PENSACOLA MOTOR SALES INC v. EASTERN SHORE TOYOTA LLC et al
Plaintiff: PENSACOLA MOTOR SALES INC
Defendant: EASTERN SHORE TOYOTA LLC, DAPHNE AUTOMOTIVE LLC, JOHN DOES 1-10, DAPHNE ENTERPRISES INC and SHAWN ESFAHANI
Case Number: 3:2009cv00571
Filed: December 28, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Escambia
Presiding Judge: MILES DAVIS
Presiding Judge: RICHARD SMOAK
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 197 AMENDED ORDER Pla's motion 181 is denied. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 11/19/2010. (sea)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER denied 181 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law Or In The Alternative, Motion For New Trial. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 11/16/2010. (sea)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER Plas motion to stay 179 is denied. The Clerk is directed to tax costs against Pla in the amount of $2,565.10 for Dfts expenses for printed or electronically recorded transcripts obtained for use in the case. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 11/12/2010. (sea)
October 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 176 AMENDED ORDER denied 123 Motion in Limine. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 10/6/2010. (sea)
September 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER denied 150 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 9/24/2010. (sea)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER denying 80 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 87 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 9/23/2010. (jcw)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER RESCHEDULING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (Change in Time Of Day Only) Pretrial Conference rescheduled for 9/10/2010 02:00 PM in U.S. Courthouse Panama City before JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 9/2/2010. (sea)
July 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER denying 74 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 7/29/2010. (jcw)
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER that the deadline to file Dispositive Motions is extended to 8/6/2010. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 6/28/2010. (sea)
June 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER The Clerk is directed to file the second amended complaint attached to 51 motion Second Amended Complaint as a separate entry. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 6/7/2010. (sea)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granted 46 MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint; Second Amended Complaint due by 6/9/2010. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 6/3/2010. (sea)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PENSACOLA MOTOR SALES INC v. EASTERN SHORE TOYOTA LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EASTERN SHORE TOYOTA LLC
Represented By: JAMES NIXON DANIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAPHNE AUTOMOTIVE LLC
Represented By: JAMES NIXON DANIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAPHNE ENTERPRISES INC
Represented By: JAMES NIXON DANIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAWN ESFAHANI
Represented By: JAMES NIXON DANIEL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PENSACOLA MOTOR SALES INC
Represented By: JOHN STEPHEN DERR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?