BAKER v. SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Petitioner: JAMES LONNIE BAKER, JR
Respondent: SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Case Number: 3:2009cv00444
Filed: October 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Okaloosa
Presiding Judge: LACEY A COLLIER
Presiding Judge: MILES DAVIS
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ADOPTING 29 Report and Recommendation. - The respondent's 13 Motion to Dismiss is Granted. - The 1 petition for writ of habeas corpus is Dismissed Without Prejudice. - The clerk to close the file. - Certificate of appealability is Denied. - - - Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on May 3, 2010. (cbj)
December 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re 13 MOTION to Dismiss Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS. - - Petitioner shall have thirty (30) days from the date this order is entered on the docket to respond to the motion filed by respondent. - - - ( Response to motion due by 1/7/2010. ) - - - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on December 8, 2009. (cbj)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by JAMES LONNIE BAKER, JR. - - 1. The Clerk is directed to furnish copies of the petition along with a copy of this order to respondent and the Attorney General of the State of Florida. - 2. Respondent shall have ninety (90) days from the date this order is entered on the docket in which to file an answer as directed by this order. - - (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 2/15/2010). ) - - - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on November 17, 2009.- - (cc: MCNEIL R/R# 7008 2810 0002 1522 9085; MCCOLLUM R/R# 7008 2810 0002 1522 9078) (cbj)
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by JAMES LONNIE BAKER, JR - - Petitioner shall, within thirty (30) days of the docketing date of this order, submit one additional copy of the petition and attachments, or submi t payment in the amount of $7.50 to cover the cost of copying his 15-page petition and attachments. This case number should be written on the copy. - - (Miscellaneous Deadline - by 11/30/2009. )- - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on October 29, 2009. (cbj)
October 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by JAMES LONNIE BAKER, JR - Clerk shall forward to petitioner a form application for leave to proceed IFP, w/this case number written on it. - - Within thirty (30) days, petitio ner shall either pay $5.00 habeas fee; or submit a completed IFP application as directed. (HABEAS Fee due by 11/12/2009 ; Alternatively IFP Motion due by 11/12/2009. )- - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on October 13, 2009. (cbj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BAKER v. SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JAMES LONNIE BAKER, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SECRETARY DEPARTMENT OF CORRECTIONS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?