TAYLOR et al v. VENN
Appellee: JOHN E VENN, JR
Appellant: DANA L MINOR and STEPHEN W TAYLOR
Case Number: 3:2018cv01864
Filed: August 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Office: Pensacola Office
County: Walton
Presiding Judge: CHARLES J KAHN
Referring Judge: ROGER VINSON
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2018 Filing 5 Supplement to Complete Record on Appeal (Attachments: #1 Taylor vs Venn cert docket, #2 Taylor vs Venn transcript bkr 94) (Romine, Carolyn)
September 28, 2018 Filing 4 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order - Appellant Brief due by 10/29/2018. Appellee Brief due by 11/29/2018. Appellant Reply Brief due by 12/13/2018. (MB)
September 28, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE - Email notification from Bankruptcy Court stating, "we don't expect there will be an actual designation of record because the time has expired for designation to be filed". (MB)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLETE RECORD OF APPEAL: SUPPLEMENTAL TRANSMITTAL SHEET (Attachments: #1 Certified Copy of Docket 3:17-ap-3013) (Hawkins, Jestin)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 Bankruptcy Transmittal Sheet by DANA L MINOR, STEPHEN W TAYLOR (Attachments: #1 Certified Bk Docket, #2 Bk doc 81 - Find Fact & Conc Law, #3 Bk doc 82 - Fnl Jdgmnt, #4 Bk doc 84 - Ntc of Appeal) (Hawkins, Jestin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: TAYLOR et al v. VENN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: JOHN E VENN, JR
Represented By: JOHN EDWARD VENN, JR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: DANA L MINOR
Represented By: DAVID LUTHER WOODWARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: STEPHEN W TAYLOR
Represented By: DAVID LUTHER WOODWARD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?