ADAMS et al v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: MARY D. WALLACE, PAUL BERRY, NATHAN BROWN, MICHELE SZARKA, KARA ALLEN, TREVON ANDERSON, MICHELLE CHRISTIDIS, BEVERLY WILLIAMS, LEWIS COOPER, ANTHONY E. WILEY, MONIQUE C. CADE, HAROLD SWANK, CHRISTOPHER CATHCART, SHANE CHENEAU, KIMBERLY STAVICH, DAVID BAKER, MARIA WELCH, VIRGINIA BEAM, RICKY STEVENSON, GERALD L. WILLIAMS, JAMES K. COOK, KIMBERLY WILSON, TYRONE TOMLIN, SKYE BARNES, CRYSTAL ASHTON, KEVIN WILLIAMS, STEVEN BUTTWEILER, TIFFANY WHITZEL, CANDY WILDEN, SHARITA ATTIAH, TRACEY BARNES, DEBRA CANTANIA, CARRIE GREEN, GWENDOLYN SPENCE, JERON BROWN, CRYSTAL GRIFFIN, TRACEY BISHOP, LYNETTE WILSON, KAMERRA BARNES, AREN WILLIAMS, TERRY GIBSON, DARRYL BLACKWELL, YOLANDA ADAMS, JAMES J. BILLBERRY, MICHAEL CAMPBELL II, DAVID SPAHR, PATRICK SPRAGLEY, MCQUETTA CARTER II, BRENAE BARNES, RICKY L. WILSON, AMANDA STINSON, SHARI SWAFFORD, MILDRED CLOUD, ARTHUR STOKES, ROBERTA BURNETT, THOMAS WOGENSEN, DANNY BAUERLE, HAROLD WILLIAMS, PATRICIA ARMSTRONG, AL COOKS, JEROME WOODS, STEPHANIE BARNES, THOMAS J. CARBONE, DAPHNE D. COLEMAN, DERRICK WARREN, EDWARD BELL, TONYA COPELAND, TANICA CHANCELLOR, RONALD BOYKINS, MICHAEL CARSON, ROBERT B. BRYANT, LATOYA SPEED, SHANE SVEUM, JOHNNIE M. WILSON, SHAMEKA THOMAS, ANTHONY E WILEY, ROBERT B BRYANT, MCQUETTA CARTER, II, MARY D WALLACE, GERALD L WILLIAMS, MICHAEL CAMPBELL, II, RICKY L WILSON, MONIQUE C CADE, JAMES K COOK, DAPHNE D COLEMAN, THOMAS J CARBONE, JAMES J BILLBERRY and JOHNNIE M WILSON
Defendant: OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY and OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Case Number: 3:2018cv02067
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS LARRY HILL on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (HILL, THOMAS)
August 30, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE Regarding Admission to Practice as to R. Joseph Hrubiec counsel for plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 MDL 2734 - Amended Order 252 ) (mailed to counsel) (djb)
August 30, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #6 Case Transferred In - District Transfer, #1 Complaint. (djb)
August 30, 2018 Filing 6 Case electronically transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:18-cv-01238. Original file with documents numbered 1 - 5 received. Modified on 8/30/2018 (djb).
August 29, 2018 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER by the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/30/2018.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yolanda Adams. Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. served on 8/16/2018, answer due 9/6/2018. (Hrubiec, R.) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/30/2018.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yolanda Adams. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company served on 8/16/2018, answer due 9/6/2018. (Hrubiec, R.) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/30/2018.]
August 15, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01238-CFC, 1:18-cv-01241-CFC, 1:18-cv-01242-CFC, 1:18-cv-01243-CFC(rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/30/2018.]
August 15, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Bristol-Myers Squibb Company on 8/15/2018; Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. on 8/15/2018; Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. on 8/15/2018. (crb) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/30/2018.]
August 14, 2018 No Summons Issued. (sar) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/30/2018.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (sar) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/30/2018.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc., Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co. Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2439186.) - filed by Christopher Cathcart, Debra Cantania, Tiffany Whitzel, Ronald Boykins, Johnnie M. Wilson, Sharita Attiah, Steven Buttweiler, James J. Billberry, Kimberly Wilson, Edward Bell, Carrie Green, Shari Swafford, Ricky L. Wilson, Monique C. Cade, Michele Szarka, Derrick Warren, Darryl Blackwell, Kamerra Barnes, Marquetta Carter II, Shane Cheneau, Skye Barnes, Gwendolyn Spence, Anthony E. Wiley, Thomas J. Carbone, Kimberly Stavich, James K. Cook, Candy Wilden, Shameka Thomas, Lewis Cooper, Stephanie Barnes, Virginia Beam, Amanda Stinson, Mary D. Wallace, Harold Swank, Lynette Wilson, Aren Williams, Crystal Griffin, Jerome Woods, Tracey Bishop, Maria Welch, Shane Sveum, Beverly Williams, Kevin Williams, Gerald L. Williams, Paul Berry, Yolanda Adams, Michael Carson, Roberta Burnett, Michael Campbell II, Thomas Wogensen, AL Cook, Danny Bauerle, Harold Williams, Tyrone Tomlin, Patrick Spragley, Robert B. Bryant, Arthur Stokes, Jeron Brown, Tonya Copeland, David Spahr, Nathan Brown, Tracey Barnes, Crystal Ashton, Kara Allen, Michelle Christidis, Brenae Barnes, Ricky Stevenson, Latoya Speed, David Baker, Daphne D. Coleman, Trevon Anderson, Tanica Chancellor, Mildred Cloud, Terry Gibson, Patricia Armstrong. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sar) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/30/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ADAMS et al v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY D. WALLACE
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PAUL BERRY
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATHAN BROWN
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELE SZARKA
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARA ALLEN
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TREVON ANDERSON
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHELLE CHRISTIDIS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BEVERLY WILLIAMS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LEWIS COOPER
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY E. WILEY
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONIQUE C. CADE
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAROLD SWANK
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER CATHCART
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANE CHENEAU
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY STAVICH
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID BAKER
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARIA WELCH
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VIRGINIA BEAM
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICKY STEVENSON
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERALD L. WILLIAMS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES K. COOK
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY WILSON
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TYRONE TOMLIN
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SKYE BARNES
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRYSTAL ASHTON
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KEVIN WILLIAMS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN BUTTWEILER
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIFFANY WHITZEL
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CANDY WILDEN
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARITA ATTIAH
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACEY BARNES
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEBRA CANTANIA
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARRIE GREEN
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GWENDOLYN SPENCE
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERON BROWN
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRYSTAL GRIFFIN
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACEY BISHOP
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LYNETTE WILSON
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KAMERRA BARNES
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AREN WILLIAMS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TERRY GIBSON
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARRYL BLACKWELL
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: YOLANDA ADAMS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES J. BILLBERRY
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL CAMPBELL II
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID SPAHR
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICK SPRAGLEY
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCQUETTA CARTER II
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENAE BARNES
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICKY L. WILSON
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AMANDA STINSON
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARI SWAFFORD
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MILDRED CLOUD
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARTHUR STOKES
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERTA BURNETT
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS WOGENSEN
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANNY BAUERLE
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAROLD WILLIAMS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA ARMSTRONG
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AL COOKS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEROME WOODS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHANIE BARNES
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS J. CARBONE
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAPHNE D. COLEMAN
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DERRICK WARREN
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD BELL
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONYA COPELAND
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TANICA CHANCELLOR
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD BOYKINS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL CARSON
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT B. BRYANT
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LATOYA SPEED
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHANE SVEUM
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNNIE M. WILSON
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHAMEKA THOMAS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTHONY E WILEY
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT B BRYANT
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MCQUETTA CARTER, II
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARY D WALLACE
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GERALD L WILLIAMS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL CAMPBELL, II
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICKY L WILSON
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONIQUE C CADE
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES K COOK
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAPHNE D COLEMAN
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS J CARBONE
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES J BILLBERRY
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNNIE M WILSON
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By: LAUREN S COLTON
Represented By: CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR.
Represented By: EDWARD W GERECKE
Represented By: DAVID JOSEPH WALZ
Represented By: ANAND AGNESHWAR
Represented By: MATTHEW A EISENSTEIN
Represented By: THOMAS LARRY HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?