DAKOTA GROUP LLC v. WAFFLE HOUSE INC
Plaintiff: DAKOTA GROUP LLC
Defendant: WAFFLE HOUSE INC
Counter_claimant: WAFFLE HOUSE INC
Counter_defendant: DAKOTA GROUP LLC
Case Number: 3:2011cv00586
Filed: December 7, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Okaloosa
Presiding Judge: RICHARD SMOAK
Presiding Judge: CHARLES J KAHN
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting 87 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Counts I and II of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and Counts I and II of Defendant's Amended Counterclaim; granting 102 Motion for Summary Judgment as to Count III of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Counts IV and V of the Amended Complaint and Counts III and V of the Amended Counterclaim remain for determination. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 7/19/2012. (jcw)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER striking 76 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 5/9/2012. (jcw)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Count IV is dismissed with prejudice to the extent it alleges slander of title. Count IV remains to the extent that it alleges tortious interference with a business relationship. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 1/19/2012. (jcw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DAKOTA GROUP LLC v. WAFFLE HOUSE INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAKOTA GROUP LLC
Represented By: STEPHEN LAWRENCE WALKER
Represented By: C JEFFREY MCINNIS
Represented By: BILL B MCEACHERN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAFFLE HOUSE INC
Represented By: THOMAS FREDERIC GONZALEZ
Represented By: CHARLES THOMAS WIGGINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: WAFFLE HOUSE INC
Represented By: THOMAS FREDERIC GONZALEZ
Represented By: CHARLES THOMAS WIGGINS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: DAKOTA GROUP LLC
Represented By: BILL B MCEACHERN
Represented By: C JEFFREY MCINNIS
Represented By: STEPHEN LAWRENCE WALKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?