CURRY v. COKER et al
Plaintiff: EDWARD D CURRY
Defendant: R JOHNSON and M DONAHOO
Case Number: 3:2016cv00483
Filed: September 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Santa Rosa
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER ADOPTING 85 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and GRANTING 75 Motion for Summary Judgment. The clerk is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendant and against Plaintiff. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/22/2019. (alb)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER ADOPTING 56 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Defendant's 52 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART only as to Plaintiff's claims for monetary damages against Defendant in his official capacity. The clerk is directed to refer the case to the assigned magistrate Judge for further proceedings. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/22/2017. (alb)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER adopting the chief magistrate judge's 45 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff's 38 Request for Entry of Default is DENIED. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/28/2017. (djb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CURRY v. COKER et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD D CURRY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R JOHNSON
Represented By: DAMARIS E REYNOLDS
Represented By: MARK STACY URBAN, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M DONAHOO
Represented By: ANA C FRANCOLIN DOLNEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?