June 2, 2011 |
Filing
121
ORDER granting 120 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on June 2, 2011. (aow)
|
June 4, 2010 |
Filing
89
ORDER ADOPTING 86 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Plaintiff's 60 Motion for Entry of Default Judgment against dft Chisholm is DENIED. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on June 4, 2010. (kvg)
|
April 26, 2010 |
Filing
85
ORDER ADOPTING 77 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Plaintiffs' "Motion to Discharge Bond and Incorporated Memorandum of Law" 70 is GRANTED, to the following extent: the amount of the security bond required in connecti on with Plaintiffs' preliminary injunction is MODIFIED to reflect that the amount now required to be posted in the court's registry is $20,000.00. In all other respects the preliminary injunction is unaltered. The clerk of court is di rected to release from the court's registry the balance of the security bond in the amount of $180,000.00, plus any interest accrued on that amount, to Plaintiffs' counsel, Scott Lieberman, of the firm Lieberman, Danz, & Kronengold, at his address of record. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 4/26/10. (lcu)
|
March 3, 2010 |
Filing
69
ORDER. Based on the above deficiency, the motion 67 shall be DENIED, without prejudice to Plaintiffs' filing an amended motion bearing a Rule 7.1(B) certificate. The parties are advised that upon Plaintiffs' filing an amended motion, the court will give Defendant Johnny Chisholm the opportunity-on an expedited basis-to file a response. Absent a persuasive objection by Defendant Chisholm, the court anticipates immediately entering a Report to the district court wh ich recommends that Plaintiffs' motion to discharge or modify the bond be granted, to the extent that the preliminary injunction be modified to reduce the bond from $200,000.00 to $1000.00. The court shall further recommend that the cl erk of court be directed to immediately release the balance of the bond, plus any accrued interest, to Plaintiffs' counsel. Additionally, at the earliest possible time, this court anticipates entering a separate Report and Recommendation to the district court on Plaintiffs' motion for default judgment against Defendant Chisholm. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 3/3/10. (lcu)
|
October 28, 2009 |
Filing
64
ORDER. This case, in its entirely, is STAYED during the pendency of the automatic stay resulting from Defendant Chisholm Properties Circuit Events' filing a bankruptcy petition. The clerk is directed to remove this case from the active docket of the court pending notice that the bankruptcy case has been disposed of by the bankruptcy court and further notice by this court. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 10/28/09. (lcu)
|
October 1, 2009 |
Filing
57
ORDER denying 51 MOTION for Protective Order as untimely and/or moot for failure to respond to an order of the court. Defendant Johnny Chisholm shall have until 5:00 p.m., OCTOBER 7, 2009, in which to advise the court of the status of his efforts to obtain counsel, both for himself individually and for the corporate defendant. (Miscellaneous Deadline - by 10/7/2009). Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 10/1/09. (lcu)
|
July 6, 2009 |
Filing
40
ORDER denying 25 MOTION to Vacate 22 Order, Preliminary Injunction and Writ of Attachment. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 7/6/09. (lcu)
|
June 23, 2009 |
Filing
33
ORDER AND NOTICE. Defendants have filed an amended motion for summary judgment. 30 . The court will take the motion under advisement on July 6, 2009. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 6/23/09.Defendants' motio n for summary judgment 24 filed June 16, 2009, was noticed to be taken under advisement on June 30, 2009. In light of the limited changes to defendants' motion, the court will require plaintiffs' response and supporting documents to be filed by the July 6, 2009, advisement date. Miscellaneous Deadline - by 7/6/2009 (lcu)
|
June 22, 2009 |
Filing
29
AMENDED ORDER AND NOTICE re 24 Motion for Summary Judgment. The court will take the motion under advisement on June 30, 2009. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 6/22/09. Miscellaneous Deadline - by 6/30/2009. The Order and Notice previously entered on June 16, 2009 26 , provided an advisement date of July 7, 2009 (lcu)
|
June 12, 2009 |
Filing
22
ORDER re: Preliminary Injunction. This preliminary injunction shall remain in full force and effect until it is further modified or terminated by order of the court. The bond posted by plaintiffs with the clerk of this court shall remain in place for the duration of the preliminary injunction. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 6/12/09.See order image for complete instructions (lcu)
|
June 5, 2009 |
Filing
18
ORDER. Defendant's emergency motion to modify writ of attachment 17 is DENIED. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 6/5/09. (tdg) Modified on 6/19/2009 (tdg).
|