HANCOCK BANK v. REEDER et al
Plaintiff: |
HANCOCK BANK |
Defendant: |
LARRY E REEDER, REGATTA BAY MANOR LTD, HARBOR VIEW PROPERTIES OF DESTIN INC, REGATTA BAY COMPANY and LAWRENCE P BUSH |
Case Number: |
3:2011cv00113 |
Filed: |
March 2, 2011 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Florida |
Office: |
Pensacola Office |
County: |
Okaloosa |
Presiding Judge: |
ROGER VINSON |
Presiding Judge: |
CHARLES J KAHN |
Nature of Suit: |
All Other Real Property |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 7, 2011 |
Filing
47
FINAL JUDGMENT IN FAVOR OF HANCOCK BANK AND FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE. Final Judgment is in satisfaction of all remaining counts of the Complaint. The equities of this cause are with the Pla and against Dfts. That Pla recover f rom Dft, Trustees a subtotal of $1,602,775.35 plus all attorneys' fees and costs, with interest continuing to accrue on the unpaid principal balance from and after July 15, 2011 at the daily default rate of $682.93, plus interest at th e post-judgment rate interest pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1961, from the date of this judgment until paid, plus any further sums in connection herewith, for all of which let execution issue. The Special Master shall sell the Property at public sale o n the 17th day of October, 2011. Upon the sale, the Special Master shall receive proceeds from it and shall, no later than 10 days after the sale, file a report of the sale, along with proof of the publication of the Notice of Sale. Jurisdiction is retained to enter further orders as proper Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on September 7, 2011. (Report of Sale by 10/27/2011.) (kvg)
|
March 7, 2011 |
Filing
6
ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER rescinding 128 Order in 4:95mc40111 and reassigning Magistrate Judge Charles J Kahn, Jr to all pending cases assigned to Magistrate Judge Miles Davis, except for cases, which will remain assigned to Recall Magistrate Judge Miles Davis. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE STEPHAN P MICKLE on 3/7/2011. (sea)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?