MILLER v. JOLLY ROGERS MARINE SERVICES LLC ET AL
Plaintiff: DAVID E MILLER
Defendant: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON, DANIEL L ADAMS and JOLLY ROGERS MARINE SERVICES LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv01402
Filed: June 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Escambia
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Referring Judge: ROGER VINSON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1333
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re #24 Stipulation of Dismissal. The claims against Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's of London Subscribing to Policy Number B0621MASRSWV15BND, d/b/a/ Seawave Yacht Insurance, are hereby dismissed, with prejudice and without taxation of costs. the Court reserves the power, upon motion filed by either side within 60 days after this date, to amend, alter or vacate and set aside this order of dismissal. The claims against defendant Jolly Rogers Marine Services remain pending. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 7/1/2019. (alb)
June 28, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re: #24 Stipulation of Dismissal. (alb)
June 26, 2019 Filing 24 STIPULATION of Dismissal by DAVID E MILLER. (HAUSFELD, M.)
April 17, 2019 Filing 23 MEDIATION REPORT - Impasse. (KIRKLAND, BRIAN)
April 17, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re: #23 Mediation Report - Impasse. (All deadlines have expired.) (alb)
March 8, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MEDIATION re Scheduling . (KIRKLAND, BRIAN)
December 6, 2018 Filing 21 ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint by JOLLY ROGERS MARINE SERVICES LLC. (SHOEMAKER, GREGORY)
November 26, 2018 Filing 20 ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON. (SUSIK, KRISTEN)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Extend Time. The deadline for Defendant Underwriters expert disclosures is extended by thirty (30) days.s/Elizabeth M. TimothyChief United States Magistrate Judge on 11/15/18. (tsm)
November 15, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #18 MOTION to Extend Time to File Expert Disclosure. Referred to ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY. (alb)
November 14, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION to Extend Time to File Expert Disclosure by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (SUSIK, KRISTEN)
November 13, 2018 Filing 17 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT MILLER, DAVID E. against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by DAVID E MILLER. (HAUSFELD, M.)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 MOTION for Leave to File Amended #1 Complaint. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 11/13/2018. (djb)
November 13, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re: #15 First MOTION For Leave to File Amended #1 Complaint 3:18-CV-1402 by DAVID E MILLER. (Attachments: #1 Supplement MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT, #2 Supplement FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) (please see proposed R&O). (MB)
November 9, 2018 Filing 15 First MOTION For Leave to File Amended #1 Complaint 3:18-CV-1402 by DAVID E MILLER. (Attachments: #1 Supplement MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND COMPLAINT, #2 Supplement FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) (HAUSFELD, M.)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER re #11 Joint Report: Discovery due by 3/10/2019. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 9/7/2018. (sdw)
August 30, 2018 Filing 13 DISCOVERY ADVISORY: Re #12 Request for Production filed by DAVID E MILLER. Counsel's attention is directed to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5 (d), which prohibits the filing of discovery materials (including notices of deposition, deposition transcripts, interrogatories and interrogatory responses and notices thereof, production requests and responses and notices thereof, and admissions requests and responses and notices thereof) and disclosures under Rules 26(a)(1) and 26(a)(2), unless and until needed for consideration of pending motions by the court. This advisory serves as notice that no further discovery materials should be filed and all discovery posting options have been removed from CMECF. (sdw)
August 30, 2018 Filing 12 REQUEST PRODUCTION by DAVID E MILLER. (HAUSFELD, M.)
August 30, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re: #11 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (MB)
August 29, 2018 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (SHOEMAKER, GREGORY)
July 27, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON identifying Corporate Parent THE TRAVELERS COMPANIES INC for CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON.. (SUSIK, KRISTEN)
July 26, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by JOLLY ROGERS MARINE SERVICES LLC. (SHOEMAKER, GREGORY)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 7/30/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 8/29/2018. Discovery due by 12/10/2018. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 7/16/2018. (alb)
July 13, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON. (SUSIK, KRISTEN)
July 13, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re: #6 Answer to Complaint (please see proposed initial scheduling order) (djb)
July 12, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by JOLLY ROGERS MARINE SERVICES LLC. (SHOEMAKER, GREGORY)
June 20, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to DANIEL L ADAMS, CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON, JOLLY ROGERS MARINE SERVICES LLC. (Attachments: #1 JOLLY ROGERS, #2 UNDERWRITERS) (alb)
June 19, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE Notice of Summons by DAVID E MILLER re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement) (HAUSFELD, M.)
June 8, 2018 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (alb)
June 8, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (HAUSFELD, M.)
June 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT MILLER against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4199934.), filed by David E. Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A SeaWave Yacht Insurance Policy) (HAUSFELD, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MILLER v. JOLLY ROGERS MARINE SERVICES LLC ET AL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS OF LONDON
Represented By: CHRISTOPHER R FERTIG
Represented By: KRISTEN MARIE SUSIK
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DANIEL L ADAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOLLY ROGERS MARINE SERVICES LLC
Represented By: GREGORY MARK SHOEMAKER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID E MILLER
Represented By: M. KEVIN HAUSFELD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?