NAVELSKI et al v. INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY
Plaintiff: JOHN NAVELSKI, LINDA NAVELSKI, RICHARD BULLARD and BEVERLY BULLARD
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2014cv00445
Filed: September 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Escambia
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Presiding Judge: CHARLES J KAHN
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER granting 131 Motion to Intervene, as limited in the Order. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/28/2018. (aow)
May 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Defendants Motion for Reconsideration, ECF No. 97, is DENIED. Within seven days of the date of this Order, the parties are directed to notify the Court of their respective positions on the joint proposed notice that was fil ed on April 7, 2017. By separate order, the Court will schedule a case management conference to discuss the progression of the litigation going forward. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/21/2017. (Jacobs, Tevenia) Modified on 5/21/2017 (Jacobs, Tevenia).
March 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification, ECF No. 61, is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; Defendants Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony from Tom Fruitticher, MAI, ECF No. 77, is GRANTED; Defendants Motion to Exclude Exper t Testimony from Mark Ross Ph.D., P.E., ECF No. 78, is DENIED; Plaintiffs amended Motion to Limit or Exclude Expert Testimony of Richard J. Roddewig, ECF No. 80, is DENIED; and Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment, ECF No. 81, is GRANTED as to classwide stigma damages and DENIED as to causation and/or liability. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 03/25/2017. (Jacobs, Tevenia)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NAVELSKI et al v. INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN NAVELSKI
Represented By: JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER M VLACHOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA NAVELSKI
Represented By: JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER M VLACHOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD BULLARD
Represented By: JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER M VLACHOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEVERLY BULLARD
Represented By: JEREMIAH JOSEPH TALBOTT
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER M VLACHOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: INTERNATIONAL PAPER COMPANY
Represented By: CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR.
Represented By: THOMAS LARRY HILL
Represented By: KIMBERLY SPEER SULLIVAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?