ABRAHAM et al v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: ABU BELLA, ERIC PACKETT, WAYNE BLUMERT, DEREK HOWE, DELORES CORLEY, EBONY JOHNSON, DONNA BOISVERT, SHERRI THULIN, ROBERT DOCKERY, JR, STANLEY HAMILTON, ORVAL CASADA, KARYN WARREN, KENNETH STRICKLAND, MCKINSEY EICH, PAT PATTON, STACEY LYDDON, MICHELLE LANDATO, CLAYTON TURNER, III, ELIZABETH BLOUNT, DEBRA PINION, JOHNNY PURDIS, HESTER REEVES, DARLEEN HALE, CRYSTAL FOSTER, MARY PHILLIPS, NEIL ROBINSON, SHIRLEY BUSH, NATHALIE DOUGLAS, JUSTIN KIDD, DERRICK BENJAMIN, JACQUELINE KONLEY, GLORIA KONTNER, PETRINA CLARY, SENORA WARE, JENNIFER SZURA, ROBERT SMITH, JULIA WEISS, ARN WILSON, ISMAEL BANUELOS, ALBERT ABRAHAM, JR, TYRONE ROBINSON, AMBROSHIA TYUS, JANET QUEISER, KIM PEARSON, ADELE KOMAREK, DENA DONELSON, MICHELLE SHERMAN, TIMOTHY OWENS, MELINDA WATTS, KELLY DILEO, STEPHANIE TRICE, DANNY MITCHELL, KIM KELLEY, REGINA LOBATO, SABRENA THOMAS, BECKY ALLGOOD, DEBRA WILLIAMS, MARY KNIGHT, DAVID ARVESON, COREY MEASAW, PAUL KALFUT, SR, LENA CORDOVA, TERESA ALLEMANG, BILLIE ROLLAND, WESLEY SCOTT, BRYAN BENNETT, PATRICK HOLLNGDALE, SHALANTE SIMPSON, BENDETTA APPLEBERRY, KENNETH THORNBRUGH, MINDY MONACO, CALVIN SCOTT, CAGNEY CARTER, ANTHONY KEMPER, BILLIE ROLAND, CHRISTOPHER YANCY, DONALD SUTTON, SHIRLEY MCNEIL, CHERYL MCCREIGHT, SHARON HICKS and SHANNA COLEMAN
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD, OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC and BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2018cv02063
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446pl
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF NONRESIDENT PLAINTIFFS FROM CALIFORNIA ACTIONS. The claims of the Plaintiffs listed at Exhibit A are dismissed from the California Actions. Within 60 days of this Order, the Plaintiffs listed at Exhibit A may refile their claims in this MDL using Short Form complaints. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A). DAVID ARVESON, ABU BELLA, ELIZABETH BLOUNT, WAYNE BLUMERT, DONNA BOISVERT, ORVAL CASADA, PETRINA CLARY, LENA CORDOVA, KELLY DILEO, ROBERT DOCKERY, JR, DENA DONELSON, NATHALIE DOUGLAS, MCKINSEY EICH, CRYSTAL FOSTER, DARLEEN HALE, STANLEY HAMILTON, SHARON HICKS, PATRICK HOLLNGDALE, DEREK HOWE, EBONY JOHNSON, PAUL KALFUT, SR, KIM KELLEY, ANTHONY KEMPER, JUSTIN KIDD, MARY KNIGHT, ADELE KOMAREK, JACQUELINE KONLEY, GLORIA KONTNER, MICHELLE LANDATO, REGINA LOBATO, STACEY LYDDON, CHERYL MCCREIGHT, SHIRLEY MCNEIL, COREY MEASAW, DANNY MITCHELL, MINDY MONACO, TIMOTHY OWENS, ERIC PACKETT, PAT PATTON, KIM PEARSON, MARY PHILLIPS, DEBRA PINION, JOHNNY PURDIS, JANET QUEISER, HESTER REEVES, NEIL ROBINSON, TYRONE ROBINSON, BILLIE ROLAND, BILLIE ROLLAND, CALVIN SCOTT, WESLEY SCOTT, MICHELLE SHERMAN, SHALANTE SIMPSON, ROBERT SMITH, KENNETH STRICKLAND, DONALD SUTTON, JENNIFER SZURA, SABRENA THOMAS, KENNETH THORNBRUGH, SHERRI THULIN, STEPHANIE TRICE, CLAYTON TURNER, III, AMBROSHIA TYUS, SENORA WARE, KARYN WARREN, MELINDA WATTS, JULIA WEISS, DEBRA WILLIAMS, ARN WILSON, CHRISTOPHER YANCY, TERESA ALLEMANG and BECKY ALLGOOD terminated. (djb)
September 4, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS LARRY HILL on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (HILL, THOMAS)
September 4, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #14 Case Transferred In - District Transfer, #1 Notice of Removal (djb)
September 4, 2018 Filing 14 Case electronically transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:18-cv-05032. Original file with documents numbered 1 - 13 received. Modified on 9/4/2018 (djb).
August 29, 2018 Filing 13 MDL ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the Northern District of Florida. (cjlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/4/2018.]
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING TRANSFER TO THE ABILIFY MDL; ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting #10 Stipulation. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/27/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/4/2018.]
August 24, 2018 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Otsuka America, Inc. for Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. (Enns, Krista) (Filed on 8/24/2018) Modified on 8/27/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 9/4/2018.]
August 24, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING TRANSFER TO THE ABILIFY MDL filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 8/24/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/4/2018.]
August 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 12/6/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 12/13/2018 at 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/23/18. (kcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/23/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/4/2018.]
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton. Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/22/18. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/4/2018.]
August 22, 2018 Filing 7 ERRATA re #5 Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 8/22/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/4/2018.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/4/2018.]
August 21, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Gramacy, Ryan) (Filed on 8/21/2018) Modified on 8/23/2018 (cjlS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 9/4/2018.]
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/13/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/20/2018 10:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 8/17/18. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/4/2018.]
August 17, 2018 #Electronic filing error. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Attorneys Paired Up with Wrong Representation. (aaaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/4/2018.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/31/2018. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/4/2018.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 8/17/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/4/2018.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL OF ACTION PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1332,1441, AND 1446; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; (NO PROCESS); from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-18-568915. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12603509). Filed byBristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mayo, Sharon) (Filed on 8/17/2018) Modified on 8/20/2018 (aaaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 9/4/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABRAHAM et al v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABU BELLA
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC PACKETT
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAYNE BLUMERT
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEREK HOWE
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DELORES CORLEY
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EBONY JOHNSON
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA BOISVERT
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERRI THULIN
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT DOCKERY, JR
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STANLEY HAMILTON
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ORVAL CASADA
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARYN WARREN
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH STRICKLAND
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCKINSEY EICH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAT PATTON
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STACEY LYDDON
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELLE LANDATO
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLAYTON TURNER, III
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH BLOUNT
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBRA PINION
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNNY PURDIS
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HESTER REEVES
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARLEEN HALE
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRYSTAL FOSTER
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY PHILLIPS
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NEIL ROBINSON
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHIRLEY BUSH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHALIE DOUGLAS
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUSTIN KIDD
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DERRICK BENJAMIN
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACQUELINE KONLEY
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLORIA KONTNER
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PETRINA CLARY
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SENORA WARE
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER SZURA
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT SMITH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIA WEISS
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARN WILSON
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISMAEL BANUELOS
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBERT ABRAHAM, JR
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYRONE ROBINSON
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMBROSHIA TYUS
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JANET QUEISER
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIM PEARSON
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ADELE KOMAREK
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENA DONELSON
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELLE SHERMAN
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY OWENS
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MELINDA WATTS
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELLY DILEO
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE TRICE
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANNY MITCHELL
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIM KELLEY
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REGINA LOBATO
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SABRENA THOMAS
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BECKY ALLGOOD
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBRA WILLIAMS
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY KNIGHT
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID ARVESON
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COREY MEASAW
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL KALFUT, SR
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LENA CORDOVA
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERESA ALLEMANG
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILLIE ROLLAND
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WESLEY SCOTT
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYAN BENNETT
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK HOLLNGDALE
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHALANTE SIMPSON
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BENDETTA APPLEBERRY
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH THORNBRUGH
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MINDY MONACO
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CALVIN SCOTT
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAGNEY CARTER
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY KEMPER
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILLIE ROLAND
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER YANCY
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONALD SUTTON
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHIRLEY MCNEIL
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHERYL MCCREIGHT
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON HICKS
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANNA COLEMAN
Represented By: RUTH THI RIZKALLA
Represented By: MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY
Represented By: BEHRAM V PAREKH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MCKESSON CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Represented By: Krista M. Enns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By: THOMAS LARRY HILL
Represented By: Sharon D. Mayo
Represented By: RYAN SCOTT GRAMACY
Represented By: CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR.
Represented By: DAVID JOSEPH WALZ
Represented By: ANAND AGNESHWAR
Represented By: EDWARD W GERECKE
Represented By: MATTHEW A EISENSTEIN
Represented By: LAUREN S COLTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?