HUGHES et al v. BURIE et al
Plaintiff: UTAHNA HUGHES and JESSICA MCCLELLAN
Defendant: EDMOND BURIE and GC & P OF PENSACOLA INC
Case Number: 3:2012cv00332
Filed: July 2, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Escambia
Presiding Judge: RICHARD SMOAK
Presiding Judge: CHARLES J KAHN
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER denying 205 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 10/9/2014. (jcw)
May 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER ADOPTING 190 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Plaintiff Samantha Clark is DISMISSED without prejudice from this action. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 5/16/2014. (jcw)
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER ADOPTING 180 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION ; denying 165 Motion to Decertify Collective Action. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 4/18/2014. (jcw)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 187 ORDER ADOPTING 186 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Plaintiffs Ashley Spearman and Rachel Heath are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 4/7/2014. (jcw)
December 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER ADOPTING 159 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION.The Clerk is directed to enter a default against Defendant Edmond Burie. Signed by JUDGE RICHARD SMOAK on 12/26/2013. (jcw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HUGHES et al v. BURIE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UTAHNA HUGHES
Represented By: JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER RYAN CRAWFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSICA MCCLELLAN
Represented By: JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER RYAN CRAWFORD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDMOND BURIE
Represented By: RUSSELL FRANK VAN SICKLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GC & P OF PENSACOLA INC
Represented By: RUSSELL FRANK VAN SICKLE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?