SISLEY v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA et al.

Plaintiff: HOLLY J SISLEY
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA and NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Case Number: 3:2018cv02368
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: CHARLES J KAHN
Referring Judge: ROGER VINSON
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HOLLY J SISLEY. NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION served on 2/8/2019, answer due 3/1/2019. (WEIDNER, KEITH)
February 20, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA re #12 Amended Complaint (LEHNER, STEVEN) Modified on 2/22/2019 to edit title of document (sdw).
February 7, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION. (sdw)
February 7, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Filing Summons for Issuance by Clerk by HOLLY J SISLEY (WEIDNER, KEITH)
February 6, 2019 Filing 12 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION, filed by HOLLY J SISLEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (WEIDNER, KEITH)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER re #10 Joint Report. All discovery must be completed by 7/8/2019. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 2/5/2019. (sdw)
February 5, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re: #10 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (sdw)
February 4, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (WEIDNER, KEITH)
January 16, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (LEHNER, STEVEN)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint filed by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (Answer due by 2/6/2019.) Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 1/8/2019. (sdw)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 1/22/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 2/21/2019. Discovery due by 7/8/2019. Signed by SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON on 1/8/2019. (sdw)
January 7, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of SENIOR JUDGE ROGER VINSON notified that action is needed Re: #6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (LEHNER, STEVEN)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by HOLLY J SISLEY. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA served on 12/18/2018, answer due 1/8/2019. (WEIDNER, KEITH)
December 10, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA. (sdw)
December 10, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Summons for Issuance by Clerk by HOLLY J SISLEY (WEIDNER, KEITH)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (WEIDNER, KEITH)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4352324.), filed by HOLLY J SISLEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G) (WEIDNER, KEITH) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2018: #8 Exhibit F) (sdw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SISLEY v. LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY OF NORTH AMERICA
Represented By: STEVEN DOUGLAS LEHNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOLLY J SISLEY
Represented By: KEITH WILLIAM WEIDNER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?