FLORIDA COMMUNITY SERVICES CORP OF WALTON COUNTY v. SKANKA USA CIVIL SOUTHEAST INC et al
Plaintiff: FLORIDA COMMUNITY SERVICES CORP OF WALTON COUNTY
Defendant: SKANKA USA CIVIL SOUTHEAST INC and FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Case Number: 3:2019cv00077
Filed: January 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: HOPE T CANNON
Referring Judge: CHARLES J KAHN
2 Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE HOPE T CANNON for all further proceedings. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES J KAHN, JR no longer assigned to case. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 3/1/2019. (erl)**Please use the new judge's initials for all future filings: 3:19cv77-MCR/HTC.
February 26, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by FLORIDA COMMUNITY SERVICES CORP OF WALTON COUNTY identifying Other Affiliate TRAVELERS PROPERTY CASUALTY COMPANY OF AMERICA for FLORIDA COMMUNITY SERVICES CORP OF WALTON COUNTY.. (REILLY, MICHAEL)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER : Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 2/26/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/28/2019. Discovery due by 8/12/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/12/2019. (sdw)
February 12, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #8 Answer to Complaint. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw)
February 11, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (PAGAN, JOSE)
February 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JOSE PAGAN on behalf of FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION (PAGAN, JOSE)
January 18, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from Tallahassee Division on 01/17/2019. Case Number 4:19cv31-MW/CAS (amm)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to SKANKA USA CIVIL SOUTHEAST INC. and FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION. (Attachments: #1 Florida Department of Transportation Summons) (amm)
January 17, 2019 Filing 4 INTRA-DIVISION TRANSER: This cause has been filed in error in the Tallahassee Division of the Northern District of Florida. The Clerk is directed to transfer this case to the Pensacola Division and close the Tallahassee Division file. Signed by CHIEF JUDGE MARK E WALKER on 1/17/19. (amm)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number FLN400035870. Fee status updated to paid. (amm)
January 15, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (REILLY, MICHAEL)
January 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by FLORIDA COMMUNITY SERVICES CORP OF WALTON COUNTY. (Attachments: #1 SUMMONS, #2 SUMMONS) (REILLY, MICHAEL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FLORIDA COMMUNITY SERVICES CORP OF WALTON COUNTY v. SKANKA USA CIVIL SOUTHEAST INC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SKANKA USA CIVIL SOUTHEAST INC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION
Represented By: JOSE PAGAN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FLORIDA COMMUNITY SERVICES CORP OF WALTON COUNTY
Represented By: MICHAEL J REILLY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?