WELCH v. WALTON CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION et al
Plaintiff: JOHNNY WELCH
Defendant: WALTON CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION and LINDA RUSSELL
Case Number: 3:2016cv00590
Filed: November 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Walton
Presiding Judge: LACEY A COLLIER
Presiding Judge: CHARLES J KAHN
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER ADOPTING 61 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Defendant Alicen Fords 56 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED and plaintiffs claims are DISMISSED. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 8/21/2018. (alb)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ADOPTING 24 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and Denying 10 Plaintiff's "Emergency Injunction" motion and 20 Plaintiff's motion for summary Judgment. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 7/20/2017. (alb)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER adopting the magistrate judge's 11 Report and Recommendation. Plaintiff's 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order is DENIED. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE LACEY A COLLIER on 2/24/2017. (djb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WELCH v. WALTON CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNNY WELCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WALTON CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LINDA RUSSELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?