WHITE v. NELMS et al
Plaintiff: CAESAR WHITE, JR
Defendant: SUSAN NELMS, JOHN ROYAL, H BRITT LANDRUM, JR, KATHERINE KARSHNA and TWILA MARQUER
Case Number: 3:2009cv00574
Filed: December 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Escambia
Presiding Judge: LACEY A COLLIER
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER adopting 27 Report and Recommendation. This case is dismissed without prejudice for pla's failure to comply with an order of the court. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on May 9, 2011. (kvg)
May 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re 14 Order, 18 Order, 19 Response to Order to Show Cause - - 1. Clerk to send plaintiff a copy of IFP form for non-prisoner pro se parties, with this case number written on it. - 2. Within thirty (30) days from docketi ng date of this order, pla shall (1) pay $350.00 filing fee, or (2) submit completed IFP motion. - - (Filing Fee due by 6/2/2010 ; Alternatively, IFP Motion due by 6/2/2010. ) - - - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on May 3, 2010.- - (form to pla) (cbj)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re 14 Order directing fee payment; no response. - - Within twenty (20) days from docketing date of this order Pla shall show cause, if any, why this case should not be dismissed for failure to comply with an order of the court. - - (Show Cause Response due by 5/3/2010. ) - - - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on April 13, 2010. (cbj)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - re 7 Motion for Recusal or Judicial Disqualify [sic] of U.S. District Judges Lacey A. Collier and U.S. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth M. Timothy and request to transfer action "to another judge, division, or U.S. distric t court system with jurisdiction" - - The requested relief is Denied. Plaintiff has failed to allege circumstances under which a reasonable individual could conclude that the impartiality of the undersigned or District Judge Collier might reasonably be questioned or that either of the assigned judges has a personal bias or prejudice concerning Plaintiff. - - - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on February 12, 2010. (cbj)
January 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re 1 Complaint filed by CAESAR WHITE, JR. - 1. Clerk to send pla a copy of forms for non-prisoner pro se parties to request IFP, with this case number written on the forms. - 2. Pla's 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is Denied Without Prejudice. Pla shall pay $350.00 filing fee or submit IFP motion within thirty (30) days from docketing date of this order. - - - (Filing Fee due by 2/10/2010 ; Alternatively IFP Motion due by 2/10/2010. ) - - - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on January 11, 2010.- - (forms to pla) (cbj)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WHITE v. NELMS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAESAR WHITE, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SUSAN NELMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN ROYAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H BRITT LANDRUM, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHERINE KARSHNA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TWILA MARQUER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?