WESTERN SURETY COMPANY v. JEMCO PLASTERING INC et al
Plaintiff: Western Surety Company
Defendant: Kathalyn McCormick, Jemco Supply, Inc., Jemco Plastering, Inc., Jemcoat Industries, Inc., Jami McCormick, James McCormick, JEMCO PLASTERING INC, JEMCOAT INDUSTRIES INC and JEMCO SUPPLY INC
Case Number: 3:2018cv02390
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Referring Judge: ROGER VINSON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to JEMCO PLASTERING INC. (Attachments: #1 Jemco Supply Inc, #2 Jemcoat Industries, #3 Kathalyn McCormick, #4 Jamie McCormick, #5 James McCormick) (alb)
January 3, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by WESTERN SURETY COMPANY (HOFFMAN, MICHAEL)
January 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by WESTERN SURETY COMPANY (HOFFMAN, MICHAEL)
January 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by WESTERN SURETY COMPANY (HOFFMAN, MICHAEL)
January 3, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by WESTERN SURETY COMPANY (HOFFMAN, MICHAEL)
January 3, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by WESTERN SURETY COMPANY (HOFFMAN, MICHAEL)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by WESTERN SURETY COMPANY (HOFFMAN, MICHAEL)
December 21, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by Western Surety Company identifying Corporate Parent CONTINENTAL CASUALTY COMPANY, Corporate Parent CNA FINANCIAL CORPORATION, Corporate Parent THE CONTINENTAL CORPORATION for Western Surety Company.. (HOFFMAN, MICHAEL)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (HOFFMAN, MICHAEL)
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (alb)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: "A complete and executed Civil Cover Sheet, currently AO Form JS 44, shall be filed by counsel for the filing party in each civil case at the time of filing, unless for good cause shown an additional time for such filing is allowed." [See Local Rule 5.2]. Please file the civil cover sheet using the event selection: Other Filings >> Other Documents >> Civil Cover Sheet. (alb)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4360908.), filed by Western Surety Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Indemnity Agreement, #2 Exhibit B: Bond, #3 Exhibit C: Settlement Agreement) (HOFFMAN, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WESTERN SURETY COMPANY v. JEMCO PLASTERING INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathalyn McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jemco Supply, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jemco Plastering, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jemcoat Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jami McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James McCormick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEMCO PLASTERING INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEMCOAT INDUSTRIES INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JEMCO SUPPLY INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Surety Company
Represented By: MICHAEL S HOFFMAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?