KOKESCH DEL CASTILLO v. PHILIP
Plaintiff: HEATHER KOKESCH DEL CASTILLO
Defendant: CELESTE PHILIP
Case Number: 3:2017cv00722
Filed: October 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Alachua
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: CHARLES J KAHN
2 Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 41 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by HEATHER KOKESCH DEL CASTILLO for proceedings held on **No Hearings to be Transcribed** (BARGIL, ARI)
August 13, 2019 Filing 40 USCA Case Number 19-13070-DD and USCA PROCEDURAL LETTER for #36 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #34 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, #35 Clerk's Judgment. USCA Appeal # 19-13070-DD. (alb)
August 9, 2019 Filing 39 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #36 Notice of Appeal. (alb)
August 9, 2019 Filing 38 Appeal Instructions re: #36 Notice of Appeal : The Transcript Request Form is available on the Internet at http://www.flnd.uscourts.gov/forms/Attorney/ECCA_transcript_form_fillable.pdf **PLEASE NOTE** Separate forms must be filed for each court reporter. Transcript Order Form due by 8/23/2019. (alb)
August 9, 2019 Filing 37 Appeal Filing fee: $ 505, receipt number FLN300013142. (alb)
August 9, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #34 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,, #35 Clerk's Judgment by HEATHER KOKESCH DEL CASTILLO. (BARGIL, ARI) Modified on 8/9/2019 to correct docket text (alb).
July 17, 2019 Filing 35 CLERK'S JUDGMENT re #34 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Modified on 7/17/2019 to terminate deadline to destroy working file. (alb).
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting Defendant's #24 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying Plaintiff's #25 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk is directed to enter summary final judgment in favor of the Defendant and against the Plaintiff and close the file. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 7/17/2019. (alb)
July 3, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #33 Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority. (alb)
July 3, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by HEATHER KOKESCH DEL CASTILLO re #25 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (BARGIL, ARI)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 3/1/2019. (erl)**Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 3:17cv722-MCR/HTC.
September 6, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #31 Response by HEATHER KOKESCH DEL CASTILLO to #30 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by CELESTE PHILIP re #24 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (alb)
September 5, 2018 Filing 31 RESPONSE by HEATHER KOKESCH DEL CASTILLO re #30 Notice (Other) Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Notice of Supplemental Authority. (BARGIL, ARI)
September 5, 2018 Filing 30 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by CELESTE PHILIP re #24 MOTION for Summary Judgment (NEWHALL, TIMOTHY)
August 22, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #29 Notice of Supplemental Authority by HEATHER KOKESCH DEL CASTILLO re #25 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (alb)
August 21, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority by HEATHER KOKESCH DEL CASTILLO re #25 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (BARGIL, ARI)
June 29, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #25 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #26 Response in Opposition to #28 Reply to Response to Motion for Summary Judgment. (alb)
June 28, 2018 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by HEATHER KOKESCH DEL CASTILLO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (BARGIL, ARI)
June 19, 2018 Set Deadlines - re: #26 RESPONSE in Opposition to #25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CELESTE PHILIP, and #27 RESPONSE in Opposition #24 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 6/28/2018. (djb)
June 14, 2018 Set Deadlines/Hearings re #26 RESPONSE in Opposition to #25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CELESTE PHILIP, and #27 RESPONSE in Opposition #24 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by HEATHER KOKESCH DEL CASTILLO. Replies due by 6/21/2018. (alb) Modified on 6/19/2018 (djb).
June 14, 2018 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by HEATHER KOKESCH DEL CASTILLO. (Attachments: #1 Del Castillo Declaration) (BARGIL, ARI)
June 14, 2018 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #25 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CELESTE PHILIP. (NEWHALL, TIMOTHY)
May 16, 2018 Reset Deadlines Re: #13 Final Scheduling Order as to #24 MOTION for Summary Judgment , #25 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Responses due on or before 6/14/2018). (djb)
May 15, 2018 Filing 25 MOTION for Summary Judgment by HEATHER KOKESCH DEL CASTILLO. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response to summary judgment not filed earlier: 6/5/2018). (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul M. Sherman, #2 Declaration of Heather Kokesch Del Castillo) (BARGIL, ARI)
May 15, 2018 Filing 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment by CELESTE PHILIP. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response to summary judgment not filed earlier: 6/5/2018). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Deposition of Heather Kokesch Del Castillo, #2 Exhibit B Deposition of Dr. Gail Kauwell, #3 Exhibit C Department's Investigative File) (TEEGEN, ELIZABETH)
May 8, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR notified that action is needed Re: #23 Defendant's Status Report. (alb)
May 7, 2018 Filing 23 STATUS REPORT by CELESTE PHILIP. (TEEGEN, ELIZABETH)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re #21 MOTION for Protective Order. It is not clear from the motion whether defendant Dr. Celeste Philip, State Surgeon General and Secretary of the Florida Department of Health, objects to providing the documents at issue upon entry of a protective order. Defendant shall file a status report clarifying that fact and, in the event she has no objection, attaching a proposed protective order. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR on 4/30/2018. (alb)
April 23, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR notified that action is needed Re: #21 MOTION for Protective Order . Referred to CHARLES J KAHN, JR. (alb)
April 20, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #21 Defendant's MOTION for Entry of Protective Order. (alb)
April 20, 2018 Filing 21 MOTION for Protective Order by CELESTE PHILIP. (TEEGEN, ELIZABETH)
April 12, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by TIMOTHY LEEDS NEWHALL on behalf of CELESTE PHILIP (NEWHALL, TIMOTHY)
April 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by CELESTE PHILIP. (Discovery due by 4/20/2018.) Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 4/12/2018. (sdw)
April 12, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #18 DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION for Brief Extension of April 13, 2018 Discovery Deadline (alb)
April 12, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by CELESTE PHILIP. (TEEGEN, ELIZABETH)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING #16 Joint Motion for Reconsideration of This Court's Directive for Mediation. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/23/2018. (alb)
March 22, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #16 MOTION Joint Motion for Reconsideration of This Court's Directive for Mediation re #13 Order Referring Case to Mediation. (alb)
March 22, 2018 Filing 16 MOTION Joint Motion for Reconsideration of This Court's Directive for Mediation re #13 Order Referring Case to Mediation,,, Scheduling Order,, by HEATHER KOKESCH DEL CASTILLO. (BARGIL, ARI)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #14 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney WILLIAM MICHAEL BLOCKER, II terminated. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/21/2017. (alb)
December 20, 2017 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (alb)
December 20, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CELESTE PHILIP. (BLOCKER, WILLIAM)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL Re: #12 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. The Discovery deadline is extended to 4/13/2018. The deadline for filing potentially Dispositive Motions as well as Daubert motions is 5/15/2018. Responsive memoranda are due 30 days after the filing of the initial motion. Reply briefs, if any, are due 14 days after the response is filed. Mediation must be completed on or before 5/11/2018. Mediation Report due by 5/25/2018. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 12/13/2017. (djb)
December 1, 2017 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #12 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (djb)
December 1, 2017 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (BARGIL, ARI)
November 9, 2017 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by JONATHAN ALAN GLOGAU on behalf of CELESTE PHILIP (GLOGAU, JONATHAN)
November 9, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by ELIZABETH ANN TEEGEN on behalf of CELESTE PHILIP (TEEGEN, ELIZABETH)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 11/13/2017. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/11/2017. Discovery due by 3/26/2018. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/27/2017. (djb)
October 27, 2017 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of CHIEF JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #8 Answer to Complaint (see proposed initial scheduling order) (djb)
October 27, 2017 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by CELESTE PHILIP. (BLOCKER, WILLIAM)
October 26, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL JOVANE WILLIAMS on behalf of All Defendants (WILLIAMS, MICHAEL)
October 26, 2017 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by WILLIAM MICHAEL BLOCKER, II on behalf of All Defendants (BLOCKER, WILLIAM)
October 12, 2017 Set Deadlines - Re: #5 Summons Returned Executed. CELESTE PHILIP answer due 10/27/2017. (djb)
October 12, 2017 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief served on Celeste Philip on 10/06/2017, filed by HEATHER KOKESCH DEL CASTILLO. (BARGIL, ARI)
October 4, 2017 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to CELESTE PHILIP. (djb)
October 4, 2017 Filing 3 Civil Filing fee Received: $ 400.00, receipt number FLN3-11278. Fee status updated to paid. (djb)
October 3, 2017 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (BARGIL, ARI)
October 3, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against CELESTE PHILIP, filed by HEATHER KOKESCH DEL CASTILLO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Summons) (BARGIL, ARI) Modified on 10/27/2017 (djb).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KOKESCH DEL CASTILLO v. PHILIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CELESTE PHILIP
Represented By: TIMOTHY LEEDS NEWHALL
Represented By: WILLIAM MICHAEL BLOCKER, II
Represented By: JONATHAN ALAN GLOGAU
Represented By: MICHAEL JOVANE WILLIAMS
Represented By: ELIZABETH ANN TEEGEN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEATHER KOKESCH DEL CASTILLO
Represented By: ARI S BARGIL
Represented By: PAUL MICHAEL SHERMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?