, 2008 Filing 127 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC. (PALMER, ROBERT)
October 16, 2008 Filing 126 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC. (PALMER, ROBERT)
October 14, 2008 Filing 125 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by JUSTIN GATLIN. (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
October 14, 2008 Filing 124 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by JUSTIN GATLIN. (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
October 13, 2008 Filing 123 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (BIELBY, LORENCE)
October 13, 2008 Filing 122 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (BIELBY, LORENCE)
October 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER - Re: #114 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - The Dft INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF ATHLETICS FEDERATION is hereby DISMISSED from this action with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 10/9/2008. (laj)
October 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting #117 . Defendant "USADA's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's First Set of Discovery Requests" is hereby GRANTED. The deadline for Defendant to respond is extended to THURSDAY, OCTOBER 16, 2008.s/Elizabeth M. TimothyUnited States Magistrate Judge on 10/9/2008. (tsm)
October 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER - GRANTING #116 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #112 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 10/9/2008. Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 10/20/2008. (laj)
October 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER - GRANTING #115 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw As Pltf's Counsel. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 410/9/2008. (laj)
October 9, 2008 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE - Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed - Re: #117 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Motion referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (laj)
October 9, 2008 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER notified that action is needed - Re: #115 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel and #116 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to USOC's Motion for Summary Judgment. (laj)
October 8, 2008 Filing 117 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC. (PALMER, ROBERT)
October 8, 2008 Filing 116 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to USOC's Motion for Summary Judgment by JUSTIN GATLIN. (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
October 8, 2008 Filing 115 Consent MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel by JUSTIN GATLIN. (GOWDY, BRYAN)
October 7, 2008 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER notified that action is needed - Re: #114 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (laj)
October 3, 2008 Filing 114 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JUSTIN GATLIN (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
October 2, 2008 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER notified that action is needed - Re: #106 MOTION to Dismiss, No Response filed. (laj)
September 30, 2008 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER notified that action is needed - Re: #112 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (laj)
September 29, 2008 Filing 113 STATEMENT OF FACTS In Support of Motion for Final Summary Judgment Re: #112 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (Attachments: #1 Appendix DE:1, #2 Appendix DE:4, #3 Appendix DE:5, #4 Appendix DE5:Ex.A, #5 Appendix DE5:Ex.B, #6 Appendix DE5:Ex.C, #7 Appendix DE5:Ex.D, #8 Appendix DE:5:Ex.G, #9 Appendix D:12, #10 Appendix DE:16-2, #11 Appendix DE:16-5, #12 Appendix DE:16-6, #13 Appendix DE;16-8, #14 Appendix DE:16-9, #15 Appendix DE:16-10, #16 Appendix DE:16-16, #17 Appendix DE:19, #18 Appendix DE:20, #19 Appendix DE:22-5, #20 Appendix DE:22-6, #21 Appendix DE22-8, #22 Appendix DE:22-10, #23 Appendix DE:22-13, #24 Appendix DE:24-13, #25 Appendix DE:29-3, #26 Appendix DE:29-6, #27 Appendix DE:30-4, #28 Appendix DE:30-7, #29 Appendix DE:31-2, #30 Appendix DE:31-3, #31 Appendix DE:36, #32 Appendix DE:39, #33 Appendix DE:54, #34 Appendix DE:59-2, #35 Appendix DE:69, #36 Appendix DE:76, #37 Appendix DE:77, #38 Appendix DE:92, #39 Appendix DE:96, #40 Appendix DE:100, #41 Appendix DE:106-7, #42 Appendix DE:107-2) (FLEMING, JOSEPH)
September 29, 2008 Filing 112 MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 10/17/2008). (FLEMING, JOSEPH)
September 29, 2008 Filing 111 MOTION to Stay Discovery by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (FLEMING, JOSEPH)
September 26, 2008 Set Deadline - Dft to file Motion for Summary Judgment due by 9/29/2008 - pursuant to 110 Order. (laj)
September 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER granting #109 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant United States Olympic Committee is hereby granted a one-business-day extension, to September 29, 2008, to serve its Rule 26(a)(1)(A) initial disclosures and to file its motion for summary judgment. s/Elizabeth M. TimothyUnited States Magistrate Judge on 9/26/2008. (tsm)
September 25, 2008 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE - Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed - Re: #109 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26 Disclosures. Motion referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (laj)
September 24, 2008 Filing 109 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26 Disclosures by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (LONDOT, JOHN)
September 23, 2008 Filing 108 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSEPH Z FLEMING on behalf of UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE (FLEMING, JOSEPH)
September 16, 2008 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER notified that action is needed - Re: #107 Notice of Filing. (laj)
September 12, 2008 Filing 107 NOTICE OF FILING ARBITRAL AWARD by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (WALTER, ELAINE)
September 12, 2008 Filing 106 MOTION to Dismiss by INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF ATHLETICS FEDERATIONS. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 9/30/2008). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 Constitituition, #3 Exhibit 2 IAAF Competition Rules, #4 Exhibit 3 IAAF Competition Rules, #5 Exhibit 4 CAS Statutes, #6 Exhibit 5 Request for Reinstatement) (PALMER, ROBERT)
September 11, 2008 Filing 105 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC. (PALMER, ROBERT)
September 11, 2008 Filing 104 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC. (PALMER, ROBERT)
September 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 9/11/2008. (laj)
September 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER ADOPTING PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN - Re: #99 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. All Discovery ends 12/26/2008. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 9/11/2008. (laj)
September 10, 2008 Filing 101 NOTICE of Appearance by ELAINE DAWN WALTER on behalf of UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE (WALTER, ELAINE)
September 9, 2008 Filing 100 USA Track and Field, Inc. ANSWER to #76 Amended Complaint by USA TRACK AND FIELD INC. (PALMER, ROBERT)
September 9, 2008 Reset Deadline - Discovery due by 12/26/2008 - pursuant to #93 Order. (laj)
September 9, 2008 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER notified that action is needed - Re: #99 Joint Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (laj)
September 8, 2008 Filing 99 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (LONDOT, JOHN)
September 8, 2008 Filing 98 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by JUSTIN GATLIN. (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
September 8, 2008 Filing 97 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by JUSTIN GATLIN. (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
September 8, 2008 Filing 96 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to #76 (First Amended Complaint) by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC. (PALMER, ROBERT) Modified on 9/9/2008 to correct "docket text". (laj)
September 8, 2008 Filing 95 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (BIELBY, LORENCE)
September 8, 2008 Filing 94 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (BIELBY, LORENCE)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER - GRANTING #91 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time - Re: Response to Amended Complaint, and Enlargement of Certain Pre-Trial Compliance Deadlines. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 9/8/2008. (laj)
September 5, 2008 Filing 92 ANSWER to #76 Amended Complaint ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES IN RESPONSE TO THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT OF DEFENDANT UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (BIELBY, LORENCE)
September 5, 2008 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER notified that action is needed - Re: #91 MOTION to Extend Time UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME, AND ENLARGEMENT OF CERTAIN PRE-TRIAL COMPLIANCE DEADLINES. (laj)
September 4, 2008 Filing 91 MOTION to Extend Time UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME, AND ENLARGEMENT OF CERTAIL PRE-TRIAL COMPLIANCE DEADLINES by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (BIELBY, LORENCE)
August 26, 2008 Filing 90 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (LONDOT, JOHN)
August 25, 2008 Filing 89 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by USA TRACK AND FIELD INC. (PALMER, ROBERT)
August 25, 2008 Filing 88 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF ATHLETICS FEDERATIONS. (PALMER, ROBERT)
August 25, 2008 Filing 87 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC. (PALMER, ROBERT)
August 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 86 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 8/26/2008; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/25/2008; Discovery due by 12/5/2008. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 8/12/2008. (laj)
August 11, 2008 Filing 85 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS - SEALED PORTION by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (BIELBY, LORENCE)
August 11, 2008 Filing 84 ATTORNEY TIME RECORDS by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (BIELBY, LORENCE)
August 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER - GRANTING #80 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond/Answer to #76 First Amended Complaint. UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC's Answer due 9/8/2008. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 8/7/2008. (laj)
August 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER - GRANTING #79 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond/Answer to #76 First Amended Complaint. USA TRACK AND FIELD INC's Answer due 9/8/2008. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 8/7/2008. (laj)
August 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER - GRANTING #78 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond/Answer to #76 First Amended Complaint. UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE's Answer 9/5/2008. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 8/7/2008. (laj)
August 6, 2008 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER notified that action is needed - Re: #78 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint, #79 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint and #80 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to First Amended Complaint and #76 First Amended Complaint (with Proposed ISO). (laj)
August 5, 2008 Filing 80 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #76 Amended Complaint by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC. (PALMER, ROBERT)
August 5, 2008 Filing 79 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #76 Amended Complaint by USA TRACK AND FIELD INC. (PALMER, ROBERT)
August 5, 2008 Filing 78 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO RESPOND TO AMENDED COMPLAINT by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (BIELBY, LORENCE)
July 22, 2008 Filing 77 - 1) GRANTING Pltf's #71 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Since no responsive pleading has been filed, Pltf may amend his Complaint once as a matter of course. 2) DENYING Dft's UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE's #69 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice to its renewal in relation to the Amended Complaint. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 7/22/2008. (laj)
July 21, 2008 Filing 76 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants all defendants., filed by JUSTIN GATLIN. (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
July 21, 2008 Filing 75 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT - Re: #71 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by JUSTIN GATLIN - Attorney's attention is directed to ND of FL Local Rule 15.1. Amendments of Pleadings. When leave is sought to amend a pleading pursuant to a motion, the motion and the proposed amended pleading shall be filed and docketed separately. The proposed amended pleading shall not take effect unless and until the motion to amend is granted.The attorney is directed to immediately file the Amended Complaint separately. (laj)
July 15, 2008 Filing 74 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Gary Johansen/Associate General Counsel on July 9, 2008, filed by JUSTIN GATLIN. (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
July 15, 2008 Filing 73 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Dede Rohrer/HR & Finance Coordinator on July 9, 2008, filed by JUSTIN GATLIN. (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
July 15, 2008 Filing 72 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed by Internation Association of Athletics Federatons Acknowledgment filed by JUSTIN GATLIN. (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
July 14, 2008 Filing 71 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by JUSTIN GATLIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit One) (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
July 10, 2008 Filing 70 MANDATE of USCA as to #39 Notice of Appeal, filed by JUSTIN GATLIN (lcu)
July 10, 2008 Filing 69 MOTION to Dismiss COMPLAINT (CORRECTED FOR CERTIFICATE OF CONFERENCE) by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 7/28/2008). (LONDOT, JOHN)
July 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting #66 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by USA TRACK AND FIELD INC. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 7/9/08. Answer due by 7/18/2008. (lcu)
July 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER OF DEFICIENCY re #64 MOTION to Dismiss COMPLAINT filed by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. The document shall remain in the electronic file, but the court will not consider it until you have corrected the above deficiencies through the filing of a corrected document. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 7/9/08. (lcu)
July 9, 2008 Filing 66 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by USA TRACK AND FIELD INC. (PALMER, ROBERT)
July 9, 2008 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER notified that action is needed Re: #66 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. (lcu)
July 8, 2008 Filing 64 ***TERMINATED MOTION to Dismiss COMPLAINT by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 7/28/2008). (LONDOT, JOHN) *** Terminated pursuant to #67 Order. Modified on 7/9/2008 (lcu).
July 8, 2008 Filing 63 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons/Complaint served on USA Track & Field/Lamont Jones on 06/16/2008, filed by JUSTIN GATLIN. (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
July 2, 2008 Filing 62 USCA Case Number 08-13572-FF - Re: #39 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #36 Order on Motion for TRO, by JUSTIN GATLIN. (laj)
June 27, 2008 Filing 61 NOTICE of Filing Transcript (Part III) by Court Reporter in District Court - re: #39 Notice of Appeal, #23 Notice of Appeal Court Reporter: Gwen Kesinger (gk)
June 27, 2008 Filing 60 TRANSCRIPT Acknowledgment - Part II re #39 Notice of Appeal, #23 Notice of Appeal Court Reporter:Gwen Kesinger (gk)
June 26, 2008 Filing 59 NOTICE of Filing by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order of Appellate Court 06 26 08) (PALMER, ROBERT)
June 26, 2008 Filing 58 NOTICE of Filing Declaration by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE re #46 Response to Motion, #53 Response to Motion, (BIELBY, LORENCE)
June 26, 2008 Filing 57 REPLY to #52 Response to #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal under Fed. R. App. P. 8 filed by JUSTIN GATLIN - filed pursuant to #56 Order. (laj)
June 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER - GRANTING Pltf's #48 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum in Support of #44 Emergency Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal. The clerk shall file the Reply. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 6/26/2008. (laj)
June 26, 2008 Filing 55 USCA PROCEDURAL LETTER - Re: #39 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #36 Order on Motion for TRO, by JUSTIN GATLIN - USCA Appeal Number: 08-13572-F. (laj)
June 26, 2008 Filing 54 MANDATE of USCA as to #23 Notice of Appeal filed by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE - USCA Appeal Number: 08-13541-F - Clerk's Entry of Dismissal pursuant to Appeallant's Motion to Dismiss. (laj)
June 26, 2008 Filing 53 RESPONSE to Motion re #48 MOTION for Leave to File re #46 Response to Motion, #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal under Fed. R. App. P. 8 MOTION for Leave to File re #46 Response to Motion, #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal under Fed. R. App. P. 8 filed by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (BIELBY, LORENCE)
June 26, 2008 Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition re #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal under Fed. R. App. P. 8 filed by INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF ATHLETICS FEDERATIONS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit IAAF Memo in Opposition to Appellants Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal) (PALMER, ROBERT)
June 26, 2008 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT CONRAD PALMER, III on behalf of INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF ATHLETICS FEDERATIONS (PALMER, ROBERT)
June 26, 2008 Filing 50 NOTICE of Filing Corrected Declaration-Expert Report on Swiss Law by JUSTIN GATLIN re #46 Response to Motion, #48 MOTION for Leave to File re #46 Response to Motion, #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal under Fed. R. App. P. 8 MOTION for Leave to File re #46 Response to Motion, #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal under Fed. R. App. P. 8, #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal under Fed. R. App. P. 8, #49 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), Notice (Other) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Corrected Declaration-Expert Report on Swiss Law) (GOWDY, BRYAN)
June 26, 2008 Filing 49 NOTICE of Filng Declaration-Expert Report on Swiss Law in Support of Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal by JUSTIN GATLIN re #46 Response to Motion, #48 MOTION for Leave to File re #46 Response to Motion, #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal under Fed. R. App. P. 8 MOTION for Leave to File re #46 Response to Motion, #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal under Fed. R. App. P. 8, #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal under Fed. R. App. P. 8 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration-Expert Report on Swiss Law) (GOWDY, BRYAN)
June 26, 2008 Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to File re #46 Response to Motion, #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal under Fed. R. App. P. 8 by JUSTIN GATLIN. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion for Injunction Pending Appeal) (GOWDY, BRYAN)
June 26, 2008 Filing 47 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS and NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS OF TRANSCRIPT REDACTION REQUIREMENTS re: #21 Motion Hearing, held on 6-23-08 before Judge Lacey A. Collier by Court Reporter Gwen Kesinger A transcript of a court proceeding is available for viewing at the Office of the Clerk of Court in the above-captioned case. This transcript has been filed under seal pending a review pursuant to Judicial Conference Privacy Policies. The parties have five (5) days to file with the clerk a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no notice is filed by the deadline, the attorney will be deemed to have certified that no redactions are needed. Any party needing to purchase a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase it from the court reporter. Applicable deadlines under 11th Cir. R. 12-1 will be calculated from the date of this notice. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due by 7/3/2008. Transcript to be unsealed by 9/29/2008 if no redaction request filed. (gk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/26/2008: #1 Corrected) (tdg).
June 26, 2008 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER notified that action is needed - Re: #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal under Fed. R. App. P. 8, #45 Notice of Filing and #46 Response to Motion. (laj) Modified on 6/26/2008 to correct "linkage". (laj, Pensacola).
June 26, 2008 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER notified that action is needed - Re: #48 MOTION for Leave to File re #46 Response to Motion, #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal under Fed. R. App. P. 8 MOTION for Leave to File re #46 Response to Motion, #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal under Fed. R. App. P. 8 and #49 Notice of Filing. (laj)
June 26, 2008 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER notified that action is needed Re: #50 Notice of Filing, #52 Response in Opposition to Motion and #53 Response to Motion. (laj)
June 25, 2008 Filing 46 RESPONSE to Motion re #44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal under Fed. R. App. P. 8 filed by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (BIELBY, LORENCE)
June 25, 2008 Filing 45 NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS by JUSTIN GATLIN (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit L, #2 Exhibit Exhibit M, #3 Exhibit Exhibit N, #4 Exhibit Exhibit O, #5 Exhibit Exhibit P) (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
June 25, 2008 Filing 44 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Pending Appeal under Fed. R. App. P. 8 by JUSTIN GATLIN. (GOWDY, BRYAN)
June 25, 2008 Filing 43 USCA PROCEDURAL LETTER re: #23 NOTICE OF APPEAL filed by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. USCA Appeal # 08-13541-F. (kvg)
June 25, 2008 Filing 42 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by JUSTIN GATLIN for proceedings held on 06/23/2008 before Judge Collier, re #39 Notice of Appeal, Court Reporter:Gwen Kesinger Transcript due by 6/26/2008. (GOWDY, BRYAN)
June 25, 2008 Filing 41 Transmission of Notice of Interlocutory Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #39 Notice of Appeal filed by JUSTIN GATLIN. (Notice of Appeal also emailed to USCA) (kvg)
June 25, 2008 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN STEWART MILLS on behalf of JUSTIN GATLIN (MILLS, JOHN)
June 25, 2008 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #36 Order on Motion for TRO, by JUSTIN GATLIN. ( Filing fee $455 Receipt Number 11290000000000997925.) Notify Chambers on 6/25/2008. Appeal Record due by 6/25/2008. Certificate of Readiness due by 6/25/2008. Transcript due by 6/25/2008. Transcript Order Form due by 6/25/2008. (GOWDY, BRYAN)
June 25, 2008 Filing 38 NOTICE of Appearance by BRYAN SCOTT GOWDY on behalf of JUSTIN GATLIN (GOWDY, BRYAN)
June 25, 2008 Set Deadlines re #39 Notice of Appeal filed by JUSTIN GATLIN:(Transcript Order Form due by 7/9/2008). Prior Appeal Deadlines Terminated - set by Counsel in error. (kvg)
June 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER - 1) The #4 Motion for TRO entered by the Court on 6/20/2008, is hereby DISSOLVED and VACATED. 2) Pltf JUSTIN GATLIN's #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 7/24/2008. (laj)
June 24, 2008 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT CONRAD PALMER, III on behalf of USA TRACK AND FIELD INC (PALMER, ROBERT)
June 24, 2008 Filing 34 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #23 Notice of Appeal filed by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (Notice of Appeal also emailed to USCA in light of Olympic Trials commencing 6/27/08) (kvg)
June 23, 2008 Set Deadlines re #23 Notice of Appeal filed by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE : Transcript Order Form due by 7/7/2008. (kvg)
June 23, 2008 Filing 33 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (continued) by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Justin Gatlins Motion to Strike, #2 Exhibit Transcript of Proceedings in AAA No. 30 190 00170 07 Arbitration, #3 Exhibit Transcript of Proceedings in AAA No. 30 190 00170 07 Arbitration) (PALMER, ROBERT)
June 23, 2008 Filing 32 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (continued) by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Transcript of Proceedings in AAA No. 30 190 00170 07 Arbitration, #2 Exhibit Transcript of Proceedings in AAA No. 30 190 00170 07 Arbitration, #3 Exhibit Transcript of Proceedings in AAA No. 30 190 00170 07 Arbitration, #4 Exhibit Transcript of Proceedings in AAA No. 30 190 00170 07 Arbitration, #5 Exhibit Transcript of Proceedings in AAA No. 30 190 00170 07 Arbitration) (PALMER, ROBERT)
June 23, 2008 Filing 31 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (continued) by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Reply Brief Submitted by Justin Gatlin in the CAS 2008/A/1461 & CAS 2008/A/1462 Arbitrations, #2 Exhibit Response of the IAAF and Supporting Documents in the CAS 2008/A/1461 & CAS 2008/A/1462 Arbitrations, #3 Exhibit Witness Statement of Eugene D. Gulland in CAS 2008/A/1461 & CAS 2008/A/1462 Arbitrations, #4 Exhibit Order of Procedure in the CAS 2008/A/1461 & CAS 2008/A/1462 Arbitrations executed by Maurice Suh, Counsel for Justin Gatlin, #5 Exhibit Letter from Matthieu Reeb, Secretary General, CAS, to all counsel Re: hearing procedure and arrangements in the CAS 2008/A/1461 & CAS 2008/A/1462 Arbitrations, #6 Exhibit Letter from Matthieu Reeb, Secretary General, CAS, to all counsel Re: hearing procedure and arrangements in the CAS 2008/A/1461 & CAS 2008/A/1462 Arbitrations, #7 Exhibit Decision of the Panel without Grounds in the CAS 2008/A/1461 & CAS 2008/A/1462 Arbitrations) (PALMER, ROBERT)
June 23, 2008 Filing 30 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (continued) by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Dissent of Christopher Campbell in AAA No. 30 190 00170 07 Arbitration, #2 Exhibit USADAs Response to Respondents Motion Pursuant to Rule 48 to Modify Start Date of His Sanction in AAA No. 30 190 00170 07 Arbitration, #3 Exhibit IAAF Statement of Appeal to the Court of Arbitration of Sport (CAS) from the AAA decision in AAA No. 30 190 00170 07 Arbitration, #4 Exhibit Brief Submitted by Justin Gatlin in the CAS 2008/A/1461 & CAS 2008/A/1462 Arbitrations, #5 Exhibit 36 United States Code Chapter 2205, a.k.a. The Ted Stevens Amateur Sports Act, #6 Exhibit Justin Gatlins Witness Statements in the CAS 2008/A/1461 & CAS 2008/A/1462 Arbitrations, #7 Exhibit Letter from William Bock, III, General Counsel, USADA, to Matthieu Reeb Re: portions adopted by USADA of the Answer of the IAAF to the Brief of Mr. Gatlin) (PALMER, ROBERT)
June 23, 2008 Filing 29 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Continued by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order of Panel in AAA No. 30 190 00170 07 Arbitration to parties for briefing and hearing on the decision of the Panel in the AAA No. 30 190 00546 01 Arbitration, #2 Exhibit USATF Regulation 10(b), Doping Control, #3 Exhibit USADAs Brief on Justin Gatlins First Doping Offence [AAA No. 30 190 00546 01 Arbitration] in AAA No. 30 190 00170 07 Arbitration, #4 Exhibit Justin Gatlins Response to Hearing Panels August 13, 2007 Order Requesting Additional Information, #5 Exhibit Justin Gatlins Memorandum Regarding the Issue of Fault in the 2001 Arbitration, #6 Exhibit USADAs Reply Brief in AAA No. 30 190 00170 07 Arbitration, #7 Exhibit Justin Gatlins Reply to USADAs Post-Hearing Brief in AAA No. 30 190 00170 07 Arbitration, #8 Exhibit IAAF Constitution, #9 Exhibit Award of Arbitrators in AAA No. 30 190 00170 07 Arbitration) (PALMER, ROBERT)
June 23, 2008 Filing 28 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (Continued) by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Second Stipulation of Uncontested Facts and Issues between USADA and Justin Gatlin in AAA No. 30 190 00170 07 Arbitration, #2 Exhibit Justin Gatlins Pre-Hearing Brief in AAA No. 30 190 00170 07 Arbitration, #3 Exhibit Justin Gatlins Proposed Witness List in AAA No. 30 190 00170 07 Arbitration, #4 Exhibit USADAs Pre-Hearing Brief in AAA No. 30 190 00170 07 Arbitration, #5 Errata News Articles submitted as exhibits for USADA in AAA No. 30 190 00170 07 Arbitration) (PALMER, ROBERT)
June 23, 2008 Filing 27 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Continued by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Olympic Charter Part II) (PALMER, ROBERT)
June 23, 2008 Filing 26 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (continued) by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Olympic Charter) (PALMER, ROBERT)
June 23, 2008 Filing 25 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (continued) by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter from Travis Tygart, CEO, USADA, to Justin Gatlin and Counsel Re: decision of the USADA Anti-Doping Review Board recommending that adjudication proceed against Justin Gatlin) (PALMER, ROBERT)
June 23, 2008 Filing 24 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits (Continued) by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter from Istvan Gyulai, General Secretary, IAAF, to Member Federations Re: Statement of the IAAF Council in ADD-related Cases, #2 Exhibit IAAF News, N. 57, reporting the Statement of the IAAF Council in ADD-related Cases, #3 Exhibit World Anti-Doping Code, #4 Exhibit United States Olympic Committee National Anti-Doping Policies, #5 Exhibit IAAF Anti-Doping Regulations, #6 Exhibit IAAF Procedural Guidelines for Doping Control, #7 Exhibit UCLA Olympic Analytical Laboratorys Confidential Drug Testing Report Re: USADA 7712, Specimen 496040 (Track & Field Kansas Relays), #8 Exhibit UCLA Laboratory Document Package for Specimen 496040 A Sample, #9 Exhibit Letter from Linda Barnes, Testing Results Manager, USADA, to Justin Gatlin Re: notification of positive test result for testosterone of Specimen 496040 A Sample, #10 Exhibit UCLA Laboratory Document Package for Specimen 496040 B Sample, #11 Errata Letter from Linda Barnes, Testing Results Manager, USADA, to Justin Gatlin Re: notification of positive test result for testosterone of Specimen 496040 B Sample, #12 Exhibit Stipulation of Uncontested Facts and Issues Between USADA and Justin Gatlin Re: Specimen 496040) (PALMER, ROBERT)
June 23, 2008 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #12 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,, Order on Motion for TRO,,, by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. ( Filing fee $455 Receipt Number 11290000000000996784.) (BIELBY, LORENCE)
June 23, 2008 Filing 22 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Court of Arbitration of Sport (CAS) Code of Sports-Related Arbitration Edition 2004, #2 Exhibit Exhibit L to the International Association of Athletic Associations (IAAF) Procedural Guidelines for Doping Control, #3 Exhibit IAAF Handbook 2000-2001, Division II, IAAF Constitution, #4 Exhibit IAAF Handbook 2000-2001, Division III, Control of Drug Abuse, #5 Exhibit IAAF Procedural Guidelines for Doping Control, #6 Exhibit United States Anti-Doping Agency (USADA) Guide to Prohibited Classes of Substances and Prohibited Methods of Doping, #7 Exhibit Justin Gatlins Registration Form & Release re. 2001 Junior National Championships, #8 Exhibit USADA Doping Control Official Record for Justin Gatlin, Sample Code No. 456473, #9 Exhibit Letters from Justin Gatlins Submission to the USADA Anti-Doping Review Board, #10 Exhibit Letter from Terrence P. Madden, USADA CEO, to Justin Gatlin, Brian Winn, American Arbitration Association (AAA) and Gabriel Dolle, IAAF Doping Control Officer Re: notification of Justin Gatlins request for a hearing before a three-member AAA panel, #11 Exhibit Justin Gatlins Witness List for AAA No. 30 190 00546 01 Arbitration, #12 Exhibit Parties Stipulation for AAA No. 30 190 00546 01 Arbitration, #13 Exhibit Justin Gatlins Position on Suspension for AAA No. 30 190 00546 01 Arbitration, #14 Exhibit USADAs Position on Sanctions for AAA No. 30 190 00546 01 Arbitration, #15 Exhibit Decision of the Panel in AAA No. 30 190 00546 01 Arbitration, #16 Exhibit Justin Gatlins Request for Early Reinstatement to USA Track & Field (USATF), #17 Exhibit Letter from Istvan Gyulai, General Secretary, IAAF, to Craig Masback, USATF, acknowledging receipt of USATFs petition for early reinstatement for Justin Gatlin, #18 Exhibit IAAF Council press release including announcing the reinstatement of Justin Gatlin, #19 Exhibit USATF News & Notes reporting the IAAFs reinstatement of Justin Gatlin, #20 Exhibit USATF Elite Beat reporting the IAAFs reinstatement of Justin Gatlin) (PALMER, ROBERT)
June 23, 2008 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER:Motion Hearing held on 6/23/2008 re #4 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiff'sFirst MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Plaintiff's filed by JUSTIN GATLIN. (Court Reporter Gwen Kesinger.) (jrm)
June 23, 2008 Filing 20 NOTICE of Filing by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE re #15 Response to Motion (LONDOT, JOHN)
June 23, 2008 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE re #15 Response to Motion (LONDOT, JOHN)
June 23, 2008 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER notified that action is needed - Re: #14 First MOTION for Leave to File Witness Telephonic and/or Deposition Testimony. (laj)
June 22, 2008 Filing 18 NOTICE of Filing Exhibit List for June 23, 2008 Hearing by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC re #17 Response in Opposition to Motion, (PALMER, ROBERT)
June 22, 2008 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiff'sFirst MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Plaintiff's filed by UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment A) (PALMER, ROBERT)
June 22, 2008 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing in Support by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE re #15 Response to Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 2A, #4 Exhibit 2B, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 3A, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 8A, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11) (BIELBY, LORENCE)
June 22, 2008 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiff'sFirst MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Plaintiff's filed by UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE. (BIELBY, LORENCE)
June 22, 2008 Filing 14 First MOTION for Leave to File Witness Telephonic and/or Deposition Testimony by JUSTIN GATLIN. (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
June 20, 2008 Filing 13 RESPONSE re #12 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,, Order on Motion for TRO,,,. (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
June 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DISSOLVED AND VACATED PER #36 ORDERORDER - 1) Pltf's #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED to the extent that a Temporary Restraining Order is issued as stated herein. 2) Dft's are restrained from enforcing the current suspension from athletic competition against Pltf or from otherwise using the suspension to prevent Pltf from participating in the Olympic trials commencing 6/27/2008. 3) The Court has further considered the pleadings and the record in this case and concludes that there is presently no need for for security under Fed.R.Civ.P.65(c). 4) This Order shall remain in full force and effect for (10) days unless this Court specifically orders otherwise. 5) A hearing on Pltf's Motion for Preliminary Injunction is hereby set for 6/23/2008, at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 4 South. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 6/20/2008. (laj) Modified on 6/24/2008 (laj).
June 20, 2008 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by LORENCE JON BIELBY on behalf of UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE (BIELBY, LORENCE)
June 20, 2008 Set Hearing - Re: #4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction - Hearing set for 6/23/2008 at 8:30 AM in Pensacola before SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER. (laj)
June 19, 2008 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by JOHN K LONDOT on behalf of UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE (LONDOT, JOHN)
June 19, 2008 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by ROBERT CONRAD PALMER, III on behalf of UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC (PALMER, ROBERT)
June 19, 2008 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #7 Order, Plaintiff's Response to June 18, 2008 Order Relating to Service of Process on Defendants. (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH)
June 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Pltf shall certifiy to the Court the status of service in this case and submit any proof thereof. Failure to do so or provide ongoing updates as to the status of service may preclude the Court from taking any action on the Motion or the Complaint. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 6/18/2008. (laj)
June 18, 2008 Filing 6 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT - Re: #5 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Plaintiff's First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiff's filed by JUSTIN GATLIN - The pleading was posted using the wrong event code. The correct event for "Memorandum of Law and Facts in Support of Pltf's #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction", should be "Memorandum in Support of Motion", which is located under Civil Events, Motions and Related Filings, and Responses and Replies. The clerk will correct the docket entry to reflect the correct "title" of the pleading. (laj)
June 17, 2008 Filing 5 MEMRANDUM OF LAW and Facts in Support of #4 First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Plaintiff's, First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiff's by JUSTIN GATLIN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K) (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH) Modified on 6/18/2008 to correct "title of pleading" (laj).
June 17, 2008 Filing 4 DISSOLVED AND VACATED PER #36 ORDER First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiff's, First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Plaintiff's by JUSTIN GATLIN. (ZARZAUR, JOSEPH) Modified on 6/24/2008 (laj).
June 17, 2008 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE - Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER notified that action is needed - Re: #4 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiff'sFirst MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Plaintiff's. (laj)
June 10, 2008 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC, USA TRACK AND FIELD INC, UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE and INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF ATHLETICS FEDERATIONS and forwarded to pltf's attorney (J. Zarzaur, Jr, by runner) - per request. (laj)
June 9, 2008 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (laj)
June 9, 2008 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC, USA TRACK AND FIELD INC, UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE and INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF ATHLETICS FEDERATIONS filed by JUSTIN GATLIN - Filing Fee $350.00, Receipt Number: FLN300001992. (laj)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GATLIN v. UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN GATLIN
Represented By: JOSEPH A ZARZAUR, JR
Represented By: BRYAN SCOTT GOWDY
Represented By: JOHN STEWART MILLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES ANTI-DOPING AGENCY INC
Represented By: ROBERT CONRAD PALMER, III
Represented By: WILLIAM BOCK, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA TRACK AND FIELD INC
Represented By: ROBERT CONRAD PALMER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OLYMPIC COMMITTEE
Represented By: ELAINE DAWN WALTER
Represented By: JOHN K LONDOT
Represented By: JOSEPH Z FLEMING
Represented By: LORENCE JON BIELBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF ATHLETICS FEDERATIONS
Represented By: ROBERT CONRAD PALMER, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?