STEPHENSON v. ELLIS
Plaintiff: |
CLARENCE FRANK STEPHENSON |
Defendant: |
D ELLIS, JOHN DOE, GIELOW, F GIVEN, S THOMAS, G RAYBON, G DAVIS, JOHN DOE #2 and JANE DOE |
Case Number: |
3:2011cv00455 |
Filed: |
September 23, 2011 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Florida |
Office: |
Pensacola Office |
County: |
Santa Rosa |
Presiding Judge: |
ROGER VINSON |
Presiding Judge: |
CHARLES J KAHN |
Nature of Suit: |
Prison Condition |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 25, 2017 |
Filing
136
ORDER adopting Magistrate Judge's 135 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. This case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from the active docket of the court. In the event the settlement is not consummated, the court reserves jurisdiction, upon motion filed by any party within 60 days, to reinstate the case. Clerk is directed to close the file in this case for administrative purposes. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 05/25/2017. (MB)
|
June 18, 2015 |
Filing
68
ORDER adopting magistrate judge's 66 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Defendant Raybon's 49 amended motion to dismiss is GRANTED and plaintiff's claims against Raybon are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 06/18/2015. (MB)
|
May 5, 2015 |
Filing
65
ORDER adopting magistrate judge's 62 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Gerald Rhodes is DISMISSED from this case. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 05/05/2015. (MB)
|
July 23, 2014 |
Filing
32
ORDER ADOPTING IN PART 29 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The official capacity claims are DISMISSED. The Fourteenth Amendment claim is DISMISSED. This action is DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i i) against the defendants McNeil, Crews, Austin, and McArthur, for the plaintiff's failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. This case is hereby remanded to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings with respect to the follow ing: plaintiff's individual capacity claims for compensatory and punitive damages against defendants Warden Ellis and Officers Gielow, Given, Raybon, Thomas, and Doe, for alleged First and Eighth Amendment violations. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 07/23/2014. (MB)
|
November 26, 2012 |
Filing
9
ORDER adopting 7 Report and Recommendation. This case is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as malicious under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B)(i) for plaintiff's abuse of the judicial process. The clerk is directed to close the file. Set 1915_i flag. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on November 26, 2012. (pmc)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?