MEYER et al v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Plaintiff: ANNETTE PORTER, DIONNE REISERT, SHARON L. REITER, BERNELL WILLIAMS, DEVANTE THOMAS, TONIE SANDERS, JACQUELINE MEYER, WANDA WOOD, WILLIAM MORRISON, MICHAEL SWAN, CHRISTOPHER SAWYER, CAROLYN PARKER, CHRISTOPHER SUTHERLIN, DENNIS TAPLEY, BRENDA MORROW, DARLENE SABATINE, IRIS NICHOLS, REBECCA WILSON, ALBERTO NAVA, MICHAEL DEAN SACORA, EDGAR VALLEY, KANNON RUSSELL, ERIC STUMP, DOMINIQUE C. POWELL, SARAH THORTON, SYLVIA STANTON TAYLOR, JOHN WALTERS, ESTELLA M. RODRIGUEZ, NANCY V. RHODES, DIANE WILSON, SARAH WINGARD, LETROY TOUSSAINT, ELIZABETH PENDER, KIMBERLEE SMITH SCHULZ, CHRISTOPHER STRAIGHT, TIMOTHY PRICE, MICHAEL MILNER, COREY J. RAINS, CHERYL L. WILDER, BRICE SHEPPARD, DATRON SIMMONS, GARY STORCH, JAMYRAH ROBINSON, JUANITA D. SMITH, PHYLLIS THURSTON, JAY DEE RICHARDS, SANDRA F. SMITH, ANTONIO ROMERO, JERMAL STAGGERS, TRACY WAYMAN, JOYCE A. PRINGLE, ZANPHIER WALKER, CASSANDRA SIMPSON, JAMES STOKES, SYLVIA J. RICE, FLLOYD SAXTON, MAUREEN MITCHELL, HEATHER SWALLOP, BOBIE NALL, JOSHUA NALL, MARCUS NICKLOW, ERNEST E. WILKINS, GLORIA THOMAS, DONNA R. SAMUELIAN, KISHA WILLIAMS, EPPIE SILVA, CHERYL L WILDER, SYLVIA J RICE, DOMINIQUE C POWELL, SHARON L REITER, NANCY V RHODES, ERNEST E WILKINS, SANDRA F SMITH, DONNA R SAMUELIAN, ESTELLA M RODRIGUEZ, JUANITA D SMITH, JOYCE A PRINGLE and COREY J RAINS
Defendant: OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC, OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD and BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Case Number: 3:2018cv02070
Filed: August 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: GARY R JONES
Referring Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER - The Court has been advised that the cases identified on Exhibit A were settled under the global settlement program for this litigation. Accordingly: The cases identified on Exhibit A are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE from the active docket of the Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 6/5/2020. (djb)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER - The individual cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for the plaintiffs' failure to prosecute and/or failure to comply with court orders. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual docket for each of the cases identified in Exhibit A, and then to close those cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/17/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/17/2019. JAMES STOKES, PHYLLIS THURSTON, WILLIAM MORRISON and EPPIE SILVA terminated. (djb)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER - This matter is before the Court on the timely responses to the Courts Order to Show Cause dated October 1, 2019, Case No. 3:16md2734, ECF No. 1177 , filed by the plaintiffs identified on Exhibit A. The Court accepts the plaintiffs' responses and finds good cause shown; therefore, no sanctions will be imposed in these cases. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/17/2019. (djb)
October 15, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #28 Response to Order to Show Cause by Corey Rains, re #27 Order (djb)
October 14, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by COREY J RAINS. (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER - The individual cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for the plaintiffs' failure to comply with court orders. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual docket for each of the cases identified in Exhibit A, and then to close those cases in their entirety for all purposes. DATRON SIMMONS terminated. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/11/2019. (djb)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER - All individual plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are hereby ORDERED to show cause in writing why his or her case should not be dismissed with prejudice for failure to prosecute and/or failure to comply with an order of the Court, by October 14, 2019. Each plaintiffs response to the show cause order must be filed on the docket for his or her individual case only. Each plaintiff must also comply with the Courts Order, ECF No. 1176. Failure to comply with these Orders will result in dismissal of a case with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual docket for each of the cases identified in Exhibit A. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/1/2019. (djb)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER - The individual cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for the plaintiffs' failure to comply with court orders. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual docket for each of the cases identified in Exhibit A, and then to close those cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/24/2019. (djb)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER re #24 Response to Order to Show Cause filed by SANDRA F SMITH. This matter is before the Court on the timely responses to the Court's Order to Show Cause dated September 6, 2019, Case No. 3:16md2734, ECF No. 1165, filed by the plaintiffs identified on Exhibit A. The Court accepts the plaintiffs' responses and finds good cause shown; therefore, no sanctions will be imposed in these cases. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/24/2019. (djb)
September 20, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #24 Response to Order to Show Cause by SANDRA F SMITH, #23 Order (djb)
September 19, 2019 Filing 24 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by SANDRA F SMITH. (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - All individual plaintiffs identified on Exhibit A are hereby ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why his or her case should not be dismissed with prejudice for failure to comply with an order of the Court, by Friday, September 20, 2019. Each plaintiff's response to the show cause order must be filed on the docket for his or her individual case only. Each plaintiff must also submit facially valid supporting documentation for his or her claim to the Claims Administrator, BrownGreer PLC, by Friday, September 20, 2019. Failure to comply with either of these directives will result in dismissal of a case with prejudice. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual docket for each of the cases identified on Exhibit A. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/6/2019. (djb)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER - The individual cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for the plaintiffs' failure to prosecute and/or failure to comply with court orders. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual docket for each of the cases identified in Exhibit A, and then to close those cases in their entirety for all purposes. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/3/2019. (djb)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - This matter is before the Court on the timely responses to the Court's Order to Show Cause dated August 21, 2019, Case No. 3:16md2734, ECF No. 1155, filed by the plaintiffs identified on Exhibit A. The Court accepts the plaintiffs' #18 Response; #19 Response; #20 Response and finds good cause shown; therefore, no sanctions will be imposed in these cases. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 9/3/2019. (djb) Modified on 9/4/2019 to add docket entry relationships(djb).
August 30, 2019 Cases associated: Create association to 3:16-md-02734-MCR-GRJ. (djb)
August 30, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #18 Response; #19 Response; #20 Response; #17 Order (djb)
August 30, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE by WILLIAM MORRISON re #17 Order,,, . (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
August 30, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE by PHYLLIS THURSTON re #17 Order,,, . (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
August 30, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE by JAMES STOKES re #17 Order,,, . (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - Defendants' Motion for Entry of Order to Show Cause for "Missing" Plaintiffs, ECF No. 1154, is GRANTED as to the individual plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A. 2. All individual plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A are hereby ORDERED to show cause why his or her case should not be dismissed with prejudice for failure to prosecute and/or failure to comply with an order of the Court, by August 30, 2019. Each plaintiff's response to the show cause order must be filed on the docket for his or her individual case only. 3. Failure to comply with this Order will result in dismissal of a case with prejudice. 4. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual docket for each of the cases identified in Exhibit A. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 8/21/2019. (djb)
May 10, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #16 Order, (no filing) (djb)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #12 Response to Order to Show Cause. The Court has been advised that Plaintiff Eppie Silva has died. Any motion for substitution must be filed within 90 days after service of the statement noting death. If no such motion is made within the requisite time period, the case will be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(a). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/19/2019. (Motion for Substitution due by 5/8/2019.) (djb)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER - The Court has been advised that the plaintiffs, (identified in Exhibit A), have now submitted the requisite forms to BrownGreer PLC and that the delay resulted from counsels difficulties in locating her clients. Under these circumstances, no sanctions will be imposed; however, counsel is instructed to ensure timely compliance with all future deadlines. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/19/2019. (djb)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - The individual cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for the plaintiffs failure to comply with court orders. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual docket for each of the cases identified in Exhibit A, and then to close those cases in their entirety for all purposes. MARCUS NICKLOW, DIONNE REISERT, TONIE SANDERS, SYLVIA STANTON TAYLOR, BRENDA MORROW and JOSHUA NALL terminated. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/8/2019. (djb)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - The individual cases identified on Exhibit A are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for the plaintiffs' failure to comply with court orders. The Clerk is directed to enter a copy of this Order on the individual docket for each of the cases identified in Exhibit A, and then to close those cases in their entirety for all purposes. ELIZABETH PENDER and REBECCA WILSON terminated. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/8/2019. (djb)
February 8, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #10 Order (no responses by Brenda Morrow, Joshua nall, Marcus Nicklow, Elizabeth Pender, Dionne Reisert, Tonie Sanders, Sylvia Taylor or Rebecca Wilson) (djb)
February 8, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #12 Response to Order to Show Cause by EPPIE SILVA, #10 Order (djb)
February 7, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by EPPIE SILVA. (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
February 7, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #11 Response to Order to Show Cause, #10 Order (djb)
February 7, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by JACQUELINE MEYER. (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/31/2019. (djb)
January 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by JENNIFER R LIAKOS on behalf of All Plaintiffs (LIAKOS, JENNIFER)
August 31, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS LARRY HILL on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (HILL, THOMAS)
August 30, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE Regarding Admission to Practice as to R. Joseph Hrubiec counsel for plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 MDL 2734 - Amended Order 252 ) (mailed to counsel) (djb)
August 30, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #6 Case Transferred In - District Transfer, #1 Complaint. (djb)
August 30, 2018 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:18-cv-01243. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 29, 2018 Filing 5 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER by the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (nmf) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/30/2018.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacqueline Meyer. Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. served on 8/16/2018, answer due 9/6/2018. (Hrubiec, R.) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/30/2018.]
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jacqueline Meyer. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company served on 8/16/2018, answer due 9/6/2018. (Hrubiec, R.) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/30/2018.]
August 15, 2018 Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-01238-CFC, 1:18-cv-01241-CFC, 1:18-cv-01242-CFC, 1:18-cv-01243-CFC(rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/30/2018.]
August 15, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Bristol-Myers Squibb Company on 8/15/2018; Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. on 8/15/2018; Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. on 8/15/2018. (nmf). [Transferred from Delaware on 8/30/2018.]
August 14, 2018 No Summons Issued. (jcs) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/30/2018.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jcs) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/30/2018.]
August 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages filed with Jury Demand against Bristol-Myers Squibb Company, Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc., Otsuka Pharmaceutical Co., Ltd. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2439502.) - filed by Corey J. Rains, Christopher Sutherlin, Flloyd Saxton, Carolyn Parker, Cheryl L. Wilder, Cassandra Simpson, Gloria Thomas, William Morrison, Michael Dean Sacora, Gary Torch, Dominique C. Powell, Donna R. Samuelian, Christopher Sawyer, Letroy Toussaint, Heather Swallop, Joyce A. Pringle, Dionne Reisert, Bobie Nall, Kimberlee Smith Schulz, Phyllis Thurston, Brice Sheppard, Timothy Price, Nancy V. Rhodes, John Walters, Sylvia J. Rice, Alberto Nava, James Stokes, Juanita D. Smith, Jamyrah Robinson, Christopher Straight, Marcus Nicklow, Eppie Silva, Iris Nichols, Jacqueline Meyer, Eric Stump, Tracy Wayman, Devante Thomas, Edgar Valley, Annette Porter, Rebecca Wilson, Ernest E. Wilkins, Sandra F. Smith, Tonie Sanders, Datron Simmons, Zanphier Walker, Antonio Romero, Sarah Thorton, Kisha Williams, Sarah Wingard, Darlene Sabatine, Bernell Williams, Jermal Staggers, Elizabeth Pender, Joshua Nall, Dennis Tapley, Diane Wilson, Michael Milner, Michael Swan, Kannon Russell, Brenda Morrow, Estella M. Rodriguez, Sylvia Stanton Taylor, Wanda Wood, Sharon L. Reiter, Jay Dee Richards, Maureen Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jcs) [Transferred from Delaware on 8/30/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MEYER et al v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANNETTE PORTER
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIONNE REISERT
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON L. REITER
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BERNELL WILLIAMS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DEVANTE THOMAS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TONIE SANDERS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JACQUELINE MEYER
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WANDA WOOD
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM MORRISON
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL SWAN
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER SAWYER
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAROLYN PARKER
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER SUTHERLIN
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DENNIS TAPLEY
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRENDA MORROW
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DARLENE SABATINE
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IRIS NICHOLS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REBECCA WILSON
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALBERTO NAVA
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL DEAN SACORA
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDGAR VALLEY
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KANNON RUSSELL
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIC STUMP
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOMINIQUE C. POWELL
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARAH THORTON
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SYLVIA STANTON TAYLOR
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN WALTERS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTELLA M. RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANCY V. RHODES
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DIANE WILSON
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SARAH WINGARD
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LETROY TOUSSAINT
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH PENDER
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLEE SMITH SCHULZ
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRISTOPHER STRAIGHT
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TIMOTHY PRICE
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL MILNER
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COREY J. RAINS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHERYL L. WILDER
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRICE SHEPPARD
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DATRON SIMMONS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GARY STORCH
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMYRAH ROBINSON
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUANITA D. SMITH
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHYLLIS THURSTON
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAY DEE RICHARDS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA F. SMITH
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANTONIO ROMERO
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JERMAL STAGGERS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TRACY WAYMAN
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOYCE A. PRINGLE
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZANPHIER WALKER
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CASSANDRA SIMPSON
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES STOKES
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SYLVIA J. RICE
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLLOYD SAXTON
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAUREEN MITCHELL
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HEATHER SWALLOP
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BOBIE NALL
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSHUA NALL
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARCUS NICKLOW
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERNEST E. WILKINS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLORIA THOMAS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA R. SAMUELIAN
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KISHA WILLIAMS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EPPIE SILVA
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHERYL L WILDER
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SYLVIA J RICE
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOMINIQUE C POWELL
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHARON L REITER
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NANCY V RHODES
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERNEST E WILKINS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SANDRA F SMITH
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DONNA R SAMUELIAN
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTELLA M RODRIGUEZ
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUANITA D SMITH
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOYCE A PRINGLE
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: COREY J RAINS
Represented By: R. JOSEPH HRUBIEC
Represented By: JENNIFER R LIAKOS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA AMERICA PHARMACEUTICAL INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OTSUKA PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY
Represented By: LAUREN S COLTON
Represented By: CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR.
Represented By: EDWARD W GERECKE
Represented By: DAVID JOSEPH WALZ
Represented By: ANAND AGNESHWAR
Represented By: MATTHEW A EISENSTEIN
Represented By: THOMAS LARRY HILL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?