MACK et al v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: MICHAEL SHANE VAUGHN, CAMERON SHIELDS, ARSENIO PELAYO, SYLVIA ZAJIS, EDWIN PRESCOTT JR., AMI BUBICA, BRENDA BARKER, BRIAN WHITE, GARRY LONG, ANTHONY SORREL, TANYA ZEIGLER, COURTNEY RUMBLEY, ROCHELLE LAMBERT, BRIAN MACK, VINCE BULICKI, LINDA ZUMWALT, SARAH SAUSEDO, DIANNA KOBIELA, AMANDA GALLAGHER, MINDY TACKMIER, KATHY BUNCH, ALLISON O'CAIN, JON HURLEY, CRYSTAL RUSSELL, CAROL BEAL, LIANA MASUCCI, JULIUS WOODS, NAM WARREN, MICHELLE GILLIAM, LISA NORRIS, TAMMIE LEVERT, HEATHER BROOKS, KEITH SHARP, KEITH NATHAN, LISA MCCLELLAN, MENDY JOHNSON, KELLY STEWART, MALIK THROWER, TAMMIE MERRIDTH, VICKI GILLIGAN, GEROMI CLAY, BRENDA RILEY, KENNETH FARLEY SR., BRANDON JONES, KEMIA GRIFFIN, JESSICA YATES, VICKI VANDENBURG, YVETTE WALTERS, RICHARD LEWIS, RICHARD FUSTON, REGINALD PHILLIPS, MINDY GRANT, COURTNEY LANDERS, CHARLES HARDY, DIANNE SMITH, JACQUELYN BISSELL, JEANETTE ANDERSON, DIANA HARPER, SAVANNAH WEST, LEAH RITTER, ROCHELLE SIGAN, TISA BAKER, MIKITA MICKENS, JOSEPH HOGAN, TABATHER GILES, TANA GILBERT, GREGORY DANEL, NICOLLETTE HURD, LEON LEWIS, MELINDA HENDRICKS, FELICIA IVY, JOHN YEE, DILWORTH ROLAND, ROBYN BAIRD, KENNETH FARLEY, SR, EDWIN PRESCOTT, JR and JON C HURLEY
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD, BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY and OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Case Number: 3:2018cv02059
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2018 Filing 21 ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Superior Court of San Francisco re #20 Order. (djb)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Re: 3:16md2734. Plaintiffs Omnibus Motion to Remand Cases to California State Courts, ECF No. 998, is GRANTED. The California cases are REMANDED. Brian Mack, et al. v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Co., et al., Case No. 3:18cv2059, is REMANDED to the Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco, where it was filed at Case No. CGC-18-568822. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 11/8/2018. (copy of order mailed to county court) (djb)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF NONRESIDENT PLAINTIFFS FROM CALIFORNIA ACTIONS. The claims of the Plaintiffs listed at Exhibit A are dismissed from the California Actions. Within 60 days of this Order, the Plaintiffs listed at Exhibit A may refile their claims in this MDL using Short Form complaints. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Nonresident Plaintiffs (59) terminated in separate entry) (djb)
August 31, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS LARRY HILL on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (HILL, THOMAS)
August 31, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #17 Case Transferred In - District Transfer, #1 Notice of Removal (djb)
August 31, 2018 Filing 17 Case electronically transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:18-cv-04928. Original file with document numbers 1 - 16 received. Modified on 8/31/2018 (djb).
August 31, 2018 Filing 16 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER(CTO-23) IN RE: ABILIFY (ARIPIPRAZOLOE) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION MDL. 2734 (sxbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/31/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 8/24/18. (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/31/2018.]
August 24, 2018 Filing 14 Certificate of Interested Entities by Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Otsuka America, Inc. for Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and Civ. L.R. 3-15 of Defendant Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. (Enns, Krista) (Filed on 8/24/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/31/2018.]
August 24, 2018 Filing 13 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING TRANSFER TO THE ABILIFY MDL filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 8/24/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/31/2018.]
August 24, 2018 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/16/2018 02:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 01, 17th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order, #3 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording) (tfS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/31/2018.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice Of Withdrawal Of Ground Of Removal (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 8/23/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/31/2018.]
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Susan Illston for all further proceedings. Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/23/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/31/2018.]
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers on 8/23/2018. (fs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/31/2018.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ERRATA re #5 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 8/22/2018) Modified on 8/22/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 8/31/2018.]
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/21/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/31/2018.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/31/2018.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc., Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd... (Gramacy, Ryan) (Filed on 8/21/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/31/2018.]
August 15, 2018 Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/31/2018.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/28/2018. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/31/2018.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 8/14/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/31/2018.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-18-568822. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12594250). Filed byBristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 8/14/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 8/31/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MACK et al v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL SHANE VAUGHN
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAMERON SHIELDS
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARSENIO PELAYO
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SYLVIA ZAJIS
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWIN PRESCOTT JR.
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMI BUBICA
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA BARKER
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN WHITE
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARRY LONG
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY SORREL
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TANYA ZEIGLER
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COURTNEY RUMBLEY
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROCHELLE LAMBERT
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRIAN MACK
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VINCE BULICKI
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA ZUMWALT
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARAH SAUSEDO
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANNA KOBIELA
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMANDA GALLAGHER
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MINDY TACKMIER
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHY BUNCH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALLISON O'CAIN
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JON HURLEY
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRYSTAL RUSSELL
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROL BEAL
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIANA MASUCCI
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIUS WOODS
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAM WARREN
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELLE GILLIAM
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA NORRIS
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMMIE LEVERT
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEATHER BROOKS
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEITH SHARP
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEITH NATHAN
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA MCCLELLAN
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MENDY JOHNSON
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELLY STEWART
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALIK THROWER
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAMMIE MERRIDTH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICKI GILLIGAN
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEROMI CLAY
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA RILEY
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH FARLEY SR.
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRANDON JONES
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEMIA GRIFFIN
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSICA YATES
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VICKI VANDENBURG
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YVETTE WALTERS
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD LEWIS
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD FUSTON
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REGINALD PHILLIPS
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MINDY GRANT
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COURTNEY LANDERS
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHARLES HARDY
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANNE SMITH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACQUELYN BISSELL
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEANETTE ANDERSON
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANA HARPER
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAVANNAH WEST
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEAH RITTER
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROCHELLE SIGAN
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TISA BAKER
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIKITA MICKENS
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH HOGAN
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TABATHER GILES
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TANA GILBERT
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GREGORY DANEL
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICOLLETTE HURD
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEON LEWIS
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELINDA HENDRICKS
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FELICIA IVY
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN YEE
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DILWORTH ROLAND
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBYN BAIRD
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH FARLEY, SR
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWIN PRESCOTT, JR
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JON C HURLEY
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Represented By: RYAN SCOTT GRAMACY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By: THOMAS LARRY HILL
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: RYAN SCOTT GRAMACY
Represented By: EDWARD W GERECKE
Represented By: LAUREN S COLTON
Represented By: DAVID JOSEPH WALZ
Represented By: ANAND AGNESHWAR
Represented By: MATTHEW A EISENSTEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Represented By: Krista M. Enns
Represented By: RYAN SCOTT GRAMACY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?