WYSE v. GERARD ROOF PRODUCTS LLC
Plaintiff: Johnny S. Wyse and JOHNNY S WYSE
Defendant: Gerard Roof Products, LLC and GERARD ROOF PRODUCTS LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00121
Filed: January 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: M CASEY RODGERS
Referring Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING #20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 4/2/2019.) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/8/2019. (alb)
March 8, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (alb)
March 7, 2019 Filing 20 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by JOHNNY S WYSE. (WARWICK, BRIAN)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Amanda M Waide, of the law firm of Alston & Bird LLP, is admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendant Gerard Roof Products, LLC, pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(C). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/6/2019. (alb)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Kathryn C. Klorfein, of the law firm of Alston & Bird LLP, is admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendant Gerard Roof Products, LLC, pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(C). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/6/2019. (alb)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Daniel F. Diffley, of the law firm of Alston & Bird LLP, is admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendant Gerard Roof Products, LLC, pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(C). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/6/2019. (alb)
March 6, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kathryn C. Klorfein.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4421921.), #14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel F. Diffley.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4421907.), #15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amanda M. Waide.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4421915.) (alb)
March 5, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings re #13 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 3/19/2019). (alb)
March 5, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Kathryn C. Klorfein.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4421921.) by GERARD ROOF PRODUCTS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (KLORFEIN, KATHRYN)
March 5, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Amanda M. Waide.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4421915.) by GERARD ROOF PRODUCTS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (WAIDE, AMANDA)
March 5, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel F. Diffley.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4421907.) by GERARD ROOF PRODUCTS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (DIFFLEY, DANIEL)
March 5, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by GERARD ROOF PRODUCTS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (BEALL, CHARLES)
February 22, 2019 Filing 12 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Filer - Please note for future reference that all party names (including aliases, corporate parents, etc.) are to be added using all caps and no punctuation. (See "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing," available on Clerk's website.) The party names will be corrected by the clerk. Re #11 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons filed by GERARD ROOF PRODUCTS LLC (djb)
February 21, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by GERARD ROOF PRODUCTS LLC identifying Corporate Parent Boral Roofing, LLC for GERARD ROOF PRODUCTS LLC.. (BEALL, CHARLES)
February 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR on behalf of GERARD ROOF PRODUCTS LLC (BEALL, CHARLES)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 3/5/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/4/2019. Discovery due by 8/19/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/19/2019. (sdw)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by GERARD ROOF PRODUCTS LLC. (Answer due by 3/5/2019.) Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/19/2019. (sdw)
February 19, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by GERARD ROOF PRODUCTS LLC. (HILL, THOMAS)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney William H. Anderson of Handley Farah & Anderson, PLLC is admitted pro hac vice to represent the Plaintiff, pursuant to Local Rule 11.1(C). Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 2/6/2019. (alb)
February 4, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William H. Anderson.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4393884.) (alb)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William H. Anderson.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4393884.) by JOHNNY S WYSE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (ANDERSON, WILLIAM)
January 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Gerard Roof Products, LLC. (alb)
January 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE - Summons to be issued - by Johnny S. Wyse re #1 Complaint (WARWICK, BRIAN)
January 22, 2019 Filing 3 DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: The parties in the above-referenced case were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. Party names are to be entered in all caps and without punctuation. For future reference: Please review the procedure for adding/creating new parties in the "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing" and/or chapter 10 of the "CM/ECF Attorney User's Guide," available at www.flnd.uscourts.gov. (alb)
January 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Gerard Roof Products, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4383456.), filed by Johnny S. Wyse. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (WARWICK, BRIAN)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WYSE v. GERARD ROOF PRODUCTS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnny S. Wyse
Represented By: BRIAN WILLIAM WARWICK
Represented By: JANET R VARNELL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHNNY S WYSE
Represented By: BRIAN WILLIAM WARWICK
Represented By: JANET R VARNELL
Represented By: WILLIAM HAROLD ANDERSON
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerard Roof Products, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GERARD ROOF PRODUCTS LLC
Represented By: CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR.
Represented By: DANIEL FRANCIS DIFFLEY
Represented By: THOMAS LARRY HILL
Represented By: AMANDA MICHELLE WAIDE
Represented By: KATHRYN C KLORFEIN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?