MILLS v. INNOVATIVE ENERGY GLOBAL LTD
Plaintiff: KEVIN J MILLS
Defendant: INNOVATIVE ENERGY GLOBAL LTD
Case Number: 3:2009cv00294
Filed: July 10, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Santa Rosa
Presiding Judge: MILES DAVIS
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER denying 53 Pla's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 81 Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on pla's claims; and denying 80 Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment on its counterclaims. This matter is hereby specially referred to Magistrate Judge Davis for settlement conference. Trial to be set by separate order. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 3/31/2011. (sps)
June 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER - The court hereby discloses that the undersigned has recently hired as a law clerk Amy Klotz, who has been an attorney of record in this case. Due to the inherent potential of a conflict of interest, the court makes this di sclosure to all parties and offers the assurance of the court that Ms. Klotz will not be assigned to or have any involvement with this case. The undersigned has had no discussions with her about the case. Therefore, no conflict of interest in fact exists. - - Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on June 8, 2010. (cbj)
May 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER OF CLARIFICATION - - (see order image) - Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on May 25, 2010. (cbj)
May 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER (of Deficiency) re 97 Corrective Amendment To Answer to Defendant's Counterclaim filed by KEVIN J MILLS. - - The document shall remain in the electronic file, but the court will not consider it until you have corrected the above deficiencies through the filing of a corrected document. - Additionally, the court notes that pursuant to the Report of Parties' Planning Meeting 21 and the court's Final Scheduling Order 29 , the deadline to amend pleadings was October 1, 2009. - - - Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on May 21, 2010. (cbj)
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER - - The trial in this case is hereby continued from trial docket commencing September 20, 2010, and will be rescheduled by separate order following the court's ruling on the pending dispositive motions. - - - Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on May 20, 2010. (cbj)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER AND NOTICE - re 80 MOTION for Summary Judgment on its Counterclaims, and 81 MOTION for Summary Judgment on Plaintiff's Claims filed by INNOVATIVE ENERGY GLOBAL LTD - (See order image) - Miscellaneous Deadline (Advisement Date) - by 6/1/2010 - (Notify Chambers on 6/1/2010.) - - - Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on May 11, 2010. (cbj)
March 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER - - 1. The stay imposed on 2/9/2010 is Lifted. - 2. Defendant shall respond to pla's 53 motion for summary judgment no later than 5/3/2010 and will file a motion for summary judgment, if it wishes, by the same date. - 3. Pla will respond to defendant's motion for summary judgment, if any, by 5/17/2010. - 4. The case is still set for trial during two week period commencing 9/20/2010. (Defendant's Response to plaintiff's motion due by 5/3/2010 . Defendant's Dispositive Motions to be filed by 5/3/2010. ) - - (Miscellaneous (pla's response to defendant's motion) Deadline - by 5/17/2010.) - - - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on March 23, 2010. (cbj)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER - (See order image) - - re defendant's 39 Motion to Compel, and 56 Motion for protective Order of confidentiality; and plaintiff's 40 Motion for protective order. - - - Having considered the motions, the plead ings and the parties' arguments at the February 9, 2010 hearing, the Court GRANTS the Motion to Compel, in part, and GRANTS and DENIES the respective motions for protective order, in part, subject to the conditions set forth herein. - - - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on February 22, 2010. (cbj)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER - (See order image) - re 53 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by KEVIN J MILLS - - will be taken under advisement on March 5, 2010. - - (Notify Chambers on 3/5/2010. ) - - - Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on February 1, 2010. (cbj)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER - The Plaintiff's 14 Motion to Remand and 22 Motion for Separate Trial as to Rescission for Nonpayment & Joint Evidentiary Hearing on Jurisdictional Amount are Denied. - - Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on October 15, 2009. (cbj)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re 10 MOTION to Remand, 11 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by KEVIN J MILLS - The documents shall remain in the electronic file, but the court will not consider them until you have corrected the noted deficiencies through the filing of corrected documents. The document is denied without prejudice with leave given to refile after correction. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on July 31, 2009. (cbj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MILLS v. INNOVATIVE ENERGY GLOBAL LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN J MILLS
Represented By: GEORGE RODERICK MEAD, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INNOVATIVE ENERGY GLOBAL LTD
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER ALLEN RILEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?