UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DUBARRY et al
Plaintiff: |
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA |
Defendant: |
DEONNE DUBARRY, DANIEL E BECNEL, III, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., SESSIONS FISHMAN NATHAN & ISRAEL LLP, FRED BERTANI and LARAINE BERTANI |
Case Number: |
3:2009cv00505 |
Filed: |
November 10, 2009 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida |
Office: |
Pensacola Office |
County: |
Okaloosa |
Presiding Judge: |
MILES DAVIS |
Presiding Judge: |
M CASEY RODGERS |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
26 U.S.C. ยง 7401 IRS: Tax Liability |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 20, 2011 |
Filing
97
FORECLOSURE JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF SALE. The United States has a valid and subsisting tax lien against dft Deonne DuBarry in the sum of $584,549.27, as of April 18, 2011, plus interest and any statutory additions thereon, and t he tax lien against Deonne DuBarry can be foreclosed and the real property described in paragraph 2, can be sold in its entirety pursuant to 26 U.S.C. § 7403 and 28 U.S.C. § 2001. The Court shall retain jurisdiction over this cause for purposes of entering all further orders as may be appropriate, including, without limitation, deficiency and contempt of court judgments. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on June 20, 2011. (kvg)
|
June 10, 2011 |
Filing
93
ORDER adopting 91 Report and Recommendation. Pla United States of America's 89 motion for foreclosure judgment and order of sale is GRANTED. The court enters judgment in favor of pla United States of America and orders th e sale of Deonne DuBarry's property located in Broward County, Florida, bearing the street address of 4610 Paradise Isles, Destin, Florida 32541. The clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on June 10, 2011. (kvg)
|
April 1, 2011 |
Filing
88
ORDER adopting 78 Report and Recommendation. Pla United States of America's 47 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED as to its right to foreclose its lien and sell the subject property. Dft Deonne DuBarry's 58 moti on for summary judgment is DENIED. Dft Bank of America, NA shall submit documentation of the payoff amount as of the date of the court's acceptance of this recommendation. United States shall submit documentation of the current unpaid balance of the lien, including computation methods and citation to supporting authority. Distribution of proceeds of the foreclosure sale will be determined after the parties comply with paragraphs four (4) and five (5). Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on April 1, 2011. (kvg)
|
June 10, 2010 |
Filing
40
ORDER ADOPTING 39 Report and Recommendation. - The defendant's 38 Unopposed Motion to Set Aside entry of default filed by DANIEL E BECNEL, III, is Granted, and the clerk is directed to set aside the default entered against this defendant. - - - Signed by District Judge M CASEY RODGERS on June 10, 2010. (cbj)
|
February 17, 2010 |
Filing
18
ORDER (Of Deficiency) - re Defendants LARAINE BERTANI and FREDERICK BERTANI's "Answer" (received 2/16/2010) - - The submitted hard copy of the document shall docketed by the Clerk. The parties are advised that future pleadings that fail to comply with the Federal Rules will be returned without consideration by the court. - - - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS on February 17, 2010. (cbj)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?