BRIER et al v. DE CAY
Plaintiff: |
JOHN BRIER, EUGENE GRIDNEV, MARK MURPHY and PHILA KEANE |
Defendant: |
KEITH DE CAY |
Counter_claimant: |
KEITH DE CAY |
Counter_defendant: |
JOHN BRIER, EUGENE GRIDNEV, PHILA KEANE and MARK MURPHY |
Case Number: |
3:2016cv00142 |
Filed: |
March 31, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Northern District of Florida |
Office: |
Pensacola Office |
County: |
Escambia |
Presiding Judge: |
M CASEY RODGERS |
Presiding Judge: |
CHARLES J KAHN |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 25, 2019 |
Filing
72
ORDER ADOPTING 71 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Plaintiffs are entitled to recover from defendant $73,815.00 in attorneys' fees and $400.00 in costs, re 68 Motion for Attorney Fees. Defendant shall remit the above amounts to plaintiffs, through plaintiffs' counsel, within 30 days of the date of this Order. The Clerk shall close the file for administrative purposes and, upon the expiration of 60 days without activity, close the case in its entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/25/2019. (alb)
|
January 23, 2019 |
Filing
67
ORDER. The magistrate judge's 62 Report and Recommendation is adopted and incorporated by reference in this Order. Plaintiff's 60 Renewed Motion to Determine Amount of Attorneys' Fees and Costs is DENIED witho ut prejudice. Plaintiff's shall have a final opportunity to file a motion in compliance with the Courts Local Rules within 14 days of the date of this Order. Should Plaintiff's fail to timely comply, their motion will be denied with prejudice. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/22/2019. (alb)
|
August 16, 2018 |
Filing
58
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The previously imposed stay is LIFTED. The 49 Report and Recommendation is adopted and incorporated by reference in this Order. Plaintiffs 32 Motion for Entitlement to Attorney F ees is GRANTED. Plaintiffs have timely filed a 50 Motion to Determine the Amount of Fees and Costs. Defendant has 14 days from the date of this Order to file a response to the motion. The Clerk is directed to refer the Motion and response, if any is timely filed, to the assigned Magistrate Judge for determination. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 8/31/2018). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/16/2018. (alb) Modified on 8/17/2018 (alb).
|
March 27, 2017 |
Filing
28
ORDER adopting 26 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiffs' 16 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED and plaintiffs are awarded $94,000.00 in damages against defendant. Defendant's 20 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED and his counterclaim (ECF No. 6 ) is dismissed with prejudice. The clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/27/2017. (djb)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?