VAN DERMARK et al v. TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL COMPANY LP
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Van Dermark and Lynn Van Dermark
Defendant: TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL COMPANY, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2018cv02188
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Referring Judge: ROGER VINSON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 27:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. The stay previously entered in this case is LIFTED, and the plaintiff's motion to direct the arbitrator to conduct a hearing to determine the amount of attorney fees and costs (doc. #12 ), and Terminix's motion to enjoin arbitration regarding attorney fees and costs (doc. #14 ), are both DENIED as moot. I will retain jurisdiction over this case and, by separate order, will appoint a Special Master to consider the matter and make a Report and Recommendation to me, with his/her fee and costs to be borne by Terminix. The parties are directed to comply with Local Rule 54.1(E), (F), (G). Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 12/21/2018. (sdw)
December 14, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re: #12 MOTION TO MODIFY ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ORDER DIRECTING AAA TO CONDUCT HEARING, #16 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. (sdw)
December 13, 2018 Set Deadlines re #14 MOTION to Enjoin Further Arbitration Regarding Attorney Fees. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 12/27/2018.) (sdw)
December 13, 2018 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #12 MOTION MOTION TO MODIFY ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ORDER DIRECTING AAA TO CONDUCT HEARING filed by TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL COMPANY, L.P.. (KIRKLAND, BRIAN)
December 13, 2018 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support re #14 MOTION Y to Enjoin Further Arbitration Regarding Attorney Fees filed by TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL COMPANY, L.P.. (KIRKLAND, BRIAN)
December 13, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION Y to Enjoin Further Arbitration Regarding Attorney Fees by TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL COMPANY, L.P.. (KIRKLAND, BRIAN)
November 29, 2018 Set Deadlines re #12 MOTION TO MODIFY ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ORDER DIRECTING AAA TO CONDUCT HEARING. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 12/13/2018.) (sdw)
November 29, 2018 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM in Support re #12 MOTION MOTION TO MODIFY ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ORDER DIRECTING AAA TO CONDUCT HEARING filed by JEFFREY VAN DERMARK, LYNN VAN DERMARK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (PARTINGTON, BRUCE)
November 29, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION MOTION TO MODIFY ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ORDER DIRECTING AAA TO CONDUCT HEARING by JEFFREY VAN DERMARK, LYNN VAN DERMARK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (PARTINGTON, BRUCE)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. Terminix's motion for partial dismissal (doc. #7 ) is DENIED for the reasons noted in the Van Dermarks' response in opposition. This case will be STAYED until further order of this court, so that the Van Dermarks can file an appropriate motion with the arbitrator requesting that he determine the amount of awardable attorney fees and costs. The parties are directed to jointly advise me when the proceedings before the arbitrator have been concluded. The Van Dermarks' motion to vacate the initial scheduling order (doc. #5 ) is GRANTED, and the initial scheduling order is vacated and set aside. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 11/15/2018. (sdw)
November 14, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re: #7 MOTION to Dismiss , #10 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. (sdw)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by JEFFREY VAN DERMARK, LYNN VAN DERMARK. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (PARTINGTON, BRUCE)
November 13, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re: #8 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #9 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #5 MOTION to Vacate #4 Scheduling Order, and to Treat Case as a Motion for Confirmation of Arbitration Award. (sdw)
November 9, 2018 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Vacate #4 Scheduling Order, and to Treat Case as a Motion for Confirmation of Arbitration Award filed by TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL COMPANY, L.P.. (KIRKLAND, BRIAN)
October 30, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support re #5 MOTION to Vacate #4 Scheduling Order, and to Treat Case as a Motion for Confirmation of Arbitration Award, #7 MOTION to Dismiss filed by TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL COMPANY, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit) (KIRKLAND, BRIAN)
October 30, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss by TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL COMPANY, L.P.. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 11/13/2018). (KIRKLAND, BRIAN)
October 30, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL COMPANY, L.P.. (KIRKLAND, BRIAN)
October 26, 2018 Set Deadlines re #5 MOTION to Vacate #4 Scheduling Order, and to Treat Case as a Motion for Confirmation of Arbitration Award. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 11/9/2018.) (sdw)
October 26, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION to Vacate #4 Scheduling Order, and to Treat Case as a Motion for Confirmation of Arbitration Award by JEFFREY VAN DERMARK, LYNN VAN DERMARK. (PARTINGTON, BRUCE)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ***VACATED AND SET ASIDE per #11 ORDER*** INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 11/7/2018. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/7/2018. Discovery due by 3/25/2019. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 10/24/2018. (sdw) Modified on 11/15/2018 (sdw).
October 24, 2018 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re: #1 Notice of Removal. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw)
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL COMPANY, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL COMPANY, L.P. for TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL COMPANY, L.P... (KIRKLAND, BRIAN)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (KIRKLAND, BRIAN)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL COMPANY, L.P. from Santa Rosa Circuit Civil, case number 2018 CA 000647. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4317704.), filed by TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL COMPANY, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit) (KIRKLAND, BRIAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VAN DERMARK et al v. TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL COMPANY LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TERMINIX INTERNATIONAL COMPANY, L.P.
Represented By: BRIAN H KIRKLAND
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Van Dermark
Represented By: BRUCE DOUGLAS PARTINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Van Dermark
Represented By: BRUCE DOUGLAS PARTINGTON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?