ADVANCED CABLE TIES INC v. AMERICAN ELITE MOLDING LLC et al
Plaintiff: ADVANCED CABLE TIES INC
Defendant: AMERICAN ELITE MOLDING LLC, Robert D. Sires and ROBERT D SIRES
Case Number: 3:2018cv02035
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
Referring Judge: GARY R JONES
2 Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 17, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEDIATION REFERRAL re #17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Discovery due by 8/31/2019. The deadline for filing potentially Dispositive Motions as well as Daubert motions is 9/23/2019. Mediation to take place by 9/30/2019. Mediation Report due by 10/15/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/17/2018. (MB)
October 17, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #17 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (MB)
October 16, 2018 Filing 17 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (EWERT, DANIEL)
October 16, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by JAMES ROBERT GREEN, JR on behalf of All Defendants (GREEN, JAMES)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. Unopposed Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff, ECF No. #8 , is GRANTED. Attorney Joseph D. Lipchitz, of the law firm of Saul, Ewing, Arnstein & Lehr, LLP, is admitted pro hac vice to represent the Plaintiff, Advanced Cable Ties, Inc., pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(C). (Appointed JOSEPH DOMINIC LIPCHITZ for ADVANCED CABLE TIES INC). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/02/2018. (MB)
October 2, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4292077.) (MB)
October 2, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by MARY GRACE RAHM on behalf of AMERICAN ELITE MOLDING LLC (RAHM, MARY GRACE)
September 20, 2018 Filing 13 DUPLICATE ENTRY - please see D.E. #12 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by ADVANCED CABLE TIES INC. (EWERT, DANIEL) Modified on 9/20/2018 (MB).
September 20, 2018 Filing 12 AMENDED Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by ADVANCED CABLE TIES INC. (EWERT, DANIEL)
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES no longer assigned to case. **Please use the new initials MJF on all future pleadings; i.e. 3:18cv2035-MCR-MJF. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 9/19/2018. (erl)
September 19, 2018 Filing 10 Incorrect pdf attached. NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by ADVANCED CABLE TIES INC (EWERT, DANIEL) Modified on 9/20/2018 to note correct event filed at D.E. #12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (MB).
September 19, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES by ADVANCED CABLE TIES INC. (EWERT, DANIEL) Modified on 9/20/2018 (MB).
September 19, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4292077.) by ADVANCED CABLE TIES INC. (EWERT, DANIEL)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER - Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 10/2/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/1/2018. Discovery due by 3/18/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/18/20018. (MB)
September 18, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #5 Answer to Complaint (please see proposed ISO). (MB)
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by AMERICAN ELITE MOLDING LLC. (POWELL, ROBERT)
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by AMERICAN ELITE MOLDING LLC, ROBERT D SIRES. (POWELL, ROBERT)
August 23, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to AMERICAN ELITE MOLDING LLC, (Attachments: #1 Summons - Robert Sires). (MB)
August 23, 2018 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (DEFENDANT - ROBERT D SIRES). (MB)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (EWERT, DANIEL)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4267809.), filed by ADVANCED CABLE TIES INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Summons, #7 Summons) (EWERT, DANIEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADVANCED CABLE TIES INC v. AMERICAN ELITE MOLDING LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AMERICAN ELITE MOLDING LLC
Represented By: MARY GRACE RAHM
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT GREEN, JR
Represented By: ROBERT JAMES POWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert D. Sires
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROBERT D SIRES
Represented By: JAMES ROBERT GREEN, JR
Represented By: ROBERT JAMES POWELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADVANCED CABLE TIES INC
Represented By: DANIEL MARVIN EWERT
Represented By: JOSEPH DOMINIC LIPCHITZ
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?