SMITH v. INCH

Petitioner: RENARDO SMITH
Respondent: JULIE L JONES and MARK S INCH
Case Number: 3:2019cv00364
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Florida
0 Judge: LACEY A COLLIER
1 Judge: MICHAEL J FRANK
2 Judge: ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Change of Address by RENARDO SMITH. Address updated to DESOTO CORRECTIONAL INSTITUTION ANNEX, 13617 SE HWY 70, ARCADIA FL 34266. (jcw)
April 4, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #5 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (jcw)
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by RENARDO SMITH. (jcw)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The clerk of court shall change the docket to reflect that Mark S. Inch has been substituted as the respondent in this cause, and shall forward to petitioner the form for use in 2254 cases and a form application to proceed in forma pauperis. This case number shall be written on the forms. Within 30 DAYS from the date of this order, petitioner shall file an amended petition, which shall be typed or clearly written, submitted on the court form, and accompanied by two identical service copies of same. Within the same time, petitioner shall submit payment in the amount of $5.00, or file a complete application to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 3/5/2019. ( Amended Pleadings due by 4/4/2019., Fee due by 4/4/2019.)(Forms mailed as ordered.) (jcw)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY recused. Case reassigned to MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK for all further proceedings. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY on 2/11/2019. (MB)
February 8, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY notified that action is needed Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (No service copies). (Pages 8 and 10 are missing from Petition). (MB)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se Litigant, RENARDO SMITH. (MB)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by RENARDO SMITH. (No service copies). (Pages 8 and 10 are missing from Petition). (MB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SMITH v. INCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: JULIE L JONES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: MARK S INCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RENARDO SMITH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?