MENDEZ-ARRIOLA v. WHITE-WILSON MEDICAL CENTER, P. A. et al
Plaintiff: DANAE MENDEZ-ARRIOLA
Defendant: WHITE-WILSON MEDICAL CENTER, P. A., WHITE-WILSON PROPERTIES PARTNERSHIP, WW REAL ESTATE, LLC, DOUGLAS W RIGBY and ALAN L GIESEMAN
Case Number: 3:2009cv00495
Filed: November 3, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Okaloosa
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER re 102 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint in Part filed by ALAN L GIESEMAN,WW REAL ESTATE LLC, WHITE WILSON PROPERTIES PARTNERSHIP, WHITE WILSON MEDICAL CENTER PA,DOUGLAS W RIGBY. Motion is GRANTED with res pect to Counts XI, XII, XIII, XVI, and XVII, all of which are dismissed WITH PREJUDICE, and DENIED with respect to Counts XIV and XV. The stay is hereby lifted and the parties shall confer, as required by Rule 26(f), and submit a joint report within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order.( Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/12/2011). Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/29/2011. (mjm)
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER - (See order image) - Defendants' motion for a more definite statement or, in the alternative, motion to dismiss 52 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. To the extent defendants' motion is for a more definite s tatement, it is DENIED; to the extent the motion requests a dismissal, it is GRANTED as to Counts IV, XII, XIII, XIV, XV, XVI, XVII and XVIII with leave to amend as outlined in the order, within 14 days, and DENIED as to Counts III, V, VI, VIII, IX, and XI. Defendants' response to plaintiff's amended complaint is due 14 days after the complaint is filed. Mendez's motion for reconsideration 77 is DENIED. - - - Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on August 25, 2010. (cbj)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER - - 1. Plaintiff's 38 Consented Motion for Extension of Time to Make Rule 26(a)(2)Disclosures is GRANTED. - 2.Defendants' 49 Amended Motion for Extension to File Joint Report of Parties' Planning Meeting is GRANTED. - 3. All proceedings herein are STAYED pending further order of the court. - - - Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on February 24, 2010. (cbj)
January 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 25 Motion for More Definite Statement. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on 1/21/10. (lcu)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MENDEZ-ARRIOLA v. WHITE-WILSON MEDICAL CENTER, P. A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANAE MENDEZ-ARRIOLA
Represented By: MARIE A MATTOX
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHITE-WILSON MEDICAL CENTER, P. A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHITE-WILSON PROPERTIES PARTNERSHIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WW REAL ESTATE, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOUGLAS W RIGBY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALAN L GIESEMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?