SMITH v. STATE OF FLORIDA
Petitioner: TERRY D SMITH
Respondent: STATE OF FLORIDA
Case Number: 3:2009cv00278
Filed: June 29, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Santa Rosa
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER ON REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; adopting re 40 Report and Recommendation. Petitioner's attempts to amend his habeas petition to add the claims asserted in his Reply (doc. 25 ) and his Proposed Second Amended Petition (s ee doc. 33 , attachment) are DENIED as futile, since they are time barred. Petitioners First Amended Petition (doc. 7 ) is DENIED. A certificate of appealability is DENIED. The clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 2/25/2011. (djb)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re 7 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by TERRY D SMITH - Clerk to furnish copies of amended petition w/a copy of this order to Respondent and the Atty Gen/FL. - Respondent shall have ninety (90) days to fil e answer as directed. - - Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 11/9/2009. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on August 10, 2009.(cc: McNeil w/petition, R/R #7008 2810 0002 1522 8958; and McCollum w/petition, R/R #7008 2810 0002 1522 8965) (cbj)
July 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by TERRY D SMITH; 1. Walter A. McNeil is hereby substituted for State of Florida as Respondent, and clerk shall change the docket to so reflect. 2. Petitioner's [ 2] MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is Granted. 3. Petitioner shall submit 2 copies of petition within twenty (20) days. This case number should be written on each copy. - - Miscellaneous Deadline - by 7/21/2009. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on July 1, 2009. (cbj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. STATE OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TERRY D SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: STATE OF FLORIDA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?