RJSG PROPERTIES LLC v. MARBELLA CONDOMINIUM DEVELOPERS
Plaintiff: RJSG PROPERTIES LLC
Defendant: MARBELLA CONDOMINIUM DEVELOPERS LLC, STEVEN P DELGALLO, JEFFREY V SIREN and MICHAEL IOVIENO
Case Number: 3:2008cv00302
Filed: July 15, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Okaloosa
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER Adopting the magistrate judge's 244 Report and Recommendation. DelGallo's motion for summary judgment on Counts I through III of the amended complaint (doc. 204 ), which Iovieno and Siren have joined, is GRANTED as to Defendants DelGallo, Iovieno, Siren, and Marbella. RJSG's "Motion and Application for Default Judgment against Marbella Condominium Developers, LLC and Incorporated Memorandum of Law" (doc. 166 ) is DENIED, with leave to renew the motion as to Counts IV through VI of the amended complaint only. DelGallo's "Amended Motion to Withhold Judgment on RJSG's Damages" (doc. 188 ) is DENIED, as moot. By separate order this matter shall be set for trial on RJSG's state law claims and DelGallo's cross-claim for indemnification. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 7/21/2010. (djb)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER. Defendant Jeffrey V. Siren has joined in the motion for summary judgment filed by Defendant Steven P. DelGallo against Plaintiff RJSG Properties, LLC (see 204 222 ). Defendant Siren's instant motion effectively is one for leave of court to file a reply memoranda to Plaintiff's response to the pending motion for summary judgment. The motion 223 is DENIED, for the failure to demonstrate good cause to file a reply memoranda. See N.D. Fla. Loc. R. 7.1(C)(2) (stating that no reply memoranda shall be filed absent a showing of good cause and upon leave of court). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 2/23/10. (lcu)
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER denying 124 Motion to Disqualify Counsel; denying 125 Motion for Hearing; and denying as moot 164 Motion to review affidavits filed in camera . Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 10/28/09. (lcu)
September 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER re 135 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. The clerk shall refer this case to the magistrate judge for all pretrial proceedings, including preliminary orders, conduct of necessary hearings, and, with respect to any dispositive motions, filing of a report and recommendation containing proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law and recommended disposition of the case. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 9/11/09. (lcu)
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER re 155 Order. Upon review of the parties' filings, the court concludes that it should require Plaintiff to file, in camera, an affidavit from Gary Sims identifying with specificity the confidential information Plainti ff contends was provided to Attorney William Martin and his former law firm Matthews & Hawkins. Plaintiff may also, if it wishes, file other affidavits in camera in further support of its motion. The affidavit(s) shall be filed no later than September 11, 2009. (Miscellaneous Deadline - by 9/11/2009). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 8/26/09. (lcu)
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER Re: Plaintiff's 124 Amended MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Keefe, Anchors, Gordon & Moyle, P.A. from Representing Defendant Steven Delgallo, and 125 MOTION for in camera Hearing and other relief. This cause is hereby referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Timothy to conduct evidentiary and such other proceedings as are required and to enter a report and recommendation on the disposition of plaintiff's motions. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 8/18/2009. (djb)
February 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER. The clerk of the court shall change the docket to reflect that this action is no longer a consent case and modify the case number to reflect the addition of District Judge M. Casey Rodgers. The parties' Notice of Nonconsent 67 and pending motions 68 , 69 shall be referred to Judge Rodgers. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 2/17/09. (lcu)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER. Defendants' motions 33 and 37 are GRANTED to the extent that Plaintiff shall, within TWENTY-FIVE (25) DAYS of the date of docketing of this order, file a RICO Case Statement as outlined in the body of this order. Defendants' motions 33 and 37 are DENIED without prejudice to the extent they seek dismissal of Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 1/21/09.Miscellaneous Deadline - by 2/16/2009 (lcu)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RJSG PROPERTIES LLC v. MARBELLA CONDOMINIUM DEVELOPERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RJSG PROPERTIES LLC
Represented By: JOHN N LEDBETTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MARBELLA CONDOMINIUM DEVELOPERS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: STEVEN P DELGALLO
Represented By: HOKE SMITH, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEFFREY V SIREN
Represented By: DANIEL WILL UHLFELDER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MICHAEL IOVIENO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?