Reserve Place, L.L.C. et al v. REGIONS BANK
Plaintiff: Reserve Place, L.L.C. and Reserve Acquisition Group, LLC
Defendant: REGIONS BANK
Case Number: 3:2010cv00364
Filed: September 20, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Santa Rosa
Presiding Judge: MILES DAVIS
Presiding Judge: RICHARD SMOAK
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER The case is dismissed from the active docket of the court. In the event that the settlement is not consummated, the court reserves jurisdiction, upon motion filed by any party within sixty days of the date of this Order, t o amend or vacate & set aside this Order & reinstate the case. The clerk is directed to close the file of this case for administrative purposes, & upon the expiration of sixty days w/o activity, the clerk is direct to close the case in its entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 7/15/2011. (sea)
March 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER: MAGISTRATE JUDGE MILES DAVIS no longer assigned to case. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN assigned per Administrative Order 4:95-mc-40111-DJ. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 3/7/2011. (jws)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER The stay 20 is terminated. Joint report required by the Initial Scheduling Order due by 3/14/2011. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 2/23/2011. (sea)
February 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER The plas shall expeditiously make payment of the agreed upon costs, & the parties shall at that time notify the Court so that the stay may be dissolved. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 2/7/2011. (sea)
January 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER The parties shall nominate a person willing to serve as a special master not later than 2/4/2011. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 1/21/2011. (sea)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER The Motion for Recovery of Costs 10 is GRANTED. This case is stayed, until such costs are determined and paid. Dft shall file a memo, with supporting documentation, addressing the factors set forth in Wolf, supra, to determine the appropriate amount of costs to award not later than December 8, 2010. Plas shall file a responsive memo not later than December 22, 2010. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 11/23/10. (sea)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reserve Place, L.L.C. et al v. REGIONS BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reserve Place, L.L.C.
Represented By: PATRICK KEITH MCCARTHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reserve Acquisition Group, LLC
Represented By: PATRICK KEITH MCCARTHY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REGIONS BANK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?